Hall v. USA
Petitioner: Amber Lynn Hall
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00153
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. This matter is before the Court on the United States Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. 6]. The motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/18/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Taylor, Donald)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy. This matter is before the Court on Petitioner Amber Lynn Hall's Motion Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy [Doc. 2]. The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of Ms. Hall's 2255 motion to her, along with a copy request notice for future reference. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2020. (Copy of Order, 2255 Motion and Copy Request Notice mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Petitioner Amber Lynn Hall's Motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Her Sentence [Doc. 1]. The United States is ORDERED to respond to the motion within thirty days of this Order's date. See Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings for the United States District Courts. Although a reply to the United States' response is unnecessary, if Ms. Hall wishes to file a reply, she SHALL do so within thirty days of the date of the filing of the United States response. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (AMP)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy by Amber Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Amber Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
July 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (AMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amber Lynn Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Donald W Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?