Taylor v. Social Security Administration Commissioner of (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Rebecca Janelle Taylor
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00203
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on US Attorney on 11/20/2019, filed by Rebecca Janelle Taylor. (Osterhout, Karl)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/19/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
November 15, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4130382.) filed by Rebecca Janelle Taylor as to Rebecca Janelle Taylor (SAC)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (SAC)
November 13, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4130382.) by Rebecca Janelle Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement CGS WD PA, #2 Supplement CGS Supreme Court, #3 Supplement Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4130346.), filed by Rebecca Janelle Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Social Security Administration Commissioner of (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Janelle Taylor
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?