Armstrong v. BAE Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry Armstrong
Defendant: BAE Systems, Inc. and BAE Systems Ordnance Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00132
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Terry Armstrong. BAE Systems Ordnance Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 8/19/2019. (DeVault, Charlton)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Terry Armstrong. BAE Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 8/19/2019. (DeVault, Charlton)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case pursuant to SO-19-13. (CNC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 22, 2019. (AYB)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 22, 2019. (AYB)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 22, 2019. (AYB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BAE Systems Ordnance Systems, Inc. and BAE Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons BAE Systems Ordnance Systems, Inc) (AYB)
July 19, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AYB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4027342.), filed by Terry Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Summons To BAE Systems, Inc., #2 Summons To BAE Systems Inc.Ordnance Systems Inc., #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(DeVault, Charlton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. BAE Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems Ordnance Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Armstrong
Represented By: Charlton R DeVault, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?