O'Donnell v. Sullivan County et al (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Bethany O'Donnell
Defendant: Captain Lee Carswell, Sullivan County, Joseph Tomes, Nickolas Kolonis, John Doe, Cory Tate, Anna Whaley, Cody Altman, Steven Hayes, Carrie Phillips, Cheyenne Brewer, Robert Rosenbaum, Jeff Cassidy, Trisha Conn, Reagan Brooks, Jane Doe and Lee Carswell
Case Number: 2:2020cv00151
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 32 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Bethany O'Donnell as to Jane Doe. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 2, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Bethany O'Donnell as to John Doe. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Counsel for Defendants filed a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond [Doc. 28] averring that all parties have agreed to an extension of the deadline for Defendants to file their response to the Complaint [Doc. 1]. The motion [Doc. 28] is GRANTED, and Defendants are ORDERED to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint [Doc. 1] on or before September 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 09/02/2020. (CAT)
September 2, 2020 Filing 29 Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Certificate of Service, #10 Certificate of Service : Proof of Service has not been completed. Please indicate on page two of proof of service whether or not Summons has been executed or unexecuted. Refile completed Summons using event Summons returned executed or unexecuted. Requirements due by 9/8/2020. (CAT)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #15 Summons Returned Executed as to USA by Jeff Cassidy(Sheriff, Official Capacity as Sheriff of Sullivan County, Tennessee), Jeff Cassidy(Sheriff, Indvidually), Sullivan County. (Miller, Jimmie)
September 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmie C Miller on behalf of Jeff Cassidy(Sheriff, Official Capacity as Sheriff of Sullivan County, Tennessee), Jeff Cassidy(Sheriff, Indvidually), Sullivan County (Miller, Jimmie)
September 1, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Reagan Brooks(Individual Capacity) served on 8/10/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Cory Tate(Official Capacity as Corrections Officer for Sullivan County ) served on 8/14/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Nickolas Kolonis(Individual Capacity ) served on 8/10/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Cheyenne Brewer(Official Capacity as Corrections Officer for Sullivan County ) served on 8/10/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Carrie Phillips(Official Capacity as Corrections Officer for Sullivan County ) served on 8/10/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Anna Whaley(Individual Capacity) served on 8/10/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Robert Rosenbaum(Sgt., Individual Capacity ) served on 8/10/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Cody Altman(Official Capacity as Corrections Officer for Sullivan County ) served on 8/10/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- WRONG CASE-SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Reagan Brooks(Individual Capacity) served on 8/7/2020. (Seaton, Anthony) Modified on 9/1/2020 (KDO).
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Lee Carswell(Captain, Individual Capacity ) served on 8/7/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Jeff Cassidy(Sheriff, Official Capacity as Sheriff of Sullivan County, Tennessee) served on 8/7/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Sullivan County served on 8/7/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Trisha Conn(Sgt., Official Capacity as Corrections Officer for Sullivan County ) served on 8/7/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Steven Hayes(Individual Capacity ) served on 8/7/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethany O'Donnell. Joseph Tomes(Official Capacity as Corrections Officer for Sullivan County ) served on 8/7/2020. (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bethany O'Donnell (Seaton, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bethany O'Donnell (Seaton, Anthony)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 08/10/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Ryan Sarr) (CAT)
August 4, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Bethany O'Donnell (ABF)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Ryan Sarr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bethany O'Donnell. (Attorney is pending admission; no fee required) (ABF)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/16/20. (JBR)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/16/20. (JBR)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/16/20. (JBR)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JBR)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMATIONAL ONLY Administrative Notice to Thomas Smith: For future reference, please use the most up-to-date Civil Cover Sheet form found on our website. (JBR)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Ryan L. Sarr is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (JBR)
July 16, 2020 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (JBR)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4414176.), filed by Bethany O'Donnell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons)(Smith, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Donnell v. Sullivan County et al (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Lee Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan County
Represented By: Daniel P Street
Represented By: Jimmie C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Tomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickolas Kolonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cassidy
Represented By: Daniel P Street
Represented By: Jimmie C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reagan Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany O'Donnell
Represented By: Thomas Jackson Smith
Represented By: Johnathan A Minga
Represented By: Anthony A Seaton
Represented By: Ryan L Sarr
Represented By: Kenneth W Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?