Agrawal v. Wang
Plaintiff: Anil K Agrawal
Defendant: Hui Wang and Elson Wang
Case Number: 2:2019cv00161
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/4/2019. (RET)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/23/19. (AWS)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2019 without courtroom deputy and court reporter. (AWS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hui Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Hui Wang, #2 Exhibit Deed)(Manes, David)
October 16, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference RESET for 10/23/2019 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough. (AML)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to attend case management conference by telephone. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/16/2019. (AML)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION Leave to Attend Case Management Conference by Telephone by Hui Wang. (Cobble, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dessauer, Mark)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Anil K Agrawal. (Dessauer, Mark)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anil K Agrawal. (Dessauer, Mark)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anil K Agrawal. (Dessauer, Mark)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Supplement re #7 Certification by Hui Wang. (Cobble, Jeffrey) Modified Event Type and linked Certification back to Motion to Dismiss on 9/23/2019 (CAT).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David M. Manes on behalf of Hui Wang. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/20/2019. (KRS) Modified docket text to reflect copy of Gavel Order mailed to David M. Manes on 9/23/2019 (CAT).
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hui Wang. (Cobble, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Administrative Notice to Counsel #7 MOTION to Dismiss : Please refile the Brief in Support of the Motion, Doc. 7 using the event Memorandum in Support of Motion under Filings in Support of Motion and link it back to Doc. 7. Requirements due by 9/25/2019. (CAT)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Hui Wang. (Attachments: #1 Other Brief)(Cobble, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for David Manes regarding document: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4081470.) filed by Hui Wang (CAT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4081470.) by Hui Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cobble, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Case Management Conference SET for 10/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/16/2019. (TRT)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/13/19. (JBR)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/12/19. (JBR)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/13/19. (JBR)
September 13, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington Co. Chancery Court, case number 19-CV-0607. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number G2011829 ), filed by Hui Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Other - Civil Cover Sheet)(Cobble, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/13/2019 to add receipt number for filing fee(JCK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agrawal v. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hui Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey A Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elson Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey A Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anil K Agrawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?