Beilharz v. USA
Petitioner: Joseph Beilharz
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00202
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Joseph Beilharz . (Attachments: #1 Documents from E.D. Va. Case No. 1:09-cr-105, #2 Documents from E.D. Tenn. Case No. 2:18-cr-103, #3 Documents from 4th Cir. Case No. 19-203, #4 Documents from 4th Cir. Case No. 19-310)(Breneman, Debra)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Joseph Beilharz. The United States is ORDERED to respond to the motion within thirty days of this Order's date. Although a reply to the United States' response is unnecessary, if Mr. Beilharz wishes to file a reply, he SHALL do so within thirty days of the date of the filing of the United States' response. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/18/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Joseph Beilharz) (AMP)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra A Breneman on behalf of USA (Breneman, Debra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Joseph Beilharz) (AMP)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Joseph Beilharz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 US Court of Appeals for Fourth Circuit Orders, #3 Application to Proceed, #4 Envelope)(AMP)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (AMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beilharz v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Debra A Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Beilharz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?