Bellamy v. Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company (TV1)
Plaintiff: Paul Bellamy
Defendant: Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00226
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by Paul Bellamy.(Minor, Daniel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company Service of Initial Disclosures (Kinsman, N)
February 11, 2020 Filing 13 Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Notice of Non-Consent / Consent form in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kinsman, N)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company (Kinsman, N)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 4/13/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/30/20. (JBR)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kinsman, N)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company. (Kinsman, N)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/27/2019. (JCK)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/27/2019. (JCK)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/27/2019. (JCK)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel. Civil Cover Sheet not included. Please file a completed civil cover sheet using the event Supplement found in the category Other Documents and link it back to the Notice of Removal. Requirements due by 1/2/2020. (JCK)
December 27, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (JCK)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Co for Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company. (Kinsman, N)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sullivan County Chancery Court, case number 19-CK42195(R). (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4172630), filed by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Petition for Declaratory Judgment)(Kinsman, N)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellamy v. Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: N Mark Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bellamy
Represented By: Daniel B Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?