Sellers v. Chesnut
Plaintiff: Brittany Sellers
Defendant: Alex A. Chesnut
Case Number: 2:2019cv00110
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lee, Alan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Snyder, Brent)
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case pursuant to SO-19-13. (CNC)
August 16, 2019 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. (RET)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Thomas A Varlan no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/09/2019. (CAT)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/29/19. (ABF)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 07/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alex A. Chesnut.(Smith, T)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Alex A. Chesnut by Brittany Sellers. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lee Declaration)(Lee, Alan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Alex A. Chesnut. (Smith, T)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Sellers. Alex A. Chesnut served on 7/1/2019. (Lee, Alan)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/27/19. (ABF)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/27/19. (ABF)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/27/19. (ABF)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alex A. Chesnut. (ABF)
June 26, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex A. Chesnut ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4008829.), filed by Brittany Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit civil summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Sale, #3 Other cover sheet, #4 Summons Chesnut)(Snyder, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. Chesnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex A. Chesnut
Represented By: T Wood Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Sellers
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?