Daley v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (TV2)
Plaintiff: James M. Daley
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00096
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all remaining Defendants by James M. Daley (Lee, Alan)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The motion [Doc. 7] is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint [Doc. 1] on or before Monday, June 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 06/09/2020. (CAT)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Fisher, Russell)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James M. Daley. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 5/11/2020. (Lee, Alan)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/07/2020. (CAT)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/07/2020. (CAT)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/07/2020. (CAT)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (CAT)
May 7, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4333303.), filed by James M. Daley. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daley v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Daley
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?