Takoma Regional Hospital et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Amisub (SFH), Inc., Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC f/k/a Shelbyville Hospital Corporation, Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Lebanon HMA, Inc., Campbell County HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance f/k/a Johnson City Medical Center Hospital, Inc., Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc. f/k/a Tenet Health System Bartlett, Inc., Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Cocke County HMA, LLC, Tullahoma HMA, LLC f/k/a Tullahoma HMA, Inc., Takoma Regional Hospital, Wellmont Health System f/k/a BRMC/HVHMC, Inc., Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Lebanon HMA, LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Mountain States Health Alliance, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Wellmont Health System and Tullahoma HMA, LLC
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mark Timney, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Purdue Pharma L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Specgx, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., P & S Pharmacy, Allergan PLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Lowell B. Grizzle, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Alicia Naylor, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David A. Sackler, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Sharon Naylor, Russell Gasdia, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Gregory Madron, Craig Landau, Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Miami-Luken, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart Inc., John Stewart, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Andrew T. Stokes, Kathe A. Sackler, The Kroger Co., Jonathan D. Sackler, Noramco, Inc., Actavis LLC, Henry Babenco, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00157
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Notice of Preliminary Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Judge Drain Order Granting in Part Pl Motion)(Harbison, William)
October 17, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler OF BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER ENJOINING THE CONTINUATION OF THIS PROCEEDING AS TO THE INDIVIDUAL FORMER DIRECTORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Chapski, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 102 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance of Certain Attorneys for Plaintiffs Attorney Korey A Nelson and Lydia A Wright terminated. (Yelton, Rick) Modified on 10/16/2019 to reflect correct attorneys termed (AMP).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10-11-19. (KMG)
October 9, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4099252.) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (AMP)
October 8, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4099252.) by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Paul J. Cosgrove Certificate of Good Standing)(Spitler, Brian)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10-8-19. (KMG) Modified docket text on 10/9/2019 to reflect copy of Order mailed to Warren Burns and Rick Yelton (AMP).
October 7, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Burns. (SAC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Warren Burns (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt #C1017029.). (SAC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 97 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Kroger Limited Partnership II identifying Corporate Parent Kroger Co. for Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Hoeppner, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 96 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Kroger Co.. (Hoeppner, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Yelton. (SAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION, Certificate of Good Standing for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Yelton on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 90, paid, receipt number C107026.) (SAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 94 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Braden, Megan)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/4/19. (GRE)
October 3, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion to Remand [Dkt. No. 17] by Amisub (SFH), Inc., Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System. (Barrett, Don)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10-2-19. (KMG) (Gavel Order form mailed to Tinos Diamantatos, Jonathan Cuneo, Jennifer E. Kelly, and Yifei Li)Modified on 10/3/2019 to send out gavel order form (JCK).
October 1, 2019 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Meyer, Julie)
October 1, 2019 Filing 89 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Out-of-State Attorney David McMullan, Jr; Sterling Starns; Gerald M Abdalla, Jr and Richard Barrett terminated. (Barrett, Don)
October 1, 2019 Filing 88 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Out-of-State Attorney Monica Miller; David L Black and Mark H Dubester terminated. (Barrett, Don)
October 1, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tinos Diamantatos (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (LMC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC (d/b/a Saint Thomas Hospital for Specialty Surgery) by Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC (Barrett, Don)
September 30, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan W. Cuneo ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4090999.) filed by Mountain States Health Alliance, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Smyth County Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Amisub (SFH), Inc., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Norton Community Hospital, Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Wellmont Health System, Lebanon HMA, LLC, #85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer E. Kelly ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4091017.) filed by Mountain States Health Alliance, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Smyth County Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Amisub (SFH), Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Norton Community Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Clarksville Health System, G.P., Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Wellmont Health System, Lebanon HMA, LLC, #86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yifei Li ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4091035.) filed by Mountain States Health Alliance, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Smyth County Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Amisub (SFH), Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Norton Community Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Clarksville Health System, G.P., Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Wellmont Health System, Lebanon HMA, LLC (AMP)
September 27, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yifei Li ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4091035.) by Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Hospitals, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Barrett, Don)
September 27, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer E. Kelly ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4091017.) by Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Hospitals, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Barrett, Don)
September 27, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan W. Cuneo ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4090999.) by Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Hospitals, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Barrett, Don)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-25-19. (KMG) Modified on 9/26/2019 to reflect copy mailed to David Arlington, James Matthews, and Ana Francisco (AMP).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Janelle Geddes is terminated as counsel for Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP which continue to be represented by Sarah Conway and Christopher Lovrien, Jones Day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-25-19.This entry constitutes the order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. (KMG)
September 24, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Johnathan Tam; Mark S Cheffo and Rachel Rosenberg terminated. (Harbison, William)
September 24, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for James W. Matthews and Ana Francisco regarding document: #79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 G2011855) filed by Anda, Inc., #80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 G2011856) filed by Anda, Inc. (CAT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ana Francisco (Filing fee $ 90.00 G2011856) by Anda, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CAT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James W. Matthews (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011855) by Anda, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CAT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 Emergency MOTION to Remand , #50 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Remand Order in City of Worcester, #2 Exhibit 2 - Remand Order in County of Van Zandt, #3 Exhibit 3 - Remand Order in Weber County, UT, #4 Exhibit 4 - Remand Order in County of Lexington, #5 Exhibit 5 - Remand Order in County of Spartanburg, #6 Exhibit 6 - Remand Order in County of Greenville, #7 Exhibit 7 - Remand Order in County of Dallas, #8 Exhibit 8 - Remand Order in Brooke County Commission, et al., #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Regarding Remands (In Re National Prescription Opiate Litigation), #10 Exhibit 10 - Teleconference Transcript of 12.13.17 (In Re National Prescription Opiate Litigation), #11 Exhibit 11 - Remand Order in City of El Monte, et al.)(Barrett, Don)
September 23, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for David T. Arlington regarding document: #77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011854) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CAT)
September 23, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David T. Arlington (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011854) by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope) (CAT)
September 23, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Conway, Sarah)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #72 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-23-19. (KMG) Modified on 9/24/2019 to reflect copy mailed to Fazal Shere, Gabriele Wohl, Ronda Harvey, Unaiza Tyree, Steven Martino, Scott Powers, Kevin Sadler, and Kevin Marion (AMP).
September 23, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tinos Diamantatos (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011857) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Braden, Megan) Modified to reflect receipt number on 9/24/2019 (CAT).
September 20, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Wade V Davies on behalf of Craig Landau (Davies, Wade)
September 20, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorneys Scott D. Powers, Kevin M. Sadler, and Kevin H. Marino regarding document: #70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011849) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011847) filed by John Stewart, #71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011848) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CAT)
September 20, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin H. Marino (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011847) by John Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter) (CAT)
September 20, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin M. Sadler (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011848) by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CAT)
September 20, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorneys Fazal A. Shere, Gabriele Wohl, Ronda Harvey, and Unaiza Riaz Tyree regarding document: #56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Kroger Limited Partnership II, #57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Kroger Limited Partnership II, #59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Kroger Limited Partnership II, #58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Kroger Limited Partnership II (JCK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott D. Powers (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011849) by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CAT)
September 20, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Attorney Steven Martino regarding document: #69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc. (SAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Steven Martino (Filing fee $ 90 pd.) by Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Receipt #C1016988)(SAC)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-20-19. (KMG) Modified docket text to reflect copy of Gavel Order mailed to Brian M. Ercole and James K. O'Connor on 9/20/2019 (CAT).
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Brian M. Ercole regarding document: #66 re Supplement to #48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian M. Ercole ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4080999.) filed by Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (CAT)
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for James K. O'Connor regarding document: #67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011845) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (CAT)
September 19, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James K. O'Connor (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011845) by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope) (CAT)
September 19, 2019 Filing 66 SUPPLEMENT to #48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian M. Ercole ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4080999.) by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Babb, Edward)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-19-19. (KMG) Modified docket text to reflect Gavel Order mailed to Richard H. Blake on 9/19/2019 (CAT).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-19-19. (KMG) Modified docket text to reflect copy of Gavel Order mailed to Steven A. Reed on 9/19/2019 (CAT).
September 19, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) by The Kroger Co.. (Hoeppner, Joshua)
September 19, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) by The Kroger Co.. (Hoeppner, Joshua)
September 19, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) by The Kroger Co.. (Hoeppner, Joshua)
September 19, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) by The Kroger Co.. (Hoeppner, Joshua)
September 19, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number G2011846) by Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Hoeppner, Joshua) Modified on 9/20/2019 to add receipt number (JCK).
September 19, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number G2011846) by Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Hoeppner, Joshua) Modified on 9/20/2019 to add receipt number (JCK).
September 19, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number G2011846) by Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Hoeppner, Joshua) Modified on 9/20/2019 to add receipt number (JCK).
September 19, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number G2011846) by Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Hoeppner, Joshua) Modified on 9/20/2019 to add receipt number(JCK).
September 19, 2019 Filing 55 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Montgomery, Larry)
September 18, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorneys Steven A. Reed and Richard H. Blake regarding document: #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Reed, #54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (JCK)
September 18, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number G2011843) by Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Attachments: #1Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter)(JCK)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-18-19. (KMG) Modified docket text to reflect copy of Gavel order mailed to Elisa McEnroe, Coleen Meehan, Kelly Ann Moore, William R. Peterson, Jeremy G. Alpert, Sarah G. Conway, and Christopher Lovrien 9/18/2019(JCK).
September 17, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Meyer, Julie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Cardinal Health, Inc. of Filing Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Meyer, Julie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Summons 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Meyer, Julie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by Cardinal Health, Inc. of Filing Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Meyer, Julie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian M. Ercole ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4080999.) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Babb, Edward)
September 17, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Reed ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4080956.) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Babb, Edward)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #39 Notice. The instant action against Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P. and Purdue Pharma Inc. is hereby STAYED. The instant action against all other defendants, however, shall PROCEED AS USUAL. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/17/2019. (AML)
September 17, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Sarah G. Conway and Christopher Lovrien regarding document: #44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah G. Conway (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011837) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,, Wal-Mart Inc., #45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Lovrien (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011838) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,, Wal-Mart Inc. (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Lovrien (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011838) by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope) (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah G. Conway (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011837) by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope) (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Elisa P. McEnroe, Coleen Mary Meehan, Kelly Ann Moore, William R. Peterson and Jeremy G. Alpert regarding document: #42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy G. Alpert ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079667.) filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Coleen Mary Meehan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079626.) filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elisa P. McEnroe ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079609.) filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William R. Peterson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079659.) filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelly Anne Moore ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079639.) filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (CAT)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-16-19. (KMG) Modified docket text to reflect copy of Gavel order mailed to Megan Braden, John McCauley, William Hahn, Sarah Harmon, Sarah Benoit, William Padgett, John Haggerty, and Julie Meyer on 9/17/2019 (CAT).
September 16, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy G. Alpert ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079667.) by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Montgomery, Larry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William R. Peterson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079659.) by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Montgomery, Larry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelly Anne Moore ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079639.) by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Montgomery, Larry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Thomas, James)
September 16, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Coleen Mary Meehan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079626.) by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Montgomery, Larry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elisa P. McEnroe ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4079609.) by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Montgomery, Larry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Don Barrett on behalf of Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Barrett, Don)
September 16, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorneys John J. Haggerty and Megan R Braden regarding document: #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. Haggerty ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4078326.), #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4078605.) (JCK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4078605.) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Babb, Edward)
September 13, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. Haggerty ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4078326.) by Lowell B. Grizzle, P & S Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reis, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to J. Barrett; S. Starns; D. McMullan, Jr; R. Barrett; W. Burns; K. Nelson; L. Wright; R. Yelton; M. Miller; M. Dubester; D. Black; J. Kelly) (AMP)
September 13, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Hahn ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077344.) filed by H.D. Smith, LLC, #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Padgett ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077347.) filed by H.D. Smith, LLC (AMP)
September 12, 2019 Filing 32 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Eiselstein, Kyle)
September 12, 2019 Filing 31 Certificate of Corporate Interest by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Eiselstein, Kyle)
September 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Padgett ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077347.) by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Eiselstein, Kyle)
September 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Hahn ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4077344.) by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Eiselstein, Kyle)
September 12, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Benoit ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4076130.) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. . (AMP)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/11/2019. (SAC) Modified on 9/11/2019 Mailed Order to all unregistered counsel. (AWS)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/11/19. (JBR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Spitler, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spitler, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4076130.) by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Spitler, Brian)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Zachary C. Howenstine on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 09/10/2019. (KRS)
September 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for John A McCauley regarding document: #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011822) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (CAT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company. (Harbison, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward U Babb on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Babb, Edward)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John A McCauley (Filing fee $ 90.00. receipt number G2011822) by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope) (CAT)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/06/2019. (KRS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System. (Brewer, Gary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, LLC, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance, Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc., Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC, Smyth County Community Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tullahoma HMA, LLC, Wellmont Health System. (Brewer, Gary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Administrative Notice to Counsel. Attorneys Taylor Cates and Josh Hoeppner are admitted, but not registered. Please register for CM/ECF. Requirements due by 9/11/2019. (Copy of Notice mailed to Taylor Cates and Josh Hoeppner)(JCK)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/6/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to all attorneys not admitted and/or registered for CM/ECF)(JCK)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/6/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to all attorneys not admitted and/or registered for CM/ECF)(JCK)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/6/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to all attorneys not admitted and/or registered for CM/ECF) (JCK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by P & S Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reis, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by John W Reis on behalf of Lowell B. Grizzle, P & S Pharmacy (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reis, John) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct docket text (CNC).
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Reis on behalf of Lowell B. Grizzle, P & S Pharmacy (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reis, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Order mailed to T. Gearin; M. Cheffo; J. Tam; R. Rosenberg; K. Marino; L. Imes; C. Dysard; J. Porter; P. Cosgrove; S. Benoit; M. Braden; S. Reed; B. Ercole; T. Diamantatos; C. Lifland; J. McCauley; J. O'Connor; S. Powers; D. Arlington; K. Sadler; M. Roth; T. Knapp; Z. Ciullo; J. Matthews; A. Francisco; W. Padgett; R. Blake; J. Alpert; K. Moore; C. Meehan; E. McEnroe; W. Peterson; R. Harvey; F. Shere; U. Tyree; C. O'Croinin; J. Geddes; C. Lovrien; S. Conway; C. Dawson; J. Hergenrother) (AMP)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Evelyn Li, Steve Martino, Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.) (AMP)
September 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah Harmon ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4068803.) filed by Cardinal Health, Inc., #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4068796.) filed by Cardinal Health, Inc., #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4068784.) filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (AMP)
September 5, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Henry Schein, Inc.. (Morton, Cathy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C Howenstine on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Howenstine, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah Harmon ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4068803.) by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Howenstine, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4068796.) by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Howenstine, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4068784.) by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Howenstine, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Howenstine, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County, Tennessee at Greeneville, case number CC19CV295 BB. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4068695), filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Declara of Zachary Howenstine, #2 Other State Court File, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Howenstine, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takoma Regional Hospital et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James K O'Connor
Represented By: John A McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Fazal A Shere
Represented By: Unaiza Riaz Tyree
Represented By: Ronda L Harvey
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Joshua Vernon Hoeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: James G. Thomas
Represented By: Mark S Cheffo
Represented By: Johnathan Tam
Represented By: William J Harbison, II
Represented By: Rachel Rosenberg
Represented By: Aubrey B Harwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: Sarah G Conway
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Janelle Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Andrew J O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James G. Thomas
Represented By: Mark S Cheffo
Represented By: Johnathan Tam
Represented By: William J Harbison, II
Represented By: Rachel Rosenberg
Represented By: Aubrey B Harwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Cathy Honaker Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Alexander Cates
Represented By: Connor B O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: James G. Thomas
Represented By: Mark S Cheffo
Represented By: Johnathan Tam
Represented By: William J Harbison, II
Represented By: Rachel Rosenberg
Represented By: Aubrey B Harwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Megan R Braden
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P & S Pharmacy
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Represented By: John W Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Zachary A Ciullo
Represented By: Martin Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M Sadler
Represented By: David Arlington
Represented By: Scott D Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell B. Grizzle
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Represented By: John W Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Sarah M Benoit
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Represented By: Paul J Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Megan R Braden
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary C Howenstine
Represented By: Sarah E Harmon
Represented By: Timothy Gearin
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ingo W Sprie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Represented By: Julie B Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James K O'Connor
Represented By: John A McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Megan R Braden
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy G Alpert
Represented By: Coleen M Meehan
Represented By: Elisa P McEnroe
Represented By: Kelly A Moore
Represented By: William Peterson
Represented By: Larry H Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Madron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Represented By: Christopher W Dysard
Represented By: Linda Imes
Represented By: Wade V Davies
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Megan R Braden
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Represented By: Richard H Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Megan R Braden
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Maria Francisco
Represented By: James W Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Sarah G Conway
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Janelle Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Represented By: Kevin Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Roger W Dickson
Represented By: Meredith Corey Lee
Represented By: Kyle W Eiselstein
Represented By: Leah M Gerbitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Taylor Alexander Cates
Represented By: Connor B O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Taylor Alexander Cates
Represented By: Connor B O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew T. Stokes
Represented By: Joshua J Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Fazal A Shere
Represented By: Unaiza Riaz Tyree
Represented By: Ronda L Harvey
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Joshua Vernon Hoeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: Albert C Harvey
Represented By: Mark A Castleberry
Represented By: Robert F Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny A Hergenrother
Represented By: Cari K Dawson
Represented By: Daniel G Jarcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Megan R Braden
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Babenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah M Benoit
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Represented By: Paul J Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ingo W Sprie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: William E Padgett
Represented By: Meredith Corey Lee
Represented By: William Andrew Hahn
Represented By: Kyle W Eiselstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amisub (SFH), Inc.
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawkins County Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norton Community Hospital
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC f/k/a Shelbyville Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lebanon HMA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campbell County HMA, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain States Health Alliance f/k/a Johnson City Medical Center Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc. f/k/a Tenet Health System Bartlett, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cocke County HMA, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tullahoma HMA, LLC f/k/a Tullahoma HMA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takoma Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellmont Health System f/k/a BRMC/HVHMC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County HMA, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dickenson Community Hospital
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarksville Health System, G.P.
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lebanon HMA, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smyth County Community Hospital
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain States Health Alliance
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Hospital-Bartlett, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelbyville Hospital Company LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellmont Health System
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tullahoma HMA, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E Kelly
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Yifei Evelyn Li
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Steven Martino
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David L Black
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?