Figueroa et al v. Life Foundations, Inc. (TV2)
Plaintiff: David Vanover, Janice Figueroa, Linda Hurd, Leslie Cantrell and Steven Raleigh
Defendant: Life Foundations, Inc. doing business as Alternative Correctional Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv00154
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Leslie Cantrell, Janice Figueroa, Linda Hurd, Steven Raleigh, David Vanover Notice of Service (Haden, Gregory)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Life Foundations, Inc. Notice of Service (Cope, Jon)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Life Foundations, Inc.. (Cope, Jon)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Life Foundations, Inc.. (Cope, Jon)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cope, Jon)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Life Foundations, Inc.., filed by David Vanover, Janice Figueroa, Linda Hurd, Steven Raleigh, Leslie Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Haden, Gregory)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Pursuant to E.D. Tenn. L.R. 12.1 by Life Foundations, Inc.. (Cope, Jon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Life Foundations, Inc. Subpoena to Produce (Cope, Jon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Vanover, Janice Figueroa, Linda Hurd, Steven Raleigh, Leslie Cantrell. Life Foundations, Inc. served on 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Humphreys, James)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Life Foundations, Inc.. (Cope, Jon)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M Cope on behalf of Life Foundations, Inc. (Cope, Jon)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 16, 2020. (SAC)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 16, 2020. (SAC)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 16, 2020. (SAC)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Foundations, Inc.. (SAC)
July 16, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (SAC)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Foundations, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4415741.), filed by David Vanover, Janice Figueroa, Linda Hurd, Steven Raleigh, Leslie Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons)(Humphreys, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa et al v. Life Foundations, Inc. (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vanover
Represented By: Richard Dudley Kennedy
Represented By: James NL Humphreys
Represented By: Gregory K Haden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Figueroa
Represented By: Richard Dudley Kennedy
Represented By: James NL Humphreys
Represented By: Gregory K Haden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hurd
Represented By: Richard Dudley Kennedy
Represented By: James NL Humphreys
Represented By: Gregory K Haden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Cantrell
Represented By: Richard Dudley Kennedy
Represented By: James NL Humphreys
Represented By: Gregory K Haden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Raleigh
Represented By: Richard Dudley Kennedy
Represented By: James NL Humphreys
Represented By: Gregory K Haden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Foundations, Inc. doing business as Alternative Correctional Services
Represented By: Jon M Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?