Breault v. Epou
Plaintiff: Christina Chalreo Breault
Defendant: Agbe Ben Epou
Case Number: 2:2020cv00190
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Christina Chalreo Breault re #10 Mail Returned, #9 Mail Returned. (LCK)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable/Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. Mail sent to Christina Chalreo Breault re #4 Order Governing Depositions, #5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, #3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address, #6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. (AMP)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable/Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. Mail sent to Christina Chalreo Breault re #8 Order and Report and Recommendation. (AMP)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christina Chalreo Breault. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint without prepayment of costs or fees. The Clerk shall not issue process, however at this time. As set forth above, federal courts are courts of limited jurisdiction and Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate that her claims against Defendant are the type over which this Court may assume jurisdiction; therefore, it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. 2] be DISMISSED without prejudice so that Plaintiff may bring her action in an appropriate forum if she so chooses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 10/16/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Christina Breault) (AMP)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint by Christina Chalreo Breault. (CAT)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/11/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Christina Chalreo Breault)(JCK)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/11/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Christina Chalreo Breault) (JCK) Modified on 9/11/2020 (JCK).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/11/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Christina Chalreo Breault)(JCK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (Copy of Notice mailed to Christina Chalreo Breault)(JCK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Agbe Ben Epou (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Christina Chalreo Breault. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(JCK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christina Chalreo Breault. (JCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breault v. Epou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Chalreo Breault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agbe Ben Epou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?