Napier v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Steve Napier
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00134
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
2 Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT of the parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Callaway, Gregory)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/18/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/22/2019. (BJL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Callaway, Gregory)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case. Reassigned pursuant to SO 19-13. (BDG)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/16/2019. (TRT)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Callaway, Gregory)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 8/21/2019 at 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/29/2019. (CMH)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019, at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/24/2019. (CMH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 DISREGARD NOTICE - ATTORNEY IS ADMITTED UNDER FORMAL NAME,J Anthony Farmer - NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC)Notice mailed to Farmer. Modified on 7/29/2019, to update docket text and regenerate to attorney Farmer. (SAC).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)Order mailed to Farmer.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2019. (SAC) Modified on 7/24/2019, Order mailed to Farmer.(SAC).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Farmer.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2019. (SAC) Modified on 7/24/2019, Order mailed to Farmer. (SAC).
July 23, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (SAC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Sullivan County, TN, case number C42709. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4030147), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - complaint, #3 Other civil cover sheet)(Callaway, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Napier v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Gregory W Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Napier
Represented By: Christopher H Hayes
Represented By: J Anthony Farmer
Represented By: John P Dreiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?