Hobson v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lori Hobson
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00223
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Dial-in information will be circulated via e-mail. Please disregard any references in the attachment to in-person attendance.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/28/2020. (CMH)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Stipulated) by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Retherford, Jeremy)
January 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori Hobson. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 1/16/2020. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/27/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Yitzchak Zelman) (AMP)
December 27, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorney Yitzchak Zelman regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4170878.) filed by Lori Hobson (JCK)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4170878.) by Lori Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Other Cert of good standing)(Snyder, Brent)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Yitzchak Zelman. Notice serviced by mail. (GRE)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (GRE)
December 20, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (GRE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4168321.), filed by Lori Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collection Letter, #2 Other cover sheet, #3 Summons MCM)(Snyder, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobson v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Hobson
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Retherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?