Bunten v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Jo Ellen Bunten
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00215
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ellen Bunten. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 12/16/2019. (Smith, Harry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ellen Bunten. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 12/16/2019. (Smith, Harry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ellen Bunten. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 12/20/2019. (Smith, Harry)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (GRE)
December 11, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT Complaint against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4148479.), filed by Jo Ellen Bunten. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Smith, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunten v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ellen Bunten
Represented By: Harry J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?