Valentine v. SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC et al (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Carla Valentine
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare, LLC, SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, Rebecca Galey Strawn, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC and SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00147
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: On September 25, 2019, the parties filed a Rule 26(f) Report regarding their Planning Meeting. [Doc. 34.] However, the parties did not provide any information required by the Court's Case Management Order. Considering neither party complied with the Case Management Order, sanctions appear to be the proper remedy for any future failure to comply with the Order. Therefore, the parties are ORDERED to meet, confer, and file a new Report within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Further, a Report must be submitted even if the parties file a motion requesting a stay of the litigation. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/01/2019. (CAT)
September 25, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Carla Valentine(Personal Representative of the Estate of ) (Trammell, M)
September 25, 2019 Filing 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trammell, M)
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION re #23 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #24 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Lawsuit - Reply Memorandum filed by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Durable General Power of Attorney, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Elaine Wagner, #3 Exhibit Dispute Resolution Program, #4 Exhibit Wright Memorandum Opinion, #5 Exhibit Wright Dispute Resolution Program, #6 Exhibit JAMS Comprehensive Rules)(Eaton, David) Modified on to correct event type 9/18/2019 (JCK).
September 10, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SavaSeniorCare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eaton, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, SavaSeniorCare, LLC, Rebecca Galey Strawn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Eaton, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal Party Rebecca Galey Strawn by Carla Valentine(Personal Representative of the Estate of ). (Trammell, M)
September 5, 2019 Filing 29 Administrative Notice to Counsel #28 Response to Motion. Wrong event used. Please refile document 28 using the event Stipulation of Dismissal found under the category Other Documents. Requirements due by 9/10/2019. (JCK)
September 4, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carla Valentine(Personal Representative of the Estate of ). (Trammell, M)
September 3, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Carla Valentine(Personal Representative of the Estate of ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Trammell, M)
September 3, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #24 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Lawsuit filed by Carla Valentine(Personal Representative of the Estate of ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Other)(Trammell, M)
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Lawsuit, #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carla Valentine(Personal Representative of the Estate of ). (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Proposed Order)(Trammell, M)
August 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. Pursuant to SO 19-13. (JCK)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC. (Eaton, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC. (Eaton, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rebecca Galey Strawn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Rebecca Galey Strawn, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Service)(Eaton, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SavaSeniorCare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Wynn Sims)(Eaton, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SavaSeniorCare, LLC. (Eaton, David)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintif's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/14/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to M Chad Trammell) (CAT)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (Copy of Order mailed to M. Chad Trammell) (AMP)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by SavaSeniorCare, LLC. (AMP)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney M. Chad Trammell is not registered for CM/ECF. Please register for CM/ECF. Requirements due by 8/19/2019. (Copy of Notice mailed to M. Chad Trammell) (AMP)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/13/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to M. Chad Trammell) (AMP)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/13/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to M. Chad Trammell) (AMP)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/13/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to M. Chad Trammell) (AMP)
August 13, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer added. (AMP)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Lawsuit filed by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dispute Resolution Program, #2 Exhibit 2 - Power of Attorney, #3 Exhibit 3 - Composite of Important Signed Documents)(Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Lawsuit by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dispute Resolution Program, #2 Exhibit 2 - Power of Attorney)(Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC. (Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC. (Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center. (Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Leon Carl Hagwood on behalf of SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, SavaSeniorCare, LLC, Rebecca Galey Strawn (Hagwood, Leon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Eaton on behalf of SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, SavaSeniorCare, LLC, Rebecca Galey Strawn (Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rebecca Galey Strawn. (Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SavaSeniorCare, LLC. (Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Resolution Program)(Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Resolution Program)(Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Resolution Program)(Eaton, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cocke County, TN, case number CT-35,371. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4047134), filed by Rebecca Galey Strawn, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center, SavaSeniorCare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 -Affidavit of Wynn Sims - Op Co, #4 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Wynn Sims - Admin, #5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Wynn Sims - Consulting, #6 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Wynn Sims - SSC, #7 Exhibit 6 -Affidavit of Rebecca Galey Strawn, #8 Exhibit 7- CT Service of Process Transmittal, #9 Exhibit 8 - Certified Copy of State Court Papers)(Eaton, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC et al (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Valentine
Represented By: Lucy Dunn Hooper
Represented By: M Chad Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare, LLC
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Galey Strawn
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?