Northland Insurance Company v. Gogu Trucking Express Corporation et al (PLR3)

Plaintiff: Northland Insurance Company
Defendant: Bronwyn D Townsend, Alicia Mumpower, Melinda Squiers, Gogu Trucking Express Corporation, Jason W Mumpower, Jennifer L Graham, Letie W Stephens, Gary Squiers, Jeffrey Graham, Pavel Ghelenuic and Sopranos, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00108
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case per SO 19-13. (KMK)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Alias Summons Issued as to Gogu Trucking Express Corporation. (AMP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Summons Issued,, Alias by Northland Insurance Company. (Usery, Brent)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 Alias Summons Issued as to Gogu Trucking Express Corporation and Sopranos, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons Sopranos, Inc.) (AMP)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Summons Issued,, Alias by Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias)(Usery, Brent)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Supplement : Please add the word Alias to the Summons to be issued. Also, please file the Summons in a non-fillable form with one Summons as the main document and the other Summons as an attachment. Requirements due by 8/12/2019. (AMP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Summons Issued,, Alias Summons to Gogu and Sporanos by Northland Insurance Company. (Usery, Brent)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Necessary and Interested Parties Melinda Squiers and Gary Squiers' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Relief by Gary Squiers, Melinda Squiers.(Miles, Jeffery)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Necessary and interested parties Jennifer L. Graham and Jeffrey Graham's Answer to Northland Insurance Company's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jennifer L Graham.(Culbertson, R)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Gogu Trucking Express Corporation, Jeffrey Graham, Jennifer L Graham, Alicia Mumpower, Jason W Mumpower, Pavel Ghelenuic, Sopranos, Inc, Gary Squiers, Melinda Squiers, Letie W Stephens, Bronwyn D Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jason Mumpower, #2 Summons Alicia Mumpower, #3 Summons Jennifer Graham, #4 Summons Jeffrey Graham, #5 Summons Letie Stephens, #6 Summons Melinda Squiers, #7 Summons Gary Squiers, #8 Summons Pavel Gheleniuc, #9 Summons Sporanos, #10 Summons Townsend)(CAT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Northland Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Filing of Summonses To Be Issued (Attachments: #1 Summons To Gheleniuc, #2 Summons To Gogu Trucking, #3 Summons To Grahams, #4 Summons To Mumpowers, #5 Summons To Sopranos, #6 Summons To Squiers, #7 Summons To Stephens, #8 Summons To Townsend)(Usery, Brent)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/26/2019. (AMP)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/26/2019. (AMP)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/26/2019. (AMP)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Therefore, the Court finds this case and Case No. 2:17-CV-219 should be deemed related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to Chief District Pamela L. Reeves and the undersigned, Magistrate Judge Clifton L. Corker, this case should also be assigned likewise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 06/26/2019. (AMP)
June 26, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AMP)
June 26, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (AMP)
June 26, 2019 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Corker for related case determination. (AMP)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Northland Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Northland Insurance Company. (Usery, Brent)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4007518.), filed by Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Northland Policy, #2 Exhibit 2. Graham Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3. Mumpower Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4. Squiers Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5. Stephens Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6. Townsend Complaint, #7 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Usery, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northland Insurance Company v. Gogu Trucking Express Corporation et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronwyn D Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Mumpower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Squiers
Represented By: Richard W Pectol
Represented By: Jeffery P Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gogu Trucking Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason W Mumpower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L Graham
Represented By: R Wayne Culbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letie W Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Squiers
Represented By: Richard W Pectol
Represented By: Jeffery P Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Graham
Represented By: R Wayne Culbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavel Ghelenuic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sopranos, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northland Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent S Usery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?