Young v. Venable
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Richard S. Venable
Case Number: 2:2020cv00226
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/18/2020. (BJL)*Mailed to Huguette Nicole Young
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Judgment by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3). (LCK)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT re #6 Memorandum & Opinion. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/9/20. Serviced via US Mail to Ms. Young.(KFB)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Motions 2,3 & 4 are DENIED AS MOOT. AN APPROPRIATE JUDGMENT WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/9/20. Serviced via US Mail to Ms. Young.(KFB)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (copy mailed to Huguette Nicole Young at 24968 Lawrence Rd Junction City, OR 97448-8526) (JBR)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Email Filing and Notification by Huguette Nicole Young. (JBR)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Speedy Hearing Under Rule 57 of Fed. R. Civ. P. by Huguette Nicole Young. (JBR)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Huguette Nicole Young. (JBR)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Richard S. Venable, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Service Packet for Issuance)(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?