O.S.S. Holdings, LLC v. Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: O.S.S. Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Ed Ellis and Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00137
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
2 Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-16-19. (KMG) (Copy of gavel order form mailed to Edward Pennington and John Moy) Modified on 9/17/2019 (JCK).
September 13, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward A. Pennington ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077448.) filed by Ed Ellis, Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC, #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Moy ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077455.) filed by Ed Ellis, Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC (AMP)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Moy ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077455.) by Ed Ellis, Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mickel, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward A. Pennington ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077448.) by Ed Ellis, Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mickel, Timothy)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have up to and including September 30, 2019, in which to respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-30-19.This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. (KMG) Modified on 9/3/2019 to reflect copy of Order mailed to Edward Pennington and John Moy (AMP).
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys Edward Pennington and John Moy are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Edward Pennington and John Moy) (AMP)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint by Ed Ellis, Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Mickel, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case pursuant to SO-19-13. (CNC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ed Ellis, Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC., filed by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bradford, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. Ed Ellis served on 8/7/2019. (Bradford, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC served on 8/6/2019. (Bradford, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 08/02/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Jed H. Hansen, Peter M. de Jonge, and Mark M. Bettilyon) (AMP)
August 2, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jed H. Hansen ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036898.) filed by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter M. de Jonge ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036908.) filed by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark M. Bettilyon ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036917.) filed by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC . (AMP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark M. Bettilyon ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036917.) by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter M. de Jonge ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036908.) by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jed H. Hansen ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036898.) by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jed H. Hansen ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036898.), #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter M. de Jonge ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036908.), #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark M. Bettilyon ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036917.) : A Certificate of Good Standing from another district court must be submitted. (AMP) Modified on 8/1/2019 to reflect copy of Notice mailed to Jed H. Hansen, Peter M. de Jonge, and Mark M. Bettilyon (AMP).
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark M. Bettilyon ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036917.) by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter M. de Jonge ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036908.) by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jed H. Hansen ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4036898.) by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/26/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Mark Bettilyon, Jed Hansen and Peter de Jonge) (AMP)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/26/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Mark Bettilyon, Jed Hansen and Peter de Jonge) (AMP)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/26/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Mark Bettilyon, Jed Hansen and Peter de Jonge) (AMP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC, and Ed Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ed Ellis) (AMP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys Mark Bettilyon, Jed Hansen, and Peter de Jonge are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/ pro_hac_vice. pdf. (Copy of Notice mailed to Mark Bettilyon, Jed Hansen and Peter de Jonge) (AMP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel: No action to be taken. For future reference, please file the Summons in a non-fillable form. (AMP)
July 26, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AMP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 8286750 . (Bradford, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Bradford, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ed Ellis, Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4033252.), filed by O.S.S. Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC, #5 Summons Ed Ellis)(Bradford, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.S.S. Holdings, LLC v. Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.S.S. Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark M Bettilyon
Represented By: Michael J Bradford
Represented By: Andrew S Neely
Represented By: Jed H Hansen
Represented By: Peter M de Jonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Ellis
Represented By: John P Moy
Represented By: Edward A Pennington
Represented By: Timothy L Mickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermal Defense Solutions, LLC
Represented By: John P Moy
Represented By: Edward A Pennington
Represented By: Timothy L Mickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?