Raines v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tara W Raines and Tara W. Raines
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00113
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with Prejudice as to all Defendants by Tara W. Raines (Lee, Alan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Tara W. Raines. (Lee, Alan)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case pursuant to SO 19-13. (AWS)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/9/2019. (AML)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara W. Raines. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 7/12/2019. (Lee, Alan)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/9/2019. (BJL)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/9/2019. (BJL)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/9/2019. (BJL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (BJL)
July 8, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (BJL)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4016140.), filed by Tara W Raines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collection Letter, #2 Exhibit Dispute letter, #3 Other cover sheet, #4 Summons Summons Wakefield)(Snyder, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raines v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara W Raines
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara W. Raines
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?