Curtis v. Alcoa Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Claudia D Beck, Vernie F Beals, Harold G Woods, John C Van, Hook, Linda G Collatt, Ronnie D Whitmire, Calvin D Peterson, Billy W Birchfield, Henry A Payne, Billy R Potter, Glenn T Myers, Rita Boyea, Ronald D Schneden, Jean Plowman Stoupe, Wendell R Everley, Rudolph L Vickery, Oval Monroe Ledbetter, Jr, James L Kuehn, Manuel Branch, Jr., William Joe Grimes, Richard B Swick, Clyde R Devine, William E Willingham, Ronald J Dubritsky, Garry LaBarge, Jackie Neal Pelton, Donald C Wear, Evelyn McKenzie, William F Holmes, Charles McGinnis, William E Leonard, Geter P Jenkins, Jr, Larry Wayne Jones, Charles F Sheets, Lee A Gardner, Dexter Lee Collins, Phillip N Titzer, Darrell Rottier Sr, Charles G Gardner, David W Roes, Debra Martin, Ernest L Jennings, Daniel C McCord, Harold Parks, Daniel R Rakes, Stanley W Daywalt, Frankie W Weaver, Edsel F Marsh, Jr, James W Clauson, Loren R Kaetzel, Clarence Ross Bensing, Danny K Ahrens, John A Kaczinski, Dana Jerome Zeller, Wanda C Strunk, Forrest E Buckley, Richard L Brown, Tillman J Culp, Michael R Greaser, Donald J Luttenegger, Patricia S Angermeier, John B Coder, Bruce A Bolton, Bob G Huskey, Michael McIntosh, Albert W Jones, Donald A Niehaus, Herman E Fields, Wayne E Wilming, William P Fisher, William J Davis, Melvin Bridges, Rosella A Houchins, Robert E Reinart, Thomas M Berrong, Bill Beck, Gerald W Garrett, Billy L Reagan, Jimmy J Holloway, Raymond W Radford, Ambrose Allen Watts, Marshall E Hurst, Bobby G Dyke, Dillon Monroe Mauldin, John Taylor Reed, Jr, Delmar I Byrd, Robert Eugene Elrod, Elmer Stormer Jr, Neal C O.Neal, Billy D Gulledge, Donald L Titzer, Roy L Watkins, Johnny C Wade, James E Martin, Charles Bradam, Roger Lawrence Sr, Ella Gramiling Carpenter, Ralph Goodson, William L Kincaid, Carolyn S Willis, Johnny Allison, Claude C Cochran, Miri Beckstead, Ronald D Taylor, Thomas J Snyder, Scott Beslanowitch, Alice Whirley, Llama L Welchance, Larry D Fleming, Thomas Davis, Lola A Beren, Dwight Lee Wagoner, Steven L Downing, Frank Carpenter, James L Reynolds, James W Dant, David L Fox, Jonathan C Myers, Wilburn L Jenkins, Billie R Vaughn, Carl M Brennan, Douglas Standridge, Charles W Stuteville, Benjamin H Dunn, Jr, Roy G Congrove, Gary W Huff, Jackie L Berry, George Edward Bowen, Charles E Hattenbach, Leonard W Long, Dennis L Brackin, Dallas E Maxwell, Michael Craven Swaringen, Ray McCaffrey, Robert P Boore, William Marlowe, James Franklin, Herbert G Kramer, Theodore (Ted) Whisler, Charles H Martin, Gregory L Cackler, Arlin G Corum, Elmer L Breeden, James D Reed, June C Millsaps, Gilbert D Whitehall, Lonnie P Hartsell, Ira Grimes, Howard Seager, Richard G Rawlings, Bobby L Samples, Shirley Ridings and Guy E Penna
Defendant: Alcoa Inc.
Case Number: 3:2006cv00448
Filed: November 17, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2015 ALL EXHIBITS MAINTAIN BY THE CLERK'S OFFICE ARE WITHDRAWN AND DESTROYED. (JDH)
April 17, 2015 Filing 611 NOTICE to Parties re Trial Exhibits (JDH)
July 29, 2014 Filing 610 NOTICE by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. re #530 Bill of Costs, NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL (Lucas, John)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 609 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; plaintiffs objections #605 are hereby OVERRULED in their entirety, whereby the R&R #604 is ACCEPTED IN WHOLE. Thus, plaintiffs' motion for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses in this case #586 is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/26/14. (ADA)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER granting #601 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Sarah Catapano-Friedman. Attorney Sarah Catapano-Friedman is RELIEVED of her duties as counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on June 10, 2014. (RLK)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER granting #602 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney John T. Winemiller. Attorney John T. Winemiller is RELIEVED of his duties as counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on June 10, 2014. (RLK)
June 5, 2014 Filing 606 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #604 Report and Recommendations, ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Objections To The Report And Recommendations Of The Magistrate Judge") filed by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Chesler, Evan)
May 19, 2014 Filing 605 OBJECTION to #604 Report and Recommendations, filed by Charles Curtis. (Hughes, John)
May 6, 2014 Filing 604 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #586 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Charles Curtis be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on May 6, 2014. (RLK)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge Pamela L Reeves for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/23/2014. (KMK, )
April 3, 2014 Filing 602 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc by Attorney John T. Winemiller. (RLK)
April 2, 2014 Filing 601 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sarah Catapano-Friedman by Lindle R Alexander, Randell G Alexander, Raymond E Allega, Donald R Allen, Joseph W Allen, Michael Richard Allen, Richard W Allen, Sr, Johnny Allison, Coy Kenneth Almond, Reggie Lavon Almond, Robert Dolen Almond, William Almond, William D Almond, Donald H Alms, Harold C Alton, Robert W Alvey, Wayne Ames, Dennis F Anderson, Shirley L Anderson, James Andies, Carey Angel, Donald M Angerer, Patricia S Angermeier, Rose Ann, E, Joseph L Anthony, Henry Arkenberg, Charles W Armstrong, Bennie R Arnold, Lawrence W Arnold, Harold Arp, Rudolph H Arp, Ronnie G Arterberry, B J Ashbrook, Gene E Ashby, Randall T Ashby, James Wayne Ashcraft, Robert D Ashcraft, James D Ashley, Edward Ashton, Billy R Atkins, Raymond E Auger, Fred R Ausbrooks, Samuel C Austin, W Scott Awkerman, John Paul Axley, Gerald Ayotte, Kenneth K Baehl, Craig Bagnato, Clifford W Bagwell, Jack L Bailey, Richard L Bailey, Ross Bailey, Samuel L Baines, Robert P Baird, Ted Baird, Donald J Baker, Donald J. Baker, Patti Baker, Alica Rose Balding, Arvin Frank Baldwin, Lowell T Ball, Charlie Ballard, Jack R Ballew, Harvey R Banks, Patrick J Barber, Doyle W Barbra, Anna M Bard, Fred F Barker, Jr, David J Barnes, George G Barnes, Sr, Leo V Barnes, Charles F Barnett, Dennis R Barnett, Donna K Barnett, Ervin T Barnett, Larry E Barnett, Vernon P Barnett, Maurice Barney, Paul E Barrett, Charlie Calvin Barringer, Joe J Barroso, Rebecca Barse, James M Bartosh, William Bartscher, Leonard Bashaw, Chester L Bass, Cleveland L Bass, Ralph O Bass, Sharon Bassett, James Thomas Bates, Jr, James D Bates, Richard E Bates, John D Baud, Jr, Kenneth W Bauer, William L Baugh, Oran P Baumgardner, John Franklin Baxley, Jackie Wayne Baxter, James W Baxter, Lonna J Beal, Vernie F Beals, Jimmie C Bean, Allan B Bearbower, Thomas W Beardsley, James E Beasley, Charles E Beatty, Harold W Beaty, Fernand R Beauchamp, Michael W Beaver, Arlo Nemitz Beck, Bill Beck, Billy Ray Beck, Claudia D Beck, Miri Beckstead, John A Beeman, Larry Lee Behne, Thomas Behrensmeyer, Shirley Belgarde, Earl Belile, Gary W Bell, Glenn D Bell, Billy W Belt, Floyd Lee Bennett, Larry E Bennett, Wayne Bennett, Clarence Ross Bensing, Lola A Beren, Helen C Bernstein, Thomas M Berrong, Charles E Berry, Sr, Jackie L Berry, James Berry, Joe A Berry, Edward E Bertke, Fred Daniel Bertrand, Eugene W Besancon, Elizabeth Besaw, Paul F Beslanowitch, Scott Beslanowitch, Ben C Best, Earl Best, Jr, Charles W Beverly, Joe Bible, Robert K Bible, Ronnie J Bible, William J Biedenkopf, Ronald G Biggs, Billy W Birchfield, Walter D Birchfield, Terry L Bird, David P Bitterman, Charles E Black, Harley Blair, Robert A Blake, William Frank Blalock, Jr, Albert E Blanford, Jr, Earl Blevins, William S Blevins, Michael T Blissett, James W Blubaugh, Geraldine L Blume, William C Boarman, Franklin D Bockting, Andor Bocskor, Theodore W Bogard, Charles R Boling, Donald Boling, Harrel R Boling, Richard Boling, Jimmy Don Bolt, Bruce A Bolton, William Bond, Judy W Bono, Robert P Boore, Richard Bordeau, Carl D Boring, Doral C Boring, Orville C Boring, Charles W Botkin, Carl Boulds, Everett R Bowen, George Edward Bowen, Hoyt R Bowerman, Jimmy Lee Bowers, Paul E Bowers, Sr, Daniel W Bowling, Laurance L Bowling, Cary L Bowlyou, Michael R Boyd, Winford G Boyd, Rita Boyea, Douglas W Boyer, David K Boyles, James R Boyles, Sr, Dennis L Brackin, Charles Bradam, Jerry L Bradley, Joe M Bradley, Manuel Branch, Jr, Ralph L Brandenberger, Willie B Branning, George Eugene Branum, Rodney D Bratcher, Merle Leo Brauer, Ronald E Bray, Jackie Darrell Brazil, Elmer L Breeden, Carl M Brennan, James G Brenton, William J Brewer, Melvin Bridges, Michael W Briggs, George I Brinkley, Kermit D Brinkley, Larry G Britt, James D Brock, Stephen M Brooks, Carolyn M Brothers, Roger Brothers, Artis Phillip Brown, Charles A Brown, Dennis Brown, Don M Brown, Duane Lee Brown, Fred H Brown, Harry W Brown, III, Ina Clarene Brown, James A Brown, Larry Brown, Lloyd E Brown, Margaret H Brown, Richard L Brown, Richard Seth Brown, Shirley R Brown, Viola M Brown, Wayne R Brown, William Marion Brown, William A Brown, Charles B Browning, Lawrence L Brumitt, Charles Bryant, Donald C Bryant, James S Bryant, Minnie F Bryant, William - Bryant, Clarence Edward Bryels, Clyde R Bryson, Ronald P Buck, Forrest E Buckley, Michael E Buescher, Dawn Buffham, Robert S Bullard, Victor Dale Burch, Melvin C Burchell, Wayne A Burchett, Gordon T Burchfield, Harry Lee Burchfield, R V Burchfield, George W Burden, Jr, Ralph L Burdine, Steven F Burgess, Glenn R Burkepile, Linda J Burks, Joseph McCam Burl, Keith Douglas Burleson, Curtis Lavoy Burnett, Howard Busch, Bobby D Butler, Earl Butler, Hilton Bledsoe Butler, Robert Louis Butler, Wilbert Butler, David Byrd, Delmar I Byrd, Sukye Y Byrd, Darrell G Cable, Doyle E Cackler, Gregory L Cackler, Euclid Cadrette, Willie Grover Cagle, Daniel H Caldwell, Glenda Kay Caldwell, Norman R Caldwell, Rondal W Calhoun, Gerald L Callaway, Charles Roy Callender, Frankie Calvin, Samuel E Calvin, Charles C Cambron, Bruce E Cameron, Roy E Camp, Donald E Campbell, Douglas Campbell, Judy F Campbell, Rosalie Campbell, Ted C Campbell, Robert L Canada, Robert C Canaday, Gary Cannon, Leslie W Cannon, Gregory L Canright, Elmer Jr Capel, Elijah Junior Caraway, Joseph R Carnes, Ella Gramiling Carpenter, Ella Carpenter, Frank Carpenter, Jethro Carpenter, Joseph H Carpenter, Orville D Carpenter, Robert L Carpenter, Ronald P Carpenter, Tony A Carpenter, Bonnie Carr, Mary R Carrillo, Charles Carroll, Larry E Carroll, Richard E Carroll, Robert D Carroll, Charles Thomas Carter, Gary Carter, James E Carter, Leonard Floyd Cartwright, Kenneth L Carver, Walter Carver, James J Casel, Donald H Cash, Jimmy W Cash, Margaret Cash, Robert L Casteel, Herschel E Caswell, Buddy Cathcart, Paulette Cauble, Ronald G Cavins, Robert H Cawley, Sherman H Cays, James G Cearlock, Jon A Chamberlain, James D Chambers, Randy Chambers, John W Chandler, Theodore Chandler, Barbara Jean Chaney, George Chapman, Larry Chapman, Robert Charland, George T Chenault, Lester Norman Chesney, Albert Chiltn, Daniel Leroy Christian, Daniel Leroy Christian, John W Christian, Harold G Chronister, Gerald W Chrostowski, Curtis C Church, Henry Cissna, Danford Clark, Joseph B Clark, Ralph E Clark, Ronald Clark, Robert W Clausheide, James W Clauson, John Walter Clegg, Sr, Matt Allen Clegg, Elvy Clements, Ralph M Clemmons, Jeff Clendenen, Diane Clift, Jackie Alan Cloud, David E Clouse, Kenneth Clure, Marvie J Clure, Roy T Cobb, William B Coburn, Jr, Claude C Cochran, Jackie L Cochran, John B Coder, Lonnie Cole, Jr, Jerry F Coleman, Ronald G Coleman, George Alvin Collatt, Kenneth David Collatt, Linda G Collatt, Sherman R Collatt, Howard Lee Collier, Charles L Collins, Dexter Lee Collins, Donnal Collins, Ernest A Collins, Ollis Lynn Colvin, Richard W Colvin, Malinda A Compton, Roy G Congrove, Edward D Conklin, Thomas P Conly, Sr, Coy G Connatser, David R Connell, Willard R Conner, Marlene Converse, Merle Converse, Gary V Cook, John Henry Cook, Lowell E Cook, Larry P Cooke, James R Coomes, Thomas E Coomes, William P Coomes, Jr, Jack David Cooper, James W Cooper, James N Cooper, Kenneth E Cooper, Lorene W Cooper, Donnie Cope, John O Corbell, Richard N Corbin, Lynn S Cordell, Janet Corkland, Robert Dean Corlett, Johnnie M Cornmesser, Arlin G Corum, Francis Cota, Darrel D Cotton, Edwin R Coulter, Reagan Coulter, Donald R Covington, Jack L Cox, Larry M Crabtree, Darrell Creek, Stacy L Creek, James Richard Cresswell, JH Crites, Bill Cromwell, Claude A Crossley, Daniel E Crow, Adelaide Crowe, Joseph Crowley, Bernard Walter Crump, Roy Crump, Dale A Culbertson, Floyd Walter Culp, James Culp, Tillman J Culp, Gary Joe Cummings, Lewis W Cummins, David Cunningham, Kenneth M Cunningham, Phillip Cunningham, Sheldon Cunningham, Donald L Cupp, Mary Emma Cupp, James M Curdiff, Terry D Curl, Larry Dean Curley, Sharon Curran, Charles Curtis, John Curtis, Don Cutshaw, Patricia F Dailey, Leland Dame, Marvin R Dame, Paul R Dammeier, Ruth Jean Damon, William Dampier, James W Dant, Robert E Dash, Margaret Dashnaw, Richard Ronald Daugherty, Charles E Davenport, Bonnie M Davis, Daniel F Davis, Donald D Davis, Donald T Davis, Kenneth I Davis, Larry Davis, Rex G Davis, Robert L Davis, Talley S Davis, Thomas Davis, Vernon L Davis, Walter Kenneth Davis, William J Davis, David D Dawson, Sr, Edward N Dawson, John R Day, Victor L Day, Stanley W Daywalt, Austin DeFord, Gerald L DeLoose, Vertis E Deal, Larry R Dearing, James G Deaton, Jr, Howard W Deeter, Frederick J Dennhardt, Clyde R Devine, David C Devine, Edward L Devine, Leslie Dicken, Patrick L Dilger, Robert L Dirks, Jimmy D Dishman, Larry A Dittmer, Dennis W Dixon, Emmett W Dixon, John L Doak, Conley Dockery, Creed Dockery, Dean Dockery, Donald C Dockery, Isaac M Dockery, Willie James Dockery, Kathryn Dodd, Richard Dodge, Floyd Donnelly, Allen Douglass, Christopher Downey, George Downey, Steven L Downing, Pricilla Irene Drake, Shirley G Drake, Anthony Drefchinski, Owen W Drewlinger, Clara J Drinnen, Thomas Driscoll, Jack S Drobena, Gordon Drum, Sherrill Edwin Drye, Victoria F Drye, John J DuPont, Ronald J Dubritsky, Richard R Dueman, Sr, William K Dufault, Jackie Duff, Charles Dumas, Darrell D Duncan, Delbert F Duncan, Donnis Ray Duncan, Howard Evert Duncan, Donald E Dunlap, Leroy Dunlap, William A Dunlap, Benjamin H Dunn, Jr, Billy E Dunn, Glenn A Dunn, Daniel Durant, Henry Durant, Howard Durgan, Richard C Durgy, Andrew J Duvall, Bobby G Dyke, Garry W Dykes, Jimmy L. Dykes, Moreane Eakins, Malcolm D Eble, R. W. Edgeman, Terry A Edmondson, Morris Randy Edmonson, John E Edwards, Montie R Edwards, Darrell Clinton Efird, William Gary Efird, Harvy J Ehlers, David A Ellerbrook, David C Elliot, John A Elliott, Robert P Elliott, Fred Ellis, James C Ellis, Jr, Thomas R Ellis, Doyie V Ellison, Robert Eugene Elrod, Ronnie Gene Elrod, David Embry, Danny N Emmert, Jerry Ray Endsley, Robert L Endsley, Richard B Engley, Richard K English, Charlotte M Enlow, Ronald L Enlow, Charles D Ensor, John D Estes, Sharon R Evan, Dennis R Evans, Fred Q Evans, Kirby Glen Evans, Loretta A Evans, Michael L Evans, Patricia A Evans, Robert D Evans,
February 25, 2014 Filing 600 LETTER from U.S Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari is denied - Supreme Court case number 13-728. (AYB)
December 26, 2013 Filing 599 LETTER - Petition for Writ of Certiorari Filed - Supreme Court, case number 13-728, (KMK, )
October 31, 2013 Filing 598 Letter from Attorney Mona Lisa Wallace re: Leave. (ABF)
October 25, 2013 Filing 597 RESPONSE in Opposition re #586 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Award Of Attorney's Fees And Expenses") filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Chesler, Evan)
October 23, 2013 Filing 596 OBJECTION #585 Objection, Plaintiffs' Surreply to Alcoa's Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs filed by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting #594 Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs SHALL FILE Doc. 594-1 in the record as their sur-reply on or before Oct. 28, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr. on 10/23/13. (This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry.) (LWM)
October 22, 2013 Filing 594 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Alcoa's Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Other Attachment 1 -Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Attachment 2 - Proposed Order)(Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 10/22/2013 (ABF).
October 18, 2013 Filing 593 REPLY to Response to Motion re #591 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Reply To Plaintiffs' Objection To Defendant's Request For Bill Of Costs"--ECF Docket No. 530) filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Chesler, Evan)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER granting #591 Motion for Leave to File Document. The Defendant SHALL FILE Doc. 591-1 as its reply in CM/ECF on or before Oct. 25, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr. on 10/18/13. (This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry.) (LWM)
October 15, 2013 Filing 591 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs)(Chesler, Evan)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #586 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Charles Curtis referred to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley, Jr., USMJ.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/11/13. (ABF)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Thomas W Phillips no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/11/13. (ABF)
October 8, 2013 Filing 588 PROPOSED Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses #586 by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 10/9/2013 (AYB).
October 8, 2013 Filing 587 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #586 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Declaration of Gregory F. Coleman, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Mona Wallace, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Catapano Friedman, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Declaration of Daniel Henry, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Declaration of Michael Stotlar, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Declaration of Ernest Kemper Jr., #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Declaration of Charles Curtis, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Declaration of Dennis Macy, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Hilko Report, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Altman Report, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - Altman Supplemental Report)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 8, 2013 Filing 586 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory)
October 8, 2013 Filing 585 OBJECTION to #530 Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs and Memorandum in Opposition to Bill of Costs filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Michael Stotlar, #2 Appendix) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified to add docket relationship on 10/9/2013 (AYB).
September 24, 2013 Filing 584 NOTICE of the Clerk re #530 Bill of Costs. Counsel are DIRECTED to file with the Court within fourteen days of the date of this Notice a report on the status of costs and/or to file supplemental briefs in support of the Bill of Costs and any objections. If no such filing is made, costs shall be deemed to have been waived. (AYB)
September 23, 2013 Filing 583 DEFENDANT ALCOA INC.S REPORT ON THE STATUS OF COSTS by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Chesler, Evan) Modified text on 9/24/2013 (AYB).
September 20, 2013 Filing 582 MANDATE of USCA affirming the District Court Decision as to #542 Notice of Appeal (ABF)
August 2, 2013 Filing 581 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sarah Catapano-Friedman (Catapano-Friedman, Sarah)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER of USCA recalling the Mandate issued on 5/23/13 re #542 plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal. (AYB)
May 23, 2013 Filing 579 MANDATE of USCA as to #542 plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal. (AYB)
May 9, 2013 Filing 578 Informational Copy from USCA affirming the decision of the District Court re #542 Notice of Appeal. Mandate to issue. (AYB)
October 9, 2012 Filing 577 NOTICE by Alcoa Inc. (Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 DX 5, #2 DX 7, #3 DX 17, #4 DX 18, #5 DX 20, #6 DX 71, #7 DX 177, #8 DX 152, #9 DX 180, #10 DX 331, #11 DX 346, #12 DX 347, #13 DX 351)(Gruenstein, Benjamin)
September 7, 2012 Filing 576 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List, PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 DX 13, #2 DX 362)(Coleman, Gregory)
September 6, 2012 Filing 575 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List, PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 DX3, #2 DX4, #3 DX15, #4 DX16, #5 DX18, #6 DX21, #7 DX53, #8 DX64, #9 DX128, #10 DX159, #11 DX330, #12 DX361, #13 DX363, #14 DX366, #15 DX369, #16 DX502)(Coleman, Gregory)
September 5, 2012 Filing 574 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART TEN (Attachments: #1 PTE 222, #2 PTE 223, #3 PTE 224, #4 PTE 225, #5 PTE 234, #6 PTE 235, #7 PTE 242, #8 PTE 243, #9 PTE 244, #10 PTE 245, #11 PTE 246, #12 PTE 247, #13 PTE 248, #14 PTE 249, #15 PTE 250, #16 PTE 251, #17 PTE 252, #18 PTE 269, #19 PTE 270, #20 PTE 271, #21 PTE 272, #22 PTE 273, #23 PTE 274, #24 PTE 275, #25 PTE 276, #26 PTE 277, #27 PTE 278, #28 PTE 279, #29 PTE 280, #30 PTE 281, #31 PTE 282, #32 PTE 283, #33 PTE 286, #34 PTE 287, #35 PTE 288, #36 PTE 289, #37 PTE 290, #38 PTE 291, #39 PTE 292, #40 PTE 294, #41 PTE 295, #42 PTE 296, #43 PTE 298, #44 PTE 299, #45 PTE 300, #46 PTE 301, #47 PTE 303, #48 PTE 304, #49 PTE 305, #50 PTE 306, #51 PTE 308, #52 PTE 309, #53 PTE 310, #54 PTE 311, #55 PTE 312)(Coleman, Gregory)
September 5, 2012 Filing 573 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART NINE (Attachments: #1 PTE 193, #2 PTE 194, #3 PTE 195, #4 PTE 196, #5 PTE 197, #6 PTE 198, #7 PTE 199, #8 PTE 200, #9 PTE 201, #10 PTE 202, #11 PTE 203, #12 PTE 204, #13 PTE 205, #14 PTE 206, #15 PTE 207, #16 PTE 208, #17 PTE 209, #18 PTE 210, #19 PTE 211, #20 PTE 212, #21 PTE 213, #22 PTE 214, #23 PTE 215, #24 PTE 216)(Coleman, Gregory)
September 5, 2012 Filing 572 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART EIGHT (Attachments: #1 PTE 171, #2 PTE 172, #3 PTE 173, #4 PTE 174, #5 PTE 175, #6 PTE 176, #7 PTE 177, #8 PTE 178, #9 PTE 179, #10 PTE 180, #11 PTE 181, #12 PTE 182, #13 PTE 183, #14 PTE 184, #15 PTE 185, #16 PTE 186, #17 PTE 187, #18 PTE 188, #19 PTE 189, #20 PTE 190, #21 PTE 191)(Coleman, Gregory)
September 5, 2012 Filing 571 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART SEVEN (Attachments: #1 PTE 144, #2 PTE 145, #3 PTE 146, #4 PTE 147, #5 PTE 148, #6 PTE 149, #7 PTE 150, #8 PTE 151, #9 PTE 152, #10 PTE 153, #11 PTE 154, #12 PTE 155, #13 PTE 156, #14 PTE 157, #15 PTE 160, #16 PTE 161, #17 PTE 162, #18 PTE 163, #19 PTE 165, #20 PTE 166, #21 PTE 167, #22 PTE 168, #23 PTE 169, #24 PTE 170)(Coleman, Gregory)
September 5, 2012 Filing 570 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART SIX by PLAINTIFFS re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List, (Attachments: #1 PTE 143 - Part 1, #2 PTE 143 - Part 2, #3 PTE 143 - Part 3, #4 PTE 143 - Part 4, #5 PTE 143 - Part 5) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/5/2012 (AYB).
September 5, 2012 Filing 569 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART FIVE by PLAINTIFFS re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 PTE 128, #2 PTE 132, #3 PTE 133, #4 PTE 134, #5 PTE 135, #6 PTE 136, #7 PTE 137, #8 PTE 138, #9 PTE 139, #10 PTE 140, #11 PTE 141, #12 PTE 142) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/5/2012 (AYB).
September 5, 2012 Filing 568 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART FOUR by PLAINTIFFS re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 PTE 101, #2 PTE 102, #3 PTE 103, #4 PTE 104, #5 PTE 105, #6 PTE 106, #7 PTE 107, #8 PTE 108, #9 PTE 109, #10 PTE 110, #11 PTE 111, #12 PTE 112, #13 PTE 113, #14 PTE 114, #15 PTE 115, #16 PTE 116, #17 PTE 117, #18 PTE 118, #19 PTE 119, #20 PTE 120, #21 PTE 121, #22 PTE 122, #23 PTE 123, #24 PTE 124, #25 PTE 125, #26 PTE 126, #27 PTE 127) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/5/2012 (AYB).
September 5, 2012 Filing 567 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART THREE by PLAINTIFFS re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 PTE 71, #2 PTE 72, #3 PTE 73, #4 PTE 74, #5 PTE 75, #6 PTE 76, #7 PTE 77, #8 PTE 78, #9 PTE 83, #10 PTE 84, #11 PTE 85, #12 PTE 86, #13 PTE 87, #14 PTE 88, #15 PTE 89, #16 PTE 90, #17 PTE 91, #18 PTE 92, #19 PTE 93, #20 PTE 94, #21 PTE 95, #22 PTE 96, #23 PTE 97, #24 PTE 98, #25 PTE 99) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/5/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 566 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART TWO by PLAINTIFFS re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 PTE 36, #2 PTE 37, #3 PTE 38, #4 PTE 39, #5 PTE 40, #6 PTE 41, #7 PTE 42, #8 PTE 43, #9 PTE 44, #10 PTE 45, #11 PTE 46, #12 PTE 47, #13 PTE 48, #14 PTE 49, #15 PTE 50, #16 PTE 51, #17 PTE 52, #18 PTE 53, #19 PTE 54, #20 PTE 55, #21 PTE 56, #22 PTE 57, #23 PTE 58, #24 PTE 59, #25 PTE 60, #26 PTE 61, #27 PTE 62, #28 PTE 63, #29 PTE 64, #30 PTE 65, #31 PTE 66, #32 PTE 67, #33 PTE 68, #34 PTE 69, #35 PTE 70) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 565 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS - PART ONE by PLAINTIFFS re #484 Exhibit List, #483 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 PTE 1, #2 PTE 2, #3 PTE 3, #4 PTE 4, #5 PTE 5, #6 PTE 6, #7 PTE 7, #8 PTE 8, #9 PTE 9, #10 PTE 10, #11 PTE 11, #12 PTE 12, #13 PTE 13, #14 PTE 14, #15 PTE 15, #16 PTE 16, #17 PTE 17, #18 PTE 18, #19 PTE 19, #20 PTE 20, #21 PTE 21, #22 PTE 22, #23 PTE 23, #24 PTE 24, #25 PTE 25, #26 PTE 26, #27 PTE 27, #28 PTE 28, #29 PTE 29, #30 PTE 30, #31 PTE 31, #32 PTE 32, #33 PTE 33, #34 PTE 34, #35 PTE 35) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 564 NOTICE OF FILING GERALD WOLFE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Gerald Wolfe, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 563 NOTICE OF FILING CHARLES STEPHEN WEIDMAN DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Charles Stephen Weidman, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 562 NOTICE OF FILING MICHAEL STOTLAR DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Charles Curtis re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Michael Stotlar, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 561 NOTICE OF FILING CAROL STORY DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Carol Story, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 560 NOTICE OF FILING DOUGLAS ROOT DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Douglas Root, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 559 NOTICE OF FILING JAMES ROBINSON DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of James Robinson I - 06/25/07, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition excerpts of James Robinson II - 07/25/08, #3 Exhibit C - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 558 NOTICE OF FILING KEVIN OXLEY DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Kevin Oxley, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 557 NOTICE OF FILING ROBERT NEWMAN DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Robert Newman, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 556 NOTICE OF FILING TOM MORDOWANEC DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Tom Mordowanec I - 06/22/07, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition excerpts of Tom Mordowanec II - 05/26/07, #3 Exhibit C - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 555 NOTICE OF FILING HARVEY MARTIN DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpt of Harvey Martin, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 554 NOTICE OF FILING DENNIS MACY DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Dennis Macy I, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition excerpts of Dennis Macy II, #3 Exhibit C - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 553 NOTICE OF FILING GARY MACDONALD DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Gary MacDonald, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 552 NOTICE OF FILING MARY ELLEN LAMMEL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Mary Ellen Lammel, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 551 NOTICE OF FILING SCOTT KOVALOSKI DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Plaintiffs re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpt of Scott Kovaloski, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 550 NOTICE OF FILING RON HOFFMAN DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Ron Hoffman, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 549 NOTICE OF FILING PAUL BOUTIN DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by PLAINTIFFS re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Paul Boutin, #2 Exhibit B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 548 NOTICE OF FILING RON BLOOM DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by plaintiffs re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Deposition excerpts of Ron Bloom, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - letter to Court dated 10/07/09) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
September 4, 2012 Filing 547 NOTICE of Filing Stephen Barse Deposition Designations by Plaintiffs re #452 Designation of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Deposition Transcript Excerpts - Stephen Barse, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 10/07/09 letter to Court) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (AYB).
August 31, 2012 Filing 546 USCA ORDER DENYING the Appellants' Motion to Extend the Page Limitation. (AYB)
August 29, 2012 Filing 545 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2012 re #527 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Charles Curtis. The court dismisses the motion without prejudice at this time. (RLK)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #527 the Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on August 29, 2012. (AYB)
August 24, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2012 at 9:30 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. No court reporter needed. (RLK)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER staying the assessment of costs #530 in this matter pending completion of the appellate process. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on July 12, 2012. (AYB)
July 6, 2012 Filing 542 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #524 Judgment, #541 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Hearing,, #523 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Thomas Abbott, Larry G Abrams, Ralph Adams, Sr, Robert A Addington, Joseph Adkins, Jack C Ahlers, Danny K Ahrens, Charles E Ainsworth, Charles D Akers, Steve Albright, Lindle R Alexander, Randell G Alexander, Raymond E Allega, Donald R Allen, Joseph W Allen, Michael Richard Allen, Richard W Allen, Sr, Johnny Allison, Coy Kenneth Almond, Reggie Lavon Almond, Robert Dolen Almond, William Almond, William D Almond, Donald H Alms, Harold C Alton, Robert W Alvey, Wayne Ames, Dennis F Anderson, Shirley L Anderson, James Andies, Carey Angel, Donald M Angerer, Patricia S Angermeier, Rose Ann, E, Joseph L Anthony, Henry Arkenberg, Charles W Armstrong, Bennie R Arnold, Lawrence W Arnold, Harold Arp, Rudolph H Arp, Ronnie G Arterberry, B J Ashbrook, Gene E Ashby, Randall T Ashby, James Wayne Ashcraft, Robert D Ashcraft, James D Ashley, Edward Ashton, Billy R Atkins, Raymond E Auger, Fred R Ausbrooks, Samuel C Austin, W Scott Awkerman, John Paul Axley, Gerald Ayotte, Kenneth K Baehl, Craig Bagnato, Clifford W Bagwell, Jack L Bailey, Richard L Bailey, Ross Bailey, Samuel L Baines, Robert P Baird, Ted Baird, Donald J Baker, Donald J. Baker, Patti Baker, Alica Rose Balding, Arvin Frank Baldwin, Lowell T Ball, Charlie Ballard, Jack R Ballew, Harvey R Banks, Patrick J Barber, Doyle W Barbra, Anna M Bard, Fred F Barker, Jr, David J Barnes, George G Barnes, Sr, Leo V Barnes, Charles F Barnett, Dennis R Barnett, Donna K Barnett, Ervin T Barnett, Larry E Barnett, Vernon P Barnett, Maurice Barney, Paul E Barrett, Charlie Calvin Barringer, Joe J Barroso, Rebecca Barse, James M Bartosh, William Bartscher, Leonard Bashaw, Chester L Bass, Cleveland L Bass, Ralph O Bass, Sharon Bassett, James Thomas Bates, Jr, James D Bates, Richard E Bates, John D Baud, Jr, Kenneth W Bauer, William L Baugh, Oran P Baumgardner, John Franklin Baxley, Jackie Wayne Baxter, James W Baxter, Lonna J Beal, Vernie F Beals, Jimmie C Bean, Allan B Bearbower, Thomas W Beardsley, James E Beasley, Charles E Beatty, Harold W Beaty, Fernand R Beauchamp, Michael W Beaver, Arlo Nemitz Beck, Bill Beck, Billy Ray Beck, Claudia D Beck, Miri Beckstead, John A Beeman, Larry Lee Behne, Thomas Behrensmeyer, Shirley Belgarde, Earl Belile, Gary W Bell, Glenn D Bell, Billy W Belt, Floyd Lee Bennett, Larry E Bennett, Wayne Bennett, Clarence Ross Bensing, Lola A Beren, Helen C Bernstein, Thomas M Berrong, Charles E Berry, Sr, Jackie L Berry, James Berry, Joe A Berry, Edward E Bertke, Fred Daniel Bertrand, Eugene W Besancon, Elizabeth Besaw, Paul F Beslanowitch, Scott Beslanowitch, Ben C Best, Earl Best, Jr, Charles W Beverly, Joe Bible, Robert K Bible, Ronnie J Bible, William J Biedenkopf, Ronald G Biggs, Billy W Birchfield, Walter D Birchfield, Terry L Bird, David P Bitterman, Charles E Black, Harley Blair, Robert A Blake, William Frank Blalock, Jr, Albert E Blanford, Jr, Earl Blevins, William S Blevins, Michael T Blissett, James W Blubaugh, Geraldine L Blume, William C Boarman, Franklin D Bockting, Andor Bocskor, Theodore W Bogard, Charles R Boling, Donald Boling, Harrel R Boling, Richard Boling, Jimmy Don Bolt, Bruce A Bolton, William Bond, Judy W Bono, Robert P Boore, Richard Bordeau, Carl D Boring, Doral C Boring, Orville C Boring, Charles W Botkin, Carl Boulds, Everett R Bowen, George Edward Bowen, Hoyt R Bowerman, Jimmy Lee Bowers, Paul E Bowers, Sr, Daniel W Bowling, Laurance L Bowling, Cary L Bowlyou, Michael R Boyd, Winford G Boyd, Rita Boyea, Douglas W Boyer, David K Boyles, James R Boyles, Sr, Dennis L Brackin, Charles Bradam, Jerry L Bradley, Joe M Bradley, Manuel Branch, Jr, Ralph L Brandenberger, Willie B Branning, George Eugene Branum, Rodney D Bratcher, Merle Leo Brauer, Ronald E Bray, Jackie Darrell Brazil, Elmer L Breeden, Carl M Brennan, James G Brenton, William J Brewer, Melvin Bridges, Michael W Briggs, George I Brinkley, Kermit D Brinkley, Larry G Britt, James D Brock, Stephen M Brooks, Carolyn M Brothers, Roger Brothers, Artis Phillip Brown, Charles A Brown, Dennis Brown, Don M Brown, Duane Lee Brown, Fred H Brown, Harry W Brown, III, Ina Clarene Brown, James A Brown, Larry Brown, Lloyd E Brown, Margaret H Brown, Richard L Brown, Richard Seth Brown, Shirley R Brown, Viola M Brown, Wayne R Brown, William Marion Brown, William A Brown, Charles B Browning, Lawrence L Brumitt, Charles Bryant, Donald C Bryant, James S Bryant, Minnie F Bryant, William - Bryant, Clarence Edward Bryels, Clyde R Bryson, Ronald P Buck, Forrest E Buckley, Michael E Buescher, Dawn Buffham, Robert S Bullard, Victor Dale Burch, Melvin C Burchell, Wayne A Burchett, Gordon T Burchfield, Harry Lee Burchfield, R V Burchfield, George W Burden, Jr, Ralph L Burdine, Steven F Burgess, Glenn R Burkepile, Linda J Burks, Joseph McCam Burl, Keith Douglas Burleson, Curtis Lavoy Burnett, Howard Busch, Bobby D Butler, Earl Butler, Hilton Bledsoe Butler, Robert Louis Butler, Wilbert Butler, David Byrd, Delmar I Byrd, Sukye Y Byrd, Darrell G Cable, Doyle E Cackler, Gregory L Cackler, Euclid Cadrette, Willie Grover Cagle, Daniel H Caldwell, Glenda Kay Caldwell, Norman R Caldwell, Rondal W Calhoun, Gerald L Callaway, Charles Roy Callender, Frankie Calvin, Samuel E Calvin, Charles C Cambron, Bruce E Cameron, Roy E Camp, Donald E Campbell, Douglas Campbell, Judy F Campbell, Rosalie Campbell, Ted C Campbell, Robert L Canada, Robert C Canaday, Gary Cannon, Leslie W Cannon, Gregory L Canright, Elmer Jr Capel, Elijah Junior Caraway, Joseph R Carnes, Ella Gramiling Carpenter, Ella Carpenter, Frank Carpenter, Jethro Carpenter, Joseph H Carpenter, Orville D Carpenter, Robert L Carpenter, Ronald P Carpenter, Tony A Carpenter, Bonnie Carr, Mary R Carrillo, Charles Carroll, Larry E Carroll, Richard E Carroll, Robert D Carroll, Charles Thomas Carter, Gary Carter, James E Carter, Leonard Floyd Cartwright, Kenneth L Carver, Walter Carver, James J Casel, Donald H Cash, Jimmy W Cash, Margaret Cash, Robert L Casteel, Herschel E Caswell, Buddy Cathcart, Paulette Cauble, Ronald G Cavins, Robert H Cawley, Sherman H Cays, James G Cearlock, Jon A Chamberlain, James D Chambers, Randy Chambers, John W Chandler, Theodore Chandler, Barbara Jean Chaney, George Chapman, Larry Chapman, Robert Charland, George T Chenault, Lester Norman Chesney, Albert Chiltn, Daniel Leroy Christian, Daniel Leroy Christian, John W Christian, Harold G Chronister, Gerald W Chrostowski, Curtis C Church, Henry Cissna, Danford Clark, Joseph B Clark, Ralph E Clark, Ronald Clark, Robert W Clausheide, James W Clauson, John Walter Clegg, Sr, Matt Allen Clegg, Elvy Clements, Ralph M Clemmons, Jeff Clendenen, Diane Clift, Jackie Alan Cloud, David E Clouse, Kenneth Clure, Marvie J Clure, Roy T Cobb, William B Coburn, Jr, Claude C Cochran, Jackie L Cochran, John B Coder, Lonnie Cole, Jr, Jerry F Coleman, Ronald G Coleman, George Alvin Collatt, Kenneth David Collatt, Linda G Collatt, Sherman R Collatt, Howard Lee Collier, Charles L Collins, Dexter Lee Collins, Donnal Collins, Ernest A Collins, Ollis Lynn Colvin, Richard W Colvin, Malinda A Compton, Roy G Congrove, Edward D Conklin, Thomas P Conly, Sr, Coy G Connatser, David R Connell, Willard R Conner, Marlene Converse, Merle Converse, Gary V Cook, John Henry Cook, Lowell E Cook, Larry P Cooke, James R Coomes, Thomas E Coomes, William P Coomes, Jr, Jack David Cooper, James W Cooper, James N Cooper, Kenneth E Cooper, Lorene W Cooper, Donnie Cope, John O Corbell, Richard N Corbin, Lynn S Cordell, Janet Corkland, Robert Dean Corlett, Johnnie M Cornmesser, Arlin G Corum, Francis Cota, Darrel D Cotton, Edwin R Coulter, Reagan Coulter, Donald R Covington, Jack L Cox, Larry M Crabtree, Darrell Creek, Stacy L Creek, James Richard Cresswell, JH Crites, Bill Cromwell, Claude A Crossley, Daniel E Crow, Adelaide Crowe, Joseph Crowley, Bernard Walter Crump, Roy Crump, Dale A Culbertson, Floyd Walter Culp, James Culp, Tillman J Culp, Gary Joe Cummings, Lewis W Cummins, David Cunningham, Kenneth M Cunningham, Phillip Cunningham, Sheldon Cunningham, Donald L Cupp, Mary Emma Cupp, James M Curdiff, Terry D Curl, Larry Dean Curley, Sharon Curran, Charles Curtis, John Curtis, Don Cutshaw, Patricia F Dailey, Leland Dame, Marvin R Dame, Paul R Dammeier, Ruth Jean Damon, William Dampier, James W Dant, Robert E Dash, Margaret Dashnaw, Richard Ronald Daugherty, Charles E Davenport, Bonnie M Davis, Daniel F Davis, Donald D Davis, Donald T Davis, Kenneth I Davis, Larry Davis, Rex G Davis, Robert L Davis, Talley S Davis, Thomas Davis, Vernon L Davis, Walter Kenneth Davis, William J Davis, David D Dawson, Sr, Edward N Dawson, John R Day, Victor L Day, Stanley W Daywalt, Austin DeFord, Gerald L DeLoose, Vertis E Deal, Larry R Dearing, James G Deaton, Jr, Howard W Deeter, Frederick J Dennhardt, Clyde R Devine, David C Devine, Edward L Devine, Leslie Dicken, Patrick L Dilger, Robert L Dirks, Jimmy D Dishman, Larry A Dittmer, Dennis W Dixon, Emmett W Dixon, John L Doak, Conley Dockery, Creed Dockery, Dean Dockery, Donald C Dockery, Isaac M Dockery, Willie James Dockery, Kathryn Dodd, Richard Dodge, Floyd Donnelly, Allen Douglass, Christopher Downey, George Downey, Steven L Downing, Pricilla Irene Drake, Shirley G Drake, Anthony Drefchinski, Owen W Drewlinger, Clara J Drinnen, Thomas Driscoll, Jack S Drobena, Gordon Drum, Sherrill Edwin Drye, Victoria F Drye, John J DuPont, Ronald J Dubritsky, Richard R Dueman, Sr, William K Dufault, Jackie Duff, Charles Dumas, Darrell D Duncan, Delbert F Duncan, Donnis Ray Duncan, Howard Evert Duncan, Donald E Dunlap, Leroy Dunlap, William A Dunlap, Benjamin H Dunn, Jr, Billy E Dunn, Glenn A Dunn, Daniel Durant, Henry Durant, Howard Durgan, Richard C Durgy, Andrew J Duvall, Bobby G Dyke, Garry W Dykes, Jimmy L. Dykes, Moreane Eakins, Malcolm D Eble, R. W. Edgeman, Terry A Edmondson, Morris Randy Edmonson, John E Edwards, Montie R Edwards, Darrell Clinton Efird, William Gary Efird, Harvy J Ehlers, David A Ellerbrook, David C Elliot, John A Elliott, Robert P Elliott, Fred Ellis, James C Ellis, Jr, Thomas R Ellis, Doyie V Ellison, Robert Eugene Elrod, Ronnie Gene Elrod, David Embry, Danny N Emmert, Jerry
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER denying #525 Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification and/or Amendment to the Judgment Order and denying as moot #529 Plaintiffs' Request for a Hearing on their Motion for Clarification. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on June 11, 2012. (AYB)
August 26, 2011 Please note that two notebooks of joint designation of depositions, one notebook of DVDs containing deposition videos, and two CDs containing Alcoa's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Alcoa's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law have been returned to counsel for defendant c/o Cravath, Swaine & Moore (Fed Ex tracking number 860404946879). (AYB)
May 16, 2011 Filing 540 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Reply to #539 Plaintiffs' Objection to #530 Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs by Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 5/17/2011 (AYB).
May 5, 2011 Filing 539 OBJECTION #530 Bill of Costs, Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Request for Bill of Costs and Memorandum in Opposition to Bill of Costs filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Michael A. Stotlar, #2 Appendix)(Coleman, Gregory)
April 18, 2011 Filing 538 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs #527 filed by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 4/18/2011 (AYB).
April 18, 2011 Filing 537 Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification and/or Amendment of the Judgment Order #525 filed by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 4/18/2011 (AYB).
April 12, 2011 Filing 536 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alcoa Inc. re #530 Bill of Costs, (Slifkin, Daniel)
April 12, 2011 Filing 535 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alcoa Inc. re #534 Response in Opposition to Motion, #533 Response in Opposition to Motion, #532 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Slifkin, Daniel)
April 11, 2011 Filing 534 RESPONSE in Opposition re #529 MOTION for Hearing re #527 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #525 MOTION for Clarification and/or Amendment of the Judgment Order Plaintiffs' Request for Hearing ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Hearing") filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Slifkin, Daniel)
April 11, 2011 Filing 533 RESPONSE in Opposition re #527 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses") filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses)(Slifkin, Daniel)
April 11, 2011 Filing 532 RESPONSE in Opposition re #525 MOTION for Clarification and/or Amendment of the Judgment Order ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification and/or Amendment of the Judgment Order") filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Slifkin, Daniel)
April 11, 2011 Filing 531 BILL OF COSTS Letter to counsel of record. (AYB)
April 8, 2011 Filing 530 BILL OF COSTS by Alcoa Inc..Bill of costs DDL set for 5/11/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq., in Support of Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq., #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq., #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq., #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq.)(Gruenstein, Benjamin)
March 24, 2011 Filing 529 MOTION for Hearing re #527 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #525 MOTION for Clarification and/or Amendment of the Judgment Order Plaintiffs' Request for Hearing by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory)
March 23, 2011 Filing 528 MEMORANDUM in Support of #527 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Declaration of Gregory F. Coleman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #2 Ex. 2 - Declaration of Mona Lisa Wallace, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3 Ex. 3 - Declaration of Robert S. Catapano-Friedman, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 3/24/2011 (AYB). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/24/2011 with a signed copy of Mr. Coleman's declaration) (AYB).
March 23, 2011 Filing 527 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 3/24/2011 (AYB).
March 23, 2011 Filing 526 MEMORANDUM in Support of #525 MOTION for Clarification and/or Amendment of the Judgment Order filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Gregory F. Coleman) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 3/24/2011 (AYB).
March 23, 2011 Filing 525 MOTION for Clarification and/or Amendment of the Judgment Order by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Judgment Order) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 3/24/2011 (AYB).
March 14, 2011 Two external hard drives containing Plaintiffs' Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (d. 508) and Plaintiffs' Response to Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (d. 513) returned to counsel for plaintiffs at Wallace and Graham, PA (Fed Ex tracking number 834127656796) (AYB)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 524 JUDGMENT ORDER, and for the reasons set forth in #523 the Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, the plaintiffs shall take nothing, and this action is dismissed with prejudice on the merits. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on March 9, 2011. (AYB)
March 9, 2011 Filing 523 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on March 9, 2011. (AYB)
November 22, 2010 Filing 522 Designated Secured Leave Letter to the Court from attorney Mona Lisa Wallace. (AYB)
June 11, 2010 Filing 521 RESPONSE to Alcoa, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority and Statements Made Within the Notice filed by Alcoa. (Coleman, Gregory)
June 9, 2010 Filing 520 NOTICE by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II) re #507 Notice (Other) ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Slifkin, Daniel)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #518 Attorney Andrew J Schwaba's MOTION to withdraw as counsel of record for plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on May 11, 2010. (AYB)
May 4, 2010 Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew J. Schwaba by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Hughes, John)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER granting #516 the Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Meredith Shaw as counsel of record for Alcoa Inc. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on April 6, 2010. (AYB)
April 5, 2010 Filing 516 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Meredith Shaw as Attorney by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 4/6/2010 (AYB).
April 5, 2010 Filing 515 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert S Catapano-Friedman (Catapano-Friedman, Robert)
December 22, 2009 Filing 514 Letter to Court regarding revisions to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Charles Curtis (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 12/23/2009 (AYB).
December 10, 2009 Filing 513 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #512 Notice (Other) of Filing of Letter to Court (Attachments: #1 Other Letter to Judge Phillips)(Schwaba, Andrew)
December 4, 2009 Filing 512 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Charles Curtis re #507 (Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 12/7/2009 (AYB).
December 4, 2009 Filing 511 Notice Of Filing Of Alcoa's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Phillips enclosing Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Defendant Alcoa Inc,'s Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Appendix A to Alcoa Inc.'s Response) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 12/7/2009 (AYB).
November 17, 2009 Filing 510 Letter to the Court by Charles Curtis (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 11/17/2009 (AYB).
November 16, 2009 Filing 509 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #508 Proposed Findings of Fact (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Schwaba, Andrew)
November 16, 2009 Filing 508 Proposed Findings of Fact by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
November 16, 2009 Filing 507 Notice Of Filing by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Phillips, #2 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 11/17/2009 (AYB).
November 16, 2009 Filing 506 Notice Of Withdrawal Of Motion To File Under Seal #505 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Motion To File Under Seal Its Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law by Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 11/17/2009 (AYB).
November 16, 2009 Filing 505 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Motion To File Under Seal Its Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law by Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 11/17/2009 (AYB).
November 2, 2009 Filing 504 NOTICE of Filing LETTER to the Court by Alcoa Inc. re #503 (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Court from Daniel Slifkin) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 11/2/2009 (AYB).
October 29, 2009 Filing 503 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Strike Testimony of Ian Altman by Charles Curtis re #501 (Attachments: #1 Schwaba Declaration, #2 Ian Altman Original Expert Report, #3 Ian Altman Supplemental Expert Report, #4 Ian Altman Supplemental Deposition, #5 David Hilko Expert Report) (Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 10/29/2009 (AYB).
October 23, 2009 Filing 502 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. IAN ALTMAN by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. re #478 (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 10/26/2009 (AYB).
October 15, 2009 Filing 501 NOTICE by Charles Curtis re #478 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike Testimony of Ian Altman (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration, #2 Exhibit Altman Original Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit 8/27/08 Court Order, #5 Exhibit 3/27/09 Court Order, #6 Exhibit Altman Supplemental Expert Report, #7 Exhibit Portions of Altman's 2nd Deposition)(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 15, 2009 Filing 500 NOTICE by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II) ("Errata To The Trial Transcript"). (Slifkin, Daniel)
October 15, 2009 Filing 499 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on October 1, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 498 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 30, 2009 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 497 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 30, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 496 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 29, 2009 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 495 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 29, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 494 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 28, 2009 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 493 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 28, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 492 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 25, 2009 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 491 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 25, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 490 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 24, 2009 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 489 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 24, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 488 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 23, 2009 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 487 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 23, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 486 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 22, 2009 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 15, 2009 Filing 485 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on September 22, 2009 - Morning Session, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gibson Court Reporting, Telephone number (865) 546-7477. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (RLK)
October 9, 2009 Seven (7) boxes of trial exhibits received from counsel for defendants. Boxes have been placed with the trial exhibits. (AYB)
October 8, 2009 Filing 484 Plaintiffs' List of Trial Exhibits by Charles Curtis. Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 10/9/2009 (AYB).
October 8, 2009 Filing 483 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s List Of Trial Exhibits by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s List Of Trial Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 to Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s List Of Trial Exhibits) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 10/9/2009 (AYB).
October 7, 2009 Two volumes and one external hard drive received from counsel for plaintiffs containing Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations of witnesses whose testimony was not provided live at the trial. Notebooks and hard drive have been placed with the courtroom exhibits. (AYB)
October 1, 2009 Filing 482 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 8 completed on 10/1/2009. Proof for defendant concludes. Plaintiff's deposition designations are due October 7, 2009. Final exhibit lists are due October 8, 2009. Plaintiff's response to Motion to Strike is due October 15, 2009. Defendant's reply to plaintiffs response to Motion to Strike is due October 23, 2009. Both parties shall submit their Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by November 16, 2009, with responses due on December 4, 2009. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 30, 2009 Filing 481 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 7 held on 9/30/2009. Introduction of evidence for defendant continues. Witnesses called and exhibits filed. Trial continued for further testimony on Thursday, October 1, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 29, 2009 Filing 480 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 6 held on 9/29/2009. Introduction of evidence for defendant continues. Witnesses called and exhibits filed. Trial continued for further testimony on Wednesday, September 30, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 28, 2009 Filing 479 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 5 held on 9/28/2009. Introduction of evidence for defendant begins. Witnesses called and exhibits filed. Trial continued for further testimony on Tuesday, September 29, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 28, 2009 Filing 478 Notice Of Filing Letter To The Court by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Court from Evan R. Chesler) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/29/2009 (AYB).
September 25, 2009 Filing 477 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 4 held on 9/25/2009. Proof for plaintiff resumed and concluded. Witnesses called and exhibits filed. Defendant moves for Judgment on Partial Findings under Rule 52(c). Plaintiff responds. The court takes defendant's motion under advisement until the conclusion of proof. Trial continued for further testimony on Monday, September 28, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 24, 2009 Filing 476 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 3 held on 9/24/2009. Proof for plaintiff continues. Witnesses called and exhibits filed. Trial continued for further testimony on Friday, September 25, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 23, 2009 Filing 475 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 2 held on 9/23/2009. Proof for plaintiff continues. Witnesses called and exhibits filed. Trial continued for further testimony on Thursday, September 24, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 22, 2009 Filing 474 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Bench Trial - Day 1 held on 9/22/2009. Opening Statements. Proof for plaintiff begins. Witnesses called and exhibits filed. Trial continued for further testimony on Wednesday, September 23, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Gibson Court Reporting) (RLK)
September 21, 2009 Filing 473 Amended Objections To Plaintiffs' Exhibit List #457 Objection filed by Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/22/2009 (AYB).
September 21, 2009 Filing 472 SEALED DECLARATION of Whitt Steineker, Esq. in Support of #470 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Ian H. Altman by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (AYB)
September 21, 2009 Filing 471 SEALED MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #470 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Ian H. Altman by Alcoa Inc. (AYB)
September 21, 2009 Filing 470 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Ian H. Altman by Alcoa Inc. (AYB)
September 21, 2009 Filing 469 SEALED DECLARATION of Whitt Steineker, Esq. in Support of #467 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Plaintiffs About Their Individualized Financial and Medical Conditions by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (AYB)
September 21, 2009 Filing 468 SEALED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of #467 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Plaintiffs About Their Individualized Financial and Medical Conditions by Alcoa Inc. (AYB)
September 21, 2009 Filing 467 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Plaintiffs About Their Individualized Financial and Medical Conditions by Alcoa Inc. (AYB)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting #435 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on September 21, 2009. (AYB)
September 18, 2009 Filing 465 SEALED PRETRIAL BRIEF on Novel Questions of Law by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Appendix) (AYB)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #460 Motion to Allow Trial Brief to Remain Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/17/09. (MGM)
September 16, 2009 Filing 463 SEALED Memorandum of Law Concerning the Novel and Unusual Questions of Law Identified in the Pretrial Order by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (AYB)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting #461 defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on September 16, 2009. (AYB)
September 14, 2009 Filing 461 MOTION for Leave to File MEMORANDUM OF LAW CONCERNING THE NOVEL AND UNUSUAL QUESTIONS OF LAW IDENTIFIED IN THE PRE-TRIAL ORDER Under Seal by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/15/2009 (AYB).
September 14, 2009 Filing 460 MOTION for Leave to File Trial Brief Under Seal by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text and motion type on 9/15/2009 (AYB).
September 11, 2009 Filing 459 Notice of Filing of Certification Of C.Kristopher Hagedorn of Domestic Records of Regularly Conducted Activity Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 902(11) by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of C. Kristopher Hagedorn) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/14/2009 (AYB).
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #411 Motion PartiallyExclude/Limit Hilko Expert Report and Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 9/1/09. (MGM )
August 31, 2009 Filing 457 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Objections To Plaintiffs' Exhibit List #453 Exhibit List filed by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/1/2009 (AYB).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 456 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on August 25, 2009. (AYB)
August 24, 2009 Filing 455 PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Plants in which Class Plaintiffs worked)(Schwaba, Andrew)
August 14, 2009 Filing 453 EXHIBIT LIST and WITNESS LIST (Supplemental) by Charles Curtis.. (Coleman, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 452 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITIONS by Charles Curtis.(Coleman, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 451 EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT ALCOA INC.S SUPPLEMENTED AND AMENDED LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc... (Slifkin, Daniel)
August 14, 2009 Filing 450 DEFENDANT ALCOA INC'S SUPPLEMENTED AND AMENDED LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2009 to remove pdf. Counsel has re-filed with electronic signature as Doc. #451 (AYB).
August 13, 2009 Filing 449 NOTICE of Filing Joint Letter to the Court by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Joint Letter to the Court) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/14/2009 (AYB).
August 12, 2009 Filing 454 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/12/2009. Counsel addresses bifurcating the trial in this matter. The court finds that the trial shall be bifurcated. The first phase of the trial will only pertain to evidence to determine whether or not vesting has occurred. Counsel addresses the pretrial motions previously filed with the court. Counsel will confer and contact the court at a later time if they wish to have a daubert and extrinsic evidence hearing. (RLK)
August 7, 2009 Filing 448 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew William Becker submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (AYB)
August 7, 2009 Filing 447 AFFIDAVIT of James Stewart submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (AYB)
August 7, 2009 Filing 446 MEMORANDUM in Support of #445 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE INCONSISTENT WITH THE CAP AGREEMENTS filed by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JISUN PARK, ESQ., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 445 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE INCONSISTENT WITH THE CAP AGREEMENTS by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 444 MEMORANDUM in Support of #443 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF WHAT INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS WERE TOLD ABOUT THEIR RETIREMENT BENEFITS filed by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN GRUENSTEIN, ESQ., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 443 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF WHAT INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS WERE TOLD ABOUT THEIR RETIREMENT BENEFITS by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 442 DECLARATION OF JISUN PARK, ESQ. in Support of #440 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS' BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATIONS filed by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 441 MEMORANDUM in Support of #440 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS' BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATIONS filed by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 440 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS' BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATIONS by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 439 NOTICE OF FILING by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Other LETTER TO THE COURT, #2 Other DEFENDANT ALCOA INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS) (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 438 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel)
August 7, 2009 Filing 437 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel)
August 7, 2009 Filing 436 WITNESS LIST by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc.. (Slifkin, Daniel)
August 7, 2009 Filing 435 MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT ALCOA INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF MR. IAN H. ALTMAN, ITS MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY PLAINTIFFS ABOUT THEIR INDIVIDUALIZED FINANCIAL AND MEDICAL CONDITIONS AND THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUMS OF LAW AND DECLARATIONS, WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc.. (Slifkin, Daniel)
August 7, 2009 Filing 434 "DEFENDANT ALCOA INC.'S TRIAL EXHIBITS" by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 8/10/2009 (AYB).
August 7, 2009 Filing 433 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITIONS by Charles Curtis.(Coleman, Gregory)
August 7, 2009 Filing 432 WITNESS LIST Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(3) Pre-Trial Witness and Exhibit List by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory)
August 7, 2009 Filing 431 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 4, 2009, before Judge C. Clifford Shirley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jolene Owen, Telephone number 865-384-6585. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2009. (JLO, )
August 4, 2009 Filing 430 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: DAUBERT MOTION HEARING held on 8/4/2009. (Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley.). (Court Reporter Jolene Owen.) (DCP, )
August 3, 2009 Filing 429 AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette Stump submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 284) (AYB)
July 31, 2009 Filing 428 AFFIDAVIT of James Robinson submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 163, #2 Exhibit 455, #3 Exhibit 680, #4 Exhibit 681, #5 July 28, 2008 email) (AYB)
July 31, 2009 Filing 427 AFFIDAVIT of Anton Charles Durst submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 335) (AYB)
July 31, 2009 Filing 426 AFFIDAVIT of William Brickey Beasley submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 342, #2 Exhibit 343) (AYB)
July 16, 2009 Filing 425 SEALED Document Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's #411 MOTION Daubert Motion to Partially Exclude/Limit Hilko Expert Report and Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Park Declaration, #6 Certificate of Service)(MGM)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting Defendant's #418 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to file documents described in this Order under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 7/16/09. (MGM)
July 15, 2009 Filing 423 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Thomas Ulester Moore on July 10, 2009 (Coleman, Gregory)
July 15, 2009 Filing 422 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Carol Sue Payne Story on July 10, 2009 (Coleman, Gregory)
July 15, 2009 Filing 421 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to William Brickey Beasley on July 10, 2009 (Coleman, Gregory)
July 13, 2009 Filing 420 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew William Becker submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (AYB) (Main Document 420 replaced on 7/16/2009 for poor scan quality) (AYB).
July 13, 2009 Filing 419 AFFIDAVIT of James Stewart submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by Charles Curtis. (AYB)
July 13, 2009 Filing 418 MOTION to Seal ("Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Motion To File Under Seal") by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
July 1, 2009 Filing 417 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by Charles Curtis.(Coleman, Gregory)
July 1, 2009 NOTICE of Hearing on #411 Daubert Motion to Partially Exclude/Limit Hilko Expert Report and Testimony: Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. (AYB)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting #413 defendants' Motion to Withdraw Attorneys John W Woods, Jr, Patricia Epps, and Ryan Ayers Glasgow. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on June 29, 2009. (AYB)
June 29, 2009 Filing 415 SEALED Document in Support #411 of Daubert Motion to Partially Exclude/Limit Hilko Expert Report and Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (AYB)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting #412 plaintiffs' Motion to Seal their memorandum in support of their Daubert motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on June 29, 2009. (AYB)
June 25, 2009 Filing 413 MOTION to Withdraw Attorneys Patricia Epps, Ryan Glasgow and John Woods by Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lucas, John) Modified text on 6/25/2009 (AYB).
June 24, 2009 Filing 412 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion to Partially Exclude/Limit Hilko Expert Report and Testimony and Declaration of Counsel and accompanying exhibits to the Declaration of Counsel by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 6/25/2009 (AYB).
June 24, 2009 Filing 411 MOTION Daubert Motion to Partially Exclude/Limit Hilko Expert Report and Testimony by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory)
June 23, 2009 Filing 410 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on June 1, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Agina Graham (Miller & Miller), Telephone number (865) 675-1471. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2009. (AYB)
June 17, 2009 Filing 409 Supplemental Expert Report of Ian H. Altman, FSA. (AYB)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER granting #407 plaintiffs' Motion to file the supplemental expert report of Ian H. Altman and accompanying exhibit under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on June 17, 2009. (AYB)
June 15, 2009 Filing 407 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion for Order Allowing Filing and Maintenance of Documents Under Seal - Supplemental Expert Report of Ian H. Altman FSA with attached Exhibit A by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory)
June 15, 2009 Filing 406 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Report of Ian H. Altman FSA with attached Exhibit A by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified on 6/15/2009 to remove pdf. Counsel has refiled a corrected version as Doc. 406 (AYB).
June 1, 2009 Filing 405 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Status Conference held on 6/1/2009. Counsel for the plaintiffs and defendant address the issue of selecting an advisory jury. The court finds that the an advisory jury will not be necessary for the trial of this matter currently scheduled for September 22, 2009. Counsel for the defendant requests that the Court schedule a final pretrial conference. The court sets a final pretrial conference before the Honorable Thomas W. Phillips on September 14, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Agina Graham) (RLK)
May 28, 2009 Filing 404 RESPONSE re #403 Pretrial Memorandum, filed by Alcoa Inc. Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Memorandum and Response Memorandum to Defendant's Pre-Conference Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verdict Form)(Coleman, Gregory)
May 26, 2009 Filing 403 PRE-CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by defendant Alcoa Inc. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (AYB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2009: #1 Whitt Steineker Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate of Service) (AYB, ).
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting defendant's #401 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to file the defendant's memorandum under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 5/26/09. A copy of this Order has been sent via U.S. Mail to Jisun Park. (MGM)
May 22, 2009 Filing 401 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
May 6, 2009 Filing 400 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nicholaas Storm by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
May 6, 2009 Filing 399 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Mordowanec by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
April 28, 2009 Filing 398 AFFIDAVIT of William David Willett, custodian of records for the United Steel Workers, submitted as a Notice of Reliance pursuant to request by plaintiff Charles Curtis. (AYB)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting Alcoa, Inc's #396 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clyde Whittaker Steineker. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 04/20/09. A copy of this Order has been sent via U.S. Mail to Jisun Park. (MGM)
April 17, 2009 Filing 396 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clyde Whittaker Steineker ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 0649-1160757.) by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
April 3, 2009 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/1/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. (AYB)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #394 plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference. This matter is set for a status conference on June 1, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on April 3, 2009. (AYB)
April 2, 2009 Filing 394 MOTION for Status Conference by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 4/2/2009 (AYB).
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #289 plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to Compel; granting #280 plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; and granting #346 plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on March 27, 2009. (AYB)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER denying parties' #254 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and #255 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties will prepare the case for trial. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 03/19/09. A copy of this Order was sent via U.S. Mail to Jisun Park. (MGM)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #389 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Attorney Nicole Y Altman. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 03/04/09. A copy of this Order was sent via U.S. Mail to Jisun Park and Nicola Y Altman. (MGM)
March 3, 2009 Filing 389 MOTION to Withdraw of Nicole Altman as Attorney by Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 proposed order) (Lucas, John) Modified text on 3/4/2009 (AYB).
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #387 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment and Supplemental Declaration of Counsel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 2/27/09. (ANB)
February 26, 2009 Filing 391 *SEALED* SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of #254 plaintiffs' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in OPPOSITION to #255 defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Counsel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) (AYB)
February 26, 2009 Filing 387 MOTION to Seal Filing and Maintenance of Documents by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwaba, Andrew)
February 19, 2009 Filing 386 SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum of Law in Support of #255 its Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to #254 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Ex. A (Winnett case)) (Lucas, John) Modified text and created docket relationship on 2/20/2009 (AYB).
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER continuing the Jury Trial from March 24, 2009, to 9/22/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on January 14, 2009. (AYB)
October 27, 2008 Filing 384 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER that the plaintiffs' motion #183 is DENIED as to the request for sanctions and DENIED as moot as to the request for a protective order. Additionally, in light of the plaintiffs' supplemental motion, which remains under review and which subsumes any remaining discovery issues raised in the original motion, the remainder of plaintiffs' original motion to compel #183 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 9/24/08. (ANB)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting the parties' #377 and #378 Motions to Seal Document. The Clerk is ORDERED to file the parties' supplements under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 9/18/08. (ANB)
September 17, 2008 Filing 379 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/27/08, before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter/Transcriber Netta Kocuba, Telephone number 865-524-4590. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2008. (ANB)
September 16, 2008 Filing 378 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/17/2008 (ANB).
September 16, 2008 Filing 377 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs Partial Motion For Summary Judgment and Supplemental Declaration Of Counsel In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment with exhibits by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting dfts' #373 Motion for Jisun Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/16/08. (ANB) Modified on 9/16/2008 to indicate copy mailed to Jisun Park (ANB).
September 12, 2008 Filing 375 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Boutin by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER that Defendants' #368 Motion to Withdraw is DENIED AS MOOT, and the Court hereby adopts and incorporates herein the parties' agreement, attached as Exhibit A to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 9/12/08. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ANB)
September 12, 2008 Filing 373 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jisun Park ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 06490000000001020246.) by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
September 9, 2008 Filing 372 AGREED PROPOSED ORDER ON STIPULATION AND NOTICE WITHDRAWING MOTION (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/10/2008 (ANB).
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER continuing the Jury Trial to 3/24/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips (third setting); alternatively, the trial will commence on 9/22/09 (first setting). Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on September 4, 2008. (AYB)
September 2, 2008 Filing 370 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #368 MOTION to Modify the Court's #363 August 26, 2008 Order filed by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Gruenstein Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Gruenstein Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Gruenstein Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Gruenstein Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Gruenstein Declaration)(Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/3/2008 (ANB).
September 2, 2008 Filing 369 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #368 MOTION to Modify the Court's #363 August 26, 2008 Order filed by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/3/2008 (ANB).
September 2, 2008 Filing 368 MOTION to Modify the Court's #363 August 26, 2008 Order by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 9/3/2008 (ANB).
August 29, 2008 Filing 367 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 29, 2008, before Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jolene Owen, Telephone number 865-384-6585. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2008. (ANB)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting Defendants' #362 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen Frank and Marcus J Green terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 8/28/08. (ANB)
August 27, 2008 Filing 366 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thomas W Phillips: Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2008. Counsel addresses Motions #254 and #255 Motions for Summary Judgment. Arguments are heard by the court. The court instructs counsel to consult with scheduling clerk in order to reset the trial of this case. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Netta Kocuba) (RLK)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting defendant's #282 Motion to Strike to the extent set forth and defendant's 327 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 8/27/08. (ANB)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER that the plaintiffs motion #211 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part to the extent set forth. The defendant shall have five days from the entry of this Order to produce the revised redactions of Entries 159 and 176 and an unredacted copy of Entry 321. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 8/26/08. (ANB)
August 26, 2008 Filing 362 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Marcus Green & Stephen Frank) by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #360 Motion to 359 Reply to Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 8/26/08. (ANB)
August 25, 2008 Filing 360 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Reply to Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
August 21, 2008 Filing 358 AFFIDAVIT of Gary Hubbard by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ANB)
August 21, 2008 Filing 357 AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette Stump by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ANB)
August 18, 2008 Copies of #354 Order mailed to attorneys Stephen Frank and Marcus Green along with a Mandatory ECF letter. (KMK)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting #353 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 08/15/2008. (KMK)
August 14, 2008 Filing 353 MOTION to Seal Alcoa's Memorandum of Law in Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time for Discovery and Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq. In Support by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
August 12, 2008 Filing 352 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 29, 2008 (Motion Hearing), before Judge C. Clifford Shirley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jolene Owen, Telephone number (865) 384-6585. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2008. (KMK)
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: ALL Non-Dispositive Motions are REFERRED to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley, Jr., USMJ.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/30/08. (ANB)
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER that due to a conflict in the court's trial schedule, the trial of this case is continued from 9/17/08. Counsel are DIRECTED to bring their calendars to the motion hearing scheduled for 8/27/08, in order to set a new trial date. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/30/08. (ANB)
July 29, 2008 Filing 350 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2008 re 327 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Alain Belda filed by Alcoa Inc., #280 MOTION to Compel filed by Charles Curtis, #282 MOTION to Strike SECTION IV OF THE REPORT, AND EXCLUDE THE CORRESPONDING TESTIMONY, OF IAN H. ALTMAN filed by Alcoa Inc., and #289 Supplemental MOTION to Compel filed by Charles Curtis. Oral argument by the parties. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Jolene Owen.) (DCP)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #339 Motion to Seal Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order and granting defendants' #340 Motion to Seal Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 7/29/08. (ANB)
July 28, 2008 Filing 346 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - James Robinson Deposition excerpt, #2 Exhibit B - Email)(Schwaba, Andrew)
July 28, 2008 Filing 345 NOTICE by Charles Curtis Of Reliance Upon FRE 803(6) Records of Regularly Conducted Activity and 902(11) Certified Records of Regularly Conducted Activity (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Records Custodian USW)(Coleman, Gregory)
July 28, 2008 Filing 344 NOTICE by Charles Curtis Of Reliance Upon FRE 803(6) Records of Regularly Conducted Activity and 902(11) Certified Records of Regularly Conducted Activity (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Records Custodian Buck Consultants)(Coleman, Gregory)
July 28, 2008 Filing 342 NOTICE by Charles Curtis Of Reliance Upon FRE 803(6) Records of Regularly Conducted Activity and 902(11) Certified Records of Regularly Conducted Activity (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Records Custodian Hewitt Associates)(Coleman, Gregory)
July 28, 2008 Filing 341 NOTICE by Charles Curtis Of Reliance Upon FRE 803(6) Records of Regularly Conducted Activity and 902(11) Certified Records of Regularly Conducted Activity (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Records Custodian Price Waterhouse Coopers)(Coleman, Gregory)
July 28, 2008 Filing 340 MOTION to Seal Document by Alcoa Inc.. (Lucas, John)
July 25, 2008 Filing 339 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Response Brief In Opposition To Motion for Protective Order, Declaration of Gregory F. Coleman and exhibits by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER that Plaintiffs' MOTIONS #330 and #331 for extension of time to complete discovery are DENIED as moot. The defendants' Motion to Seal #328 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the defendant's motion for protective order and documents in support thereof under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 7/23/08. (ANB)
July 23, 2008 Filing 335 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Robinson by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 7/23/2008 (ANB).
July 22, 2008 Filing 336 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Charles Curtis re #330 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, #331 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery, Declaration of Andrew J. Schwaba and exhibits (ANB)
July 22, 2008 Filing 334 NOTICE by Charles Curtis Second Notice of Reliance Upon FRE 803(6)-Records of Regularly Conducted Activity and 902(11)-Certified Records of Regularly Conducted Activity (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Affidavit))(Coleman, Gregory)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley: 327 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Alain Belda filed by Alcoa Inc., #328 MOTION to Seal Motion for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Alain Belda, the Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq. in Support of Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Alain Belda and filed by Alcoa Inc., #330 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Charles Curtis, and #331 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery, Declaration of Andrew J. Schwaba and exhibits filed by Charles Curtis. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 07/22/2008. (KMK)
July 21, 2008 Filing 332 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITIONS by Charles Curtis.(Coleman, Gregory)
July 18, 2008 Filing 331 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery, Declaration of Andrew J. Schwaba and exhibits by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
July 18, 2008 Filing 330 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
July 18, 2008 Filing 329 NOTICE by Charles Curtis of Reliance Upon FRE 803(6)-Records of Regularly Conducted Activity and 902(11)-Certified Records of Regularly Conducted Activity (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Coleman, Gregory)
July 18, 2008 Filing 328 MOTION to Seal Motion for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Alain Belda, the Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq. in Support of Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Alain Belda and the accompanying exhibits to the Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein, Esq. in support of this motion by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
July 18, 2008 Filing 326 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Telephone Conference/Discovery Hearing held on 7/18/2008. Oral argument by the parties. The parties are instructed to file accordingly. Attorney Daniel Slifkin for ALCOA, Inc. will file a Motion for Protective Order and will address issues of todays hearing. The deadline for discovery runs on Monday July 28, 2008. The parties were instructed to have filed most everything by Friday, June 25th and the Court will take up any/other discovery matters and all other pending motions on Tuesday, July 29th. (Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley.). (DCP)
July 16, 2008 NOTICE of Telephone Conference: Telephone Conference regarding Discovery Dispute set for 7/18/2008 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. (Attorney Coleman will initiate call)(ANB)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting the parties' Motions #316 , #320 and #321 to Seal. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file the specified documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 7/16/08. (ANB)
July 14, 2008 Filing 321 MOTION to Seal Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Strike Section IV Of The Report, And Exclude The Corresponding Testimony, Of Ian H. Altman by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 320 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Meredith Shaw, Esq. In Support Of Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Supplemental Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel, Motion For Protective Order And Motion For Sanctions and Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Supplemental Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel, Motion For Protective Order and Motion For Sanctions by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 319 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brenda Loveday by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Lucas, John)
July 14, 2008 Filing 318 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy Garner by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Lucas, John)
July 14, 2008 Filing 317 First MOTION for Leave to File Order Allowing Filing and Maintenance of Documents Under Seal by Charles Curtis. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified on 7/15/2008 to remove pdf - duplicate filing of #316 (ANB).
July 14, 2008 Filing 316 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel, Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Schwaba, and Exhibits by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
July 9, 2008 Filing 315 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Robinson by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
July 9, 2008 Filing 314 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gerald Wolfe by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
July 9, 2008 Filing 313 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Duane Lee by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
July 9, 2008 Filing 312 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Boutin by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
July 9, 2008 Filing 311 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alain Belda by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting dft's #298 Motion for Leave to File the Memorandum of Law in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel under Seal. Plaintiffs' #299 Motion for Order Allowing filing of their Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/9/08. (ANB)
July 8, 2008 Filing 306 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Wilson by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Lucas, John)
July 8, 2008 Filing 305 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chester Gentry by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Lucas, John) Modified text on 7/9/2008 (ANB). Modified on 7/14/2008 to correct name of deponent (ANB).
July 8, 2008 Filing 304 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ennis Huffstetler by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: # 1 attachment)(Lucas, John) Modified on 7/9/2008 to remove pdf - duplicate filing of #303 (ANB).
July 8, 2008 Filing 303 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ennis Huffstetler by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Lucas, John)
July 8, 2008 Filing 302 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Billy Burchfield by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Lucas, John) Modified text on 7/9/2008 (ANB). Modified on 7/14/2008 to correct name of deponent (ANB).
July 8, 2008 Filing 301 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Caldwell by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: # 1 attachment)(Lucas, John) Modified on 7/9/2008 to remove pdf - duplicate filing of #300 (ANB).
July 8, 2008 Filing 300 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Caldwell by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Lucas, John)
July 8, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. (RLK)
July 8, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing on All Pending Motions - Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. (ANB)
July 7, 2008 Filing 299 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Response Brief to Defendants Motion to Strike Part IV of Ian Altmans Report, Declaration of Andrew J. Schwaba, and exhibits by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
July 7, 2008 Filing 298 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winemiller, John)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting dfts' #295 Motion for Nicole Y. Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/30/08. (ANB)
June 30, 2008 Filing 296 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Charles Curtis. Amended Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Supplemental Motion to Compel. (Coleman, Gregory)
June 26, 2008 Filing 295 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicole Altman ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 06490000000000973061.) by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #289 Supplemental MOTION to Compel filed by Charles Curtis to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley, Jr. USMJ. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/26/08. (ANB)
June 26, 2008 Filing 293 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #289 Supplemental MOTION to Compel w/ exhibits attached and located in vault. (ANB)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #290 Motion to to file supplemental brief in support of his motion to compel under seal. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/26/08. (ANB)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #287 Motion to file his reply brief and accompanying exhibits under seal. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/26/08. (ANB)
June 24, 2008 Filing 290 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel, Declaration of Andrew J. Schwaba and exhibits by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
June 24, 2008 Filing 289 Supplemental MOTION to Compel by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
June 23, 2008 Filing 288 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul O'Neill by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
June 23, 2008 Filing 287 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Third Declaration and accompanying exhibits by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER REFERRING #280 plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel and #282 defendant's MOTION to Strike SECTION IV OF THE REPORT, AND EXCLUDE THE CORRESPONDING TESTIMONY, OF IAN H. ALTMAN to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley Jr., USMJ. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on June 23, 2008. (AYB)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #281 plaintiff's Motion to Seal Document; granting #283 defendant's Motion for an order allowing filing of its memorandum in support of its motion to strike; granting #284 defendant's Motion for an order allowing filing its reply memorandum under seal. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on June 23, 2008. (AYB)
June 19, 2008 Filing 284 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, June 19, 2008 Declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein and accompanying exhibit by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 283 MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT ALCOA INC.S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE SECTION IV OF THE REPORT, AND EXCLUDE THE CORRESPONDING TESTIMONY, OF IAN H. ALTMAN and DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN GRUENSTEIN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALCOA INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE SECTION IV OF THE REPORT, AND EXCLUDE THE CORRESPONDING TESTIMONY, OF IAN H. ALTMAN by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 282 MOTION to Strike SECTION IV OF THE REPORT, AND EXCLUDE THE CORRESPONDING TESTIMONY, OF IAN H. ALTMAN by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 281 MOTION to Seal Document Brief, Declaration, and Exhibits 1-9 by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
June 19, 2008 Filing 280 MOTION to Compel by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
June 18, 2008 Filing 275 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gerald Wolfe by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
June 13, 2008 Filing 279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alcoa Inc. re #276 #277 #278 . (AYB)
June 13, 2008 Filing 278 DECLARATION of Meredith Shaw, Esq. in Support of #276 Defendant Alcoa, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Alcoa Inc. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (AYB). #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42 Part 1, #44 Exhibit 42 Part 2, #45 Exhibit 43) Modified on 6/18/2008 to place this pleading and exhibits under seal (AYB).
June 13, 2008 Filing 277 RESPONSE to 258 plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (AYB). Modified on 6/18/2008 to place pleading under seal (AYB).
June 13, 2008 Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to #254 plaintiffs' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Alcoa Inc. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (AYB). Modified on 6/18/2008 to seal pleading (AYB).
June 13, 2008 Filing 274 Letter to the Court from attorney Gregory Coleman regarding Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Counsel for Plaintiffs in Opposition of Defendant Alcoa, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. (AYB)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting Alcoa's #272 Motion to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/13/08. (ANB)
June 12, 2008 Filing 272 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, Declaration of Meredith Shaw and accompanying exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith Shaw by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel)
June 11, 2008 Filing 270 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Hilke by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #268 Motion to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/10/08. (ANB)
June 9, 2008 Copy of #269 Memorandum and Order mailed to Stephen Frank, Marcus J Green and Benjamin Gruenstein at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP, Worldwide Plaza, 825 8th Avenue, New York, NY 10019-7475 (KMK)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #266 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs shall have until and including June 24, 2008, to supplement their pending motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 6/09/2008. (KMK)
June 9, 2008 Filing 268 MOTION to Seal Document Opposition to Def. Alcoa's Motion for Summary Judgment by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
June 9, 2008 Filing 267 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ian Altman by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
June 5, 2008 Filing 266 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #206 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
June 4, 2008 Filing 265 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Harvey Martin on 6/4/2008 (Lucas, John)
June 4, 2008 Filing 264 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nicholaas Storm by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
June 3, 2008 Filing 263 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Harvey Martin by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Lucas, John)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #261 Motion for Extension of Time for Expert Disclosures to June 2, 2008. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/27/08. (ANB)
May 23, 2008 Filing 261 MOTION for Extension of Time For Expert Disclosures by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Slifkin, Daniel) Modified text on 5/23/2008 (ANB).
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting dft's #256 Motion to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/21/08. (ANB)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting plaintiffs' #253 Motion to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/21/08. (ANB)
May 20, 2008 Filing 256 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of #255 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Chesler, Evan) Modified text on 5/21/2008 (ANB).
May 20, 2008 Filing 255 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Chesler, Evan) Modified on 5/21/2008 to remove duplicate text (ANB).
May 20, 2008 Filing 254 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
May 20, 2008 Filing 253 MOTION to Seal Document by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
May 20, 2008 Filing 252 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/15/08, before Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jolene Owen, Telephone number 865-384-6585. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2008. (ANB)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting defendant's #231 Motion to Strike. The expert report and testimony of Professor Forman shall be excluded from trial. During the hearing, the possibility of calling Professor Forman for purposes other than those identified in Professor Forman's disclosures was discussed. That issue is not properly before this Court at this time, and the Court will not issue an advisory opinion as to what Professor Forman, or some other witness, may, or may not, testify to at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 5/20/08. (ANB)
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #244 Motion to Seal Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 5/19/08. (ANB)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #246 attorney Elizabeth Kennedy's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for defendant Alcoa, Inc. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on May 16, 2008. (AYB)
May 15, 2008 Filing 247 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2008 re #231 MOTION to Strike the Report and Exclude the Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman filed by Alcoa Inc. Oral Argument by the parties. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Jolene Owen.) (DCP)
May 15, 2008 Filing 246 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Elizabeth Kennedy) by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
May 15, 2008 Filing 245 REPLY to Response to Motion re #231 MOTION to Strike the Report and Exclude the Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman filed by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
May 14, 2008 Filing 244 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Response Brief to Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
May 14, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #231 MOTION to Strike the Report and Exclude the Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman : Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley per Order #243 . (ANB)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting Defendant's #232 Motion to Expedite to the extent that the Court will hear oral argument on the motion to strike #231 on May 15, 2008 at 10:30 a.m. Defense counsel is DIRECTED to coordinate all telephonic appearances for the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 5/14/08. (ANB)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #232 MOTION to Expedite and for Consideration of its Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman filed by Alcoa Inc., #231 MOTION to Strike the Report and Exclude the Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman filed by Alcoa Inc referred to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley, Jr. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/13/08. (ANB)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting dfts' #233 Motion to Seal Memorandum in Support of its motion to strike the report and exclude the testimony of Jonathan Forman. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/13/08. (ANB)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting dfts' #234 Motion for Benjamin Gruenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/13/08. (ANB)
May 12, 2008 Filing 238 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2008 re #183 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis, and #211 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. Oral argument of the parties. Order to follow. (Court Reporter L. Clark (M&M).) (DCP)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #235 Motion to Seal Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the plaintiffs' reply under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on 5/12/08. (ANB)
May 7, 2008 Filing 235 MOTION to Seal Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew) Modified on 5/8/2008 to note receipt of notebook and disk with proposed reply brief (ADA).
May 7, 2008 Filing 234 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin Gruenstein ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 06490000000000941364.) by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
May 6, 2008 Filing 233 MOTION to Seal Document (Memo in Support of Motion to Strike and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified on 5/8/2008 to note the receipt of the manual memorandum and a disk (ANB).
May 6, 2008 Filing 232 MOTION to Expedite and for Consideration of its Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
May 6, 2008 Filing 231 MOTION to Strike the Report and Exclude the Testimony of Jonathan B. Forman by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 AGREED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #229 Motion for Entry of Order Allowing Filing and Maintenance of Redacted Exhibit. The Clerk shall withdraw and destroy the unredacted Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew Schwaba #214 and replace it with Exhibit A to Plaintiff's #229 Motion filed on 5/1/08. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/5/08. (ANB)
May 1, 2008 Filing 229 MOTION for Order Allowing Filing and Maintenance of Redacted Exhibit #5 to #214 Affidavit of Andrew Schwaba in Support of Motion by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Lammel Deposition Excerpt)(Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 5/2/2008 (ANB).
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #226 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Expert Reports attached to Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Disclosures. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/30/08. (ANB)
April 29, 2008 Filing 226 MOTION to Seal Document #225 Witness List Designation of Expert Witnesses by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed #223 Motion for Amendment of Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/28/08. (ANB)
April 28, 2008 Filing 225 WITNESS LIST Designation of Expert Witnesses by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - filed Under Seal)(Schwaba, Andrew) (Attachment(s) added on 5/13/2008: #3 Exhibit A- Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit B Filed Under Seal) (ADA).
April 28, 2008 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #211 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Kennedy, #2 Ex. A Storm decl., #3 Ex. B Mordowanex decl., #4 Ex. C Priv. Log Entry 127, #5 Ex. D Privl. Log Entry 159, #6 Ex. E Priv. Log Entry 176, #7 Ex. F Priv. Log Entry 202, #8 Ex. G Priv. Log Entry 217, #9 Ex. H Priv. Log Entry 218, #10 Ex. I Priv. Log Entry 321, #11 Ex. J Willett Dep. Tr., #12 Ex. K Mordowanec Dep. Tr., #13 Ex. L Alcoa's 11.1.07 Priv. Log, #14 Ex. M Dec. 19 Kennedy Ltr, #15 Ex. N Feb. 1 Storm Decl., #16 Ex. O Feb. 25 Schwaba Ltr, #17 Ex. P Mar. 20 Kennedy ltr., #18 Ex. Q Mar. 20 Lucas Ltr., #19 Ex. R Lammel Dep. Tr., #20 Ex. S Mar. 27 Theuer Ltr, #21 Ex. T Mar. 31 Coleman email, #22 Ex. U Oxley Dep. Tr., #23 Ex. V Apr. 3 Lucas Ltr., #24 Ex. W Apr. 7 Storm decl., #25 Ex. X Apr. 8 Coleman Ltr., #26 Ex. Y Apr. 8 Lucas Ltr.)(Lucas, John)
April 25, 2008 Filing 223 MOTION to Amend/Revise #175 Scheduling Order, by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
April 25, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing on #211 MOTION to Compel and MOTION for Sanctions: Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. (AYB)
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER denying #220 MOTION for Amendment of Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/24/08. (ADA)
April 22, 2008 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 8, 2008 before Judge C. Clifford Shirley Jr. Court Reporter: Jolene Owen. (For a copy of this transcript, please contact the court reporter at 865-384-6585.) (AYB)
April 21, 2008 Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Amendment of Scheduling Order for by Charles Curtis, with proposed Order. (Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text and description on 4/21/2008 (ADA).
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #212 Motion to Seal exhibit #3 to #214 Affidavit in Support of Motion. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
April 17, 2008 Filing 218 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Carol Story by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
April 16, 2008 Filing 216 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Quaglia by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER REFERRING plaintiff's #211 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on April 15, 2008. (RLK)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER regarding a discovery dispute concerning allegedly privileged documents which were inadvertently disclosed as set forth more fully in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on April 10, 2008. (AYB)
April 10, 2008 Filing 214 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #211 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Alcoa's Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - letter dated 2/25/2008, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - letter dated 3/20/2008. Documents will be filed under Seal, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - letter dated 3/20/2008, # 5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Excerpt of Lammel's Deposition on 3/27/2008, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - letter dated 3/27/2008, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - email dated 3/31/2008, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 - Excerpt of Willett's Deposition, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 - Declaration of Mordowanec of 5/29/2007)(Schwaba, Andrew) (Attachment added on 4/18/2008: #10 Exhibit Sealed #3) (ADA). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2008: #11 Redacted Exhibit 5) (ANB, ).
April 10, 2008 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #211 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
April 10, 2008 Filing 212 MOTION to Seal Document by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
April 10, 2008 Filing 211 MOTION to Compel and MOTION for Sanctions by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 4/10/2008 (ADA).
April 8, 2008 Filing 210 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Discovery Hearing/Status Conference held via telephone on 4/8/2008. Argument of counsel regarding disclosure of privileged communications. Ruling from bench with written order to follow. (Court Reporter Jolene Owen.) (NGW)
April 2, 2008 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Lucas and John Winemiller as to law firm affiliation on behalf of Alcoa Inc., Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II) (Lucas, John) Modified text on 4/3/2008 (ADA).
April 2, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2008 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. The defendants shall initiate the phone call. (AYB)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER concerning a discovery dispute as to whether defendant Alcoa is obligated to produce electronic documents from two new custodians, Joseph Lucot and Julie Caponi. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on March 28, 2008. (AYB)
March 25, 2008 Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Telephone Conference held on 3/25/2008. Order to follow (Court Reporter Jolene Owen.) (DCP)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #183 plaintiffs' Motion to Compel portion of the motions, but only to the extent stated herein. The Court reserves ruling on the #183 Motion for Protective Order and #183 Motion for Sanctions. Once the parties have completed the steps established in this Order, the Court will take up any remaining issues at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley on March 25, 2008. (AYB)
March 24, 2008 Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT of Motion(s) Hearing held on February 20, 2008 before Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr. Court Reporter: Donnetta Kocuba. (for copy contact court reporter at 865-524-4590) (ADA)
March 20, 2008 Filing 204 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Oxley by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
March 20, 2008 Filing 203 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lauren McCullough by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
March 20, 2008 Filing 202 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Kovaloski by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
March 20, 2008 Filing 201 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mary Ellen Lammel by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
March 18, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2008 at 3:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. The parties shall initiate the call. (AYB)
March 12, 2008 Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/20/08 before Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr.. Court Reporter: Donnetta Kocuba. (DCP)
March 5, 2008 Filing 199 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Telephone Conference held on 3/5/2008. (DCP)
February 29, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 3/5/2008 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. Parties to initiate the call.(ANB)
February 21, 2008 Filing 197 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ronald Hoffman by Alcoa Inc.(Individually).(Lucas, John)
February 20, 2008 Filing 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2008 re #183 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. All documents are to be provided to the plaintiff's as directed. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Netta Kocuba.) (DCP)
February 13, 2008 Filing 196 Supplemental Declaration of Andrew J. Schwaba, in Support of #183 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Protective Order, and MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33 - Email dated Oct. 15, 2007, #2 Exhibit 34 - Filed under Seal, #3 Exhibit 35 - letter dated Oct 15, 2007 and email dated Oct. 16, 2007, #4 Exhibit 36 - will be filed Under Seal)(Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 2/13/2008 (ADA).
February 13, 2008 Filing 195 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #183 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 2/13/2008 (ADA).
February 11, 2008 Filing 194 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tom Moore by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
February 11, 2008 Filing 193 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brickey Beasley by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
February 4, 2008 Filing 192 AFFIDAVIT re #189 Response in Opposition to Motion of Elizabeth Kennedy by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1), #2 Exhibit 2), #3 Exhibit 3), #4 Exhibit 4), #5 Exhibit 5), #6 Exhibit 6), #7 Exhibit 7), #8 Exhibit 8), #9 Exhibit 9), #10 Exhibit 10), #11 Exhibit 11), #12 Exhibit 12), #13 Exhibit 13), #14 Exhibit 14), #15 Exhibit 15), #16 Exhibit 16), #17 Exhibit 17), #18 Exhibit 18), #19 Exhibit 19), #20 Exhibit 20), #21 Exhibit 21), #22 Exhibit 22), #23 Exhibit 23), #24 Exhibit 24), #25 Exhibit 25), #26 Exhibit 26), #27 Exhibit 27))(Lucas, John)
February 4, 2008 Filing 191 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholaas Storm in support of #189 Response in Opposition to Motion by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text on 2/5/2008 (ADA).
February 4, 2008 Filing 190 AFFIDAVIT of John T. Flynn in support of #189 Response in Opposition to Motion by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text on 2/5/2008 (ADA).
February 4, 2008 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Opposition re #183 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Sanctions filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
February 1, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #183 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley. (ANB)
January 31, 2008 Filing 188 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eugene Woloshyn by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
January 22, 2008 Filing 187 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Michaud by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Shirley: #183 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 1/17/08. (ADA)
January 15, 2008 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #183 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Plaintiffs' Document Production Request, #2 Exhibit #2 - Alcoa's Response to Document Request, #3 Exhibit #3 - Correspondence 11/1/2007, #4 Exhibit #4 - Correspondence 11/12/2007, #5 Exhibit #5 - Correspondence 11/28/2007, #6 Exhibit #6 - Correspondence 11/28/2007, #7 Exhibit #7 - Correspondence 12/6/2007, #8 Exhibit #8 - Correspondence 12/6/2007, #9 Exhibit #9 - Correspondence 12/6/2007, #10 Exhibit #10 - Email 12/7/2007, #11 Exhibit #11 - Correspondence 12/10/2007, #12 Exhibit #12 - Correspondence 12/19/2007, #13 Exhibit #13 - Correspondence 12/11/2007, #14 Exhibit #14 -Correspondence 11/30/2007, #15 Exhibit #15 - Notice of Deposition of Buck Consultants, #16 Exhibit #16 - Subpoena for Buck Consultants, #17 Exhibit #17 - Correspondence MMC 12/3/2007, #18 Exhibit #18 - Document filed under Seal, #19 Exhibit #19 - Correspondence MMC 12/20/2007, #20 Exhibit #20 - Correspondence 12/21/2007, #21 Exhibit #21 - Correspondence Buck 12/20/2007, #22 Exhibit #22 - Correspondence 12/19/2007, #23 Exhibit #23 - Deposition John Murphy, #24 Exhibit #24 - Exhibit filed under Seal, #25 Exhibit #25 - filed under Seal, #26 Exhibit #26 - filed under Seal, #27 Exhibit #27 - Deposition James Robinson, #28 Exhibit #28 - Correspondence 12/14/2007, #29 Exhibit #29 - filed unde Seal, #30 Exhibit #30 - filed under Seal, #31 Exhibit #30 - Correspondence 11/29/2007)(Schwaba, Andrew)
January 15, 2008 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #183 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
January 15, 2008 Filing 183 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION for Sanctions by Charles Curtis. (Schwaba, Andrew)
January 11, 2008 Filing 182 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary McDonald by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 1/11/2008 (ANB).
January 9, 2008 Filing 181 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bob Newman by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
January 9, 2008 Filing 180 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary McDonald by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 1/10/2008 (ANB).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 179 CONSENT ORDER of Class Certification, the Court concludes that appointment of class is appropriate and hereby appoints Gregory Coleman, Mona Wallace, Andrew Schwaba, Robert Catapano-Friedman and Sarah Catapano-Friedman as counsel for the class. The Court bifurcates Count Three, which is hereby stayed until such time as the class claims are resolved.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
December 17, 2007 Filing 178 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary McDonald by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
December 12, 2007 Filing 177 NOTICE to Take Deposition of E.F Smith by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
December 10, 2007 Filing 176 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #169 plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by Alcoa Inc. (Individually) and Alcoa Inc. (as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text on 12/11/2007 (AYB).
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/27/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Jury Trial reset for 9/17/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Thomas W Phillips.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 12/10/07. (ANB)
December 6, 2007 Filing 174 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doug Root by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
December 5, 2007 Filing 173 Unopposed Motion to Reset Trial Date by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text on 12/5/2007 (ADA).
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Thomas W Phillips, expected to last 2 weeks.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 11/27/07. (ADA)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 AGREED ORDER granting leave to file ( #169 ) Fifth Amended Complaint and defendant shall have thirty days to respond.Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
November 2, 2007 Filing 170 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Weidman by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 30, 2007 Filing 169 Fifth Amended Complaint against all defendants., filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 10/31/2007 (ADA).
October 30, 2007 Filing 168 doc, AMENDED COMPLAINT Fifth Amended Complaint against all defendants., filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Schwaba, Andrew); submitted without correct e-signature/login, refiled as #169 . Modified on 10/31/2007 (ADA).
October 25, 2007 Filing 167 Letter from Andrew J. Schwaba to Judge Phillips re proposed scheduling order. (DCP)
October 17, 2007 Filing 166 Letter from John Lucas regarding scheduling and discovery. (ADA)
October 17, 2007 Filing 165 Letter from Andrew J Schwaba regarding proposed Scheduling Order for Trial and Discovery. (ADA)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER; plaintiffs jury demand #43 is STRICKEN and plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction #117 is CONSOLIDATED withthe trial on the merits. #117 Motion for Preliminary Injunction {terminated}. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 10/17/07. (ADA)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of the following Order.Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
October 12, 2007 Filing 162 {Amended} NOTICE to Take Deposition of Actuarial Sciences Assoc (n/k/a Aon, Inc.) by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew) Modified text on 10/12/2007 (ADA).
October 11, 2007 Filing 161 NOTICE to Take Deposition of United Steelworkers International Union by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 5, 2007 Filing 160 NOTICE by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II) of Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Proposed Schedule for Discovery and Trial (Lucas, John)
October 3, 2007 Filing 159 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mercer Inc. by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 3, 2007 Filing 158 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Russell Porter by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
October 3, 2007 Filing 157 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mellon Financial Inc. n/k/a Bank of New York Mellon by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 3, 2007 Filing 156 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Towers Perrin by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 3, 2007 Filing 155 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hewitt Associates by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 3, 2007 Filing 154 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Actuarial Sciences Associates, Inc. by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 3, 2007 Filing 153 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pricewaterhouse Coopers by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 3, 2007 Filing 152 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Buck Consultants by Charles Curtis.(Schwaba, Andrew)
October 2, 2007 Filing 151 doc, NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mercer, Inc by Charles Curtis.(Hughes, John); submitted with improper e-signature, to be refiled. Modified on 10/3/2007 (ADA).
October 2, 2007 Filing 150 doc, NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mellon Financial, Inc. n/k/a Bank of New York Mellon by Charles Curtis.(Hughes, John); submitted with improper e-signature, to be refiled. Modified on 10/3/2007 (ADA).
October 2, 2007 Filing 149 doc, NOTICE to Take Deposition of Towers Perrin by Charles Curtis.(Hughes, John); submitted with improper e-signature, to be refiled. Modified on 10/3/2007 (ADA).
October 2, 2007 Filing 148 doc, NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hewitt Associates by Charles Curtis.(Hughes, John); submitted with improper e-signature, to be refiled. Modified on 10/3/2007 (ADA).
October 2, 2007 Filing 147 doc, NOTICE to Take Deposition of Acturial Sciences Assoc. n/k/a Aon, Inc. by Charles Curtis.(Hughes, John); submitted with improper e-signature, to be refiled. Modified on 10/3/2007 (ADA).
October 2, 2007 Filing 146 doc, NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pricewaterhouse Coopers by Charles Curtis.(Hughes, John); submitted with improper e-signature, to be refiled. Modified on 10/3/2007 (ADA).
October 2, 2007 Filing 145 doc, NOTICE to Take Deposition of Buck Consultants by Charles Curtis.(Hughes, John); submitted with improper e-signature, to be refiled. Modified on 10/3/2007 (ADA).
October 1, 2007 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on September 26, 2007 before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter: Jolene Owen. (for transcript please contact court reporter at 865-384-6585) (ADA)
September 26, 2007 Filing 143 MINUTE ENTRY -- Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge C. Clifford Shirley on 9/26/2007 re pending motions. Parties presented their positions on the class action issue. Court ruled that "cap" would be omitted from the proposed language and that the parties were to finalize other wording changes. An amended complaint should be filed incorporating the approved language. #113 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint and for Class Certification is granted. #117 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is heard. Plaintiff requested that the hearing be held on or before November 1, 2007 rather than combining it with trial. Counsel were additionally heard regarding this case being a jury or non-jury trial. Plaintiff submitted to the Court a proposed "road map" of how this case should proceed. Defendant is given ten (10) days within which to file their proposed "road map." #126 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery filed by Charles Curtis is withdrawn by the parties pursuant to letter submitted to Judge Phillips. These matters will be taken under advisement with Order to follow. (Court Reporter Jolene Owen.) (JMJ, Courtroom Deputy)
September 25, 2007 Filing 142 Defendant Alcoa Inc.'s Supplemental Submission Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend and For Class Certification #113 submitted by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text on 9/25/2007 (ADA).
September 14, 2007 Filing 141 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #113 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint and for Class Certification filed by Charles Curtis. (Hughes, John) Modified text on 9/17/2007 (ADA).
September 14, 2007 Filing 140 Alcoa Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response Brief on Court-Ordered Issues #132 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lucas, John) Modified text on 9/17/2007 (ADA).
September 14, 2007 Filing 139 Plaintiffs' Ominbus Reply Brief on Court Ordered Issues in reply to Defendants Memorandum in Response #130 to Questions Raised in the June 27, 2007 Order.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pringle v. Continental Tire#2 Exhibit Reese v. CNH)(Hughes, John) Modified text on 9/17/2007 (ADA).
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #134 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to #132 Response. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/10/07. (ADA)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marcus Green. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
September 5, 2007 Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marcus Green ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 800574.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #129 MOTION for Meredith Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/4/07. (ADA)
September 4, 2007 Filing 134 MOTION to Seal Document #132 Response, Exhibit B by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, John) Modified on 9/4/2007 to remove attachment #2 which contains confidential document requested to be filed under seal (ADA).
September 4, 2007 #132 Removed exhibit B from the record upon request of counsel. (ADA)
September 4, 2007 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #126 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
August 31, 2007 Filing 132 Omnibus brief on court-ordered issues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit unreported cases# 2 Exhibit declaration of counsel)(Hughes, John) Modified text on 9/4/2007 and removed attachment 132-3 to be placed under seal upon request of counsel (ADA). Modified on 9/10/2007to indicate Exhibit B being placed under seal per #138 (ADA).
August 31, 2007 Filing 131 RESPONSE to Motion re #113 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint and for Class Certification filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Ex. A (Alcoa's Proposed Class Definition)#2 Ex. B (Email re: Class Definition))(Lucas, John)
August 31, 2007 Filing 130 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Brief on Court-Ordered Issues. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits#2 Ex. 1 (Alcoa v. Alum Workers Int'l - 1976)#3 Ex. 2 (Alcoa v. United Steelworkers of America - 1991)#4 Ex. 3 (Excerpts of Hoffman notes 5/93)#5 Ex. 4 (handwritten notes)#6 Ex. 5 (Excerpts of 1993 Alcoa-ABG Master CBA)#7 Ex. 6 (Willett notes 6/3/96)#8 Ex. 7 (Seehafer ltr to Davis 6/3/96)#9 Ex. 8 (Willett notes 8/26/05)#10 Ex. 9 (Barse depo excerpts)#11 Ex. 10 (Best depo excerpts)#12 Ex. 11 (Henry depo excerpts)#13 Ex. 12 (LaBaff depo excerpts)#14 Ex. 13 (Mordowanec depo excerpts)#15 Ex. 14 (Murphy depo excerpts)#16 Ex. 15 (Pruitt depo excerpts)#17 Ex. 16 (Robinson depo excerpts)#18 Ex. 17 (Willett depo excerpts))(Lucas, John)
August 31, 2007 Filing 129 MOTION for Meredith Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 798409.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John) Modified text on 8/31/2007 (ANB).
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 AGREED ORDER as to the briefing schedule for the #117 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
August 15, 2007 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #126 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery filed by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Hughes, John)
August 15, 2007 Filing 126 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery by Charles Curtis. (Hughes, John)
August 14, 2007 Filing 125 REPORT of Mediator, Robert P. Murrian, case did not settle.(ADA)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Order permitting parties to file briefs in excess of 25 pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips and submitted for filing on 8/2/07. (ADA)
July 31, 2007 Filing 123 (dated SCF declaration) re #114 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Hughes, John) Modified text on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 122 (Exhibits to Dec of Counsel) #121 Affidavit in support of #117 Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (additional exhibits to dec of counsel)#2 Exhibit (additional exhibits to dec of counsel))(Hughes, John) Modified text and link on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 121 (Declaration of Counsel) John Hughes re #117 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1 through 8)#2 Exhibit (9 through 15))(Hughes, John) Modified text on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 120 (Additional Exhibits) to MEMORANDUM in Support of #117 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Hughes, John) Modified text on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 119 (Additional Exhibits) to MEMORANDUM in Support of #117 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (exhibit B part 2))(Hughes, John) Modified text on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #117 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit unreported cases)(Hughes, John)
July 31, 2007 Filing 117 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Hughes, John)
July 31, 2007 Filing 116 BRIEF in RESPONSE to Questions Raised in the June 27, 2007 Order #104 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix unreported cases)(Hughes, John) Modified text on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #113 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint Declaration of Attorney Robert S. Catapano-Friedman. (Catapano-Friedman, Robert)
July 31, 2007 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #113 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit unreported cases#2 Exhibit class representative declarations#3 Exhibit class counsel declarations)(Hughes, John)
July 31, 2007 Filing 113 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint and for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed class complaint#2 Exhibit mass plaintiff list)(Hughes, John) Modified text and description on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 112 NOTICE of Re-filing declarations originally filed in support of #22 . (Hughes, John) Modified on 8/1/2007 (ADA).
July 31, 2007 Filing 111 RESPONSE of Alcoa Inc's to Questions Raised in the June 27, 2007 Order. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Response#2 Appendix #3 A) Alcoa (1993) CBA excerpts#4 B) Reynolds (1993) CBA excerpts#5 C) 6/1/93 Newman ltr to Golden#6 D) Presentation excerpts#7 E) Alcoa Summary Plan Desc.#8 F) Your Retiree Health Care Plan excerpts#9 G) Alcoa (1996) CBA excerpts#10 H) 5/25/96 Union proposals#11 I) Alcoa Summary Plan Desc. (1996) excerpts#12 J) Alcoa (2001) CBA excerpts#13 K) Highlights of 2001 USWA contract settlement#14 L) Alcoa Master Agreement Plan, 2002 excerpts#15 M) 8/28/05 Newsletter#16 N) Miles v. Alcoa compl.#17 O) 6/1/06 Retiree Health Care Agmt.#18 P) 6/1/06 Proposed Agmt excperts#19 Q) 7/24/06 letter from USW Officials to USW Retirees#20 R) Russell Porter Declaration#21 S) Ron Bloom depo excerpts#22 T) James Robinson depo excerpts#23 U) John Murphy depo excerpts#24 V) Ernest LaBaff depo excerpts#25 W) Lawrence Fountaine depo excerpts#26 X) Dennis Macy depo excerpts)(Lucas, John)
July 30, 2007 Filing 110 Joint MOTION (for Order permitting parties to file briefs in excess of 25 pages) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreed Order)(Lucas, John) Modified text on 7/31/2007 (ADA).
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Leave to File Briefs in Excess of 25 Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/30/07. (ADA)
July 27, 2007 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, John)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Production and Usage of Documents, Information, and Testimony. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on July 6, 2007. (AYB)
June 29, 2007 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT (filed manually) of Proceedings held on June 26, 2007 before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter: Donetta Kocuba. (ADA)
June 29, 2007 Filing 105 NOTICE that the parties have agreed upon mediator Robert Murrian filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II) (Lucas, John) Modified text on 7/2/2007 (ADA).
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/27/2007: Denying as moot (subject to refiling) #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot (subject to refiling) #70 MOTION to Advance and Consolidate the Proceedings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2); denying as moot (subject to refiling) #98 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint; denying as moot #72 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman in support of #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2007 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Honorable Thomas W Phillips. The parties are also ORDERED to mediation and shall designate a mediator with notice to the Court of the selection of a mediator by July 6, 2007. If the parties cannot mutually agree on a mediator, the parties shall each submit a panel of three mediators by 7/6/2007, and the Court will then designate one of the mediators from the six presented. (JDH)
June 26, 2007 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W Phillips: Motion Hearing/Scheduling Conference held on 6/26/2007 re #70 MOTION to Advance and Consolidate the Proceedings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2), #72 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman in support of #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #98 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint. Arguments heard on pending motions. Plaintiffs agreed to withdraw the Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman, therefore #72 Motion to Strike Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman was denied as moot. All other pending motions were ordered denied as moot; parties may refiled these motions as of todays date. Motion deadline set for 7/31/2007; responses to motions set for 8/31/2007; reply to responses deadline set for 9/14/2007. Motion hearing all on pending motions are scheduled for 9/26/2007 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4 before the Honorable Thomas W. Phillips, United States District Judge. This case was ordered to mediation. Parties will have a deadline of 7/6/2007 to agree upon a mediator. If parties cannot stipulate to a mediator, each parties is to propose three mediators and the Court will choose from the six proposed mediators. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Netta Kocuba.) (JDH) Attachment modified on 6/27/2007 (JDH).
June 21, 2007 Filing 102 Reply to RESPONSE to #72 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman in support of #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text on 6/22/2007 (ADA).
June 21, 2007 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION to Advance and Consolidate the Proceedings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2) filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (June 14 Lucas to Coleman ltr))(Lucas, John)
June 21, 2007 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #98 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Hughes, John)
June 21, 2007 Filing 99 {Proposed} (Exhibit B to Motion) to #98 MOTION to Amend Complaint . (Hughes, John) Modified text on 6/21/2007 (ADA).
June 21, 2007 Filing 98 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed amended complaint)(Hughes, John)
June 18, 2007 Filing 97 NOTICE Deposition of Dave Willett (Coleman, Gregory)
June 18, 2007 Filing 96 NOTICE Deposition of Thomas Mordowanec (Coleman, Gregory)
June 15, 2007 Filing 95 NOTICE to Take Deposition of a representative or representatives of the United Steelworkers International Union, AFL-CIO Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually).(Lucas, John) Modified text on 6/18/2007 (ADA).
June 15, 2007 RESET NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference/Motion Hearing REset for 6/26/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Honorable Thomas W Phillips (continued from June 18, 2007). (AYB)
June 15, 2007 Filing 94 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Bloom by Alcoa Inc.(Individually).(Lucas, John)
June 14, 2007 Filing 93 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Murphy by Alcoa Inc.(Individually).(Lucas, John)
June 14, 2007 Filing 92 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ernie LaBaff by Alcoa Inc.(Individually).(Lucas, John)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Kennedy signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/13/2007. (JDH)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen Frank signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/13/2007. (JDH)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Slifkin signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/13/2006. (JDH)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan R. Chesler signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/13/2007. (JDH)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting plaintiffs' #74 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply to Defendant's Brief in Support of Alcoa's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/11/07. (ANB)
June 12, 2007 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Kennedy ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 756280.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
June 12, 2007 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen Frank ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 756277.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
June 12, 2007 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Slifkin ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 756266.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
June 12, 2007 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan R. Chesler ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 756254.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Lucas, John)
June 11, 2007 Filing 82 Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman in support of #81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Robert S. Catapano-Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4)(Catapano-Friedman, Robert) Modified text on 6/12/2007 (ANB).
June 11, 2007 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman. (Catapano-Friedman, Robert) Modified text on 6/12/2007 (ANB).
June 11, 2007 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Advance and Consolidate the Proceedings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2) filed by Charles Curtis. (Hughes, John)
June 11, 2007 Filing 79 Supplemental Declaration of Robert S. Catapano-Friedman, Esq. re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9#10 Exhibit 10#11 Exhibit 11#12 Exhibit 12#13 Exhibit 13#14 Exhibit 14#15 Exhibit 15#16 Exhibit 16#17 Exhibit 17#18 Exhibit 18#19 Exhibit 19#20 Exhibit 20#21 Exhibit 21#22 Exhibit 22#23 Exhibit 23#24 Exhibit 24#25 Exhibit 25#26 Exhibit 26)(Catapano-Friedman, Robert) Modified text on 6/12/2007 (ANB).
June 8, 2007 Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF by Charles Curtis in support of Motion #18 for preliminary imjunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit #10 Exhibit)(Hughes, John) Modified text and link on 6/11/2007 (ADA).
June 8, 2007 Filing 77 doc, SUPPLEMENT DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. CATAPANO-FRIEDMAN, ESQ. by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit # 25 Exhibit # 26 Exhibit)(Hughes, John); submitted without appropriate signature, refiled as #79 (e-signature of Robert Catapano-Friedman under login of John Hughes) Modified on 6/11/2007 (ADA).
June 6, 2007 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT (file manually with the Clerk's Office) of Scheduling Conference held on June 5, 2007 before Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Court Reporter: Donetta Kocuba. (ADA)
June 5, 2007 Filing 75 MINUTE ENTRY -- Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/5/2007. Parties report that the Rule 26(f) conference has been held but the report has not yet been filed. Court encourages the parties to consider participation in mediation and/or non-binding arbitration. This matter is rescheduled to allow counsel to discuss whether this trial will be held in conjunction with the preliminary injunction or separately and to allow the parties to reach an agreement on the two proposed scheduling orders submitted.Scheduling Conference reset for 6/18/2007 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Honorable Thomas W Phillips. (Court Reporter Netta Kocuba.) (JMJ, Courtroom Deputy)
June 5, 2007 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order - Allowing More Pages)(Coleman, Gregory)
June 4, 2007 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #72 MOTION to Strike #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually). (Lucas, John)
June 4, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Robert Catapano-Friedman in support of #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually). (Lucas, John) Modified text and description on 6/5/2007 (ADA).
June 4, 2007 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #70 MOTION to Advance and Consolidate the Proceedings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2) filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
June 4, 2007 Filing 70 MOTION to Advance and Consolidate the Proceedings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 MOTION for Leave for Andrew J. Schwaba to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 6/1/07. (ADA)
June 1, 2007 Filing 68 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by all parties. (Coleman, Gregory)
May 31, 2007 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave for Andrew J. Schwaba to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 60.00 receipt number 750202.) by Charles Curtis, with certificates of good standing attached. (Hughes, John) Modified text on 5/31/2007 (ADA).
May 30, 2007 Filing 66 Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order. (Catapano-Friedman, Robert) Modified text on 5/31/2007 (ADA).
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #52 MOTION for Leave for Edward Nicholson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
May 29, 2007 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joseph Quaglia & Exh. A-J#2 Exhibit K-N of Quaglia Decl.#3 Affidavit Russell Porter#4 Affidavit Thomas Mordowanec)(Lucas, John)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting defendant's #62 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
May 24, 2007 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winemiller, John)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER whereby the time in which the defendant Alcoa, Inc. may file its Response to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended to and including May 29, 2007.Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on May 17, 2007. (AYB)
May 11, 2007 Filing 60 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Russell Lee Pruitt by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
May 11, 2007 Filing 59 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Arthur Henry by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
May 11, 2007 Filing 58 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jesse L.O. Shaber by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
May 11, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Terry Lee Best by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
May 7, 2007 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
May 4, 2007 Filing 55 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dennis Macy, Stephen Barse and Lawrence Fountaine by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Lucas, John)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #48 defendant's Motion to Shorten Response Time and for Expedited Consideration to the extent as set forth more fully in this Order. Signed by Judge C Clifford Shirley on May 1, 2007. (Attachments: #1) (AYB)
May 1, 2007 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing (Doc. 48) held on April 26, 2007 before Judge C. Clifford Shirley. Court Reporter: Netta Kocuba. (AYB)
April 30, 2007 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave for Edward Nicholson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 734019.) by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, John) Modified text and added COGS on 5/22/2007 (ADA).
April 27, 2007 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge C Clifford Shirley: Motion Hearing continued to 4/27/2007 re #48 MOTION to Shorten Response Time and For Expedited Consideration filed by Alcoa Inc. The Court finds that discovery is limited as to the interrogatories with responses due May 14, 2007; at this time, Request to Produce Documents is not required. Parties may engage in discovery between now and June 25, 2007. Defendant's response to plaintiff's Motion is still due May 25, 2007. Parties are limited to 10 depositions each with each deposition limited to 3-4 hours, plus the 30(b)(6) depositions of the union representatives which shall last one day. Order to follow. (Court Reporter John Lucas had Court Reporter at his office.) (CRS, )
April 26, 2007 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge C Clifford Shirley: Motion Hearing held telephonically on 4/26/2007 re #48 MOTION to Shorten Response Time and For Expedited Consideration filed by Alcoa Inc. Taken under advisement with parties to call the Court at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, April 27, 2007. (Court Reporter Netta Kocuba) (CRS, Courtroom Deputy)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Shirley: #48 MOTION to Shorten Response Time and For Expedited Consideration filed by Alcoa Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/25/07. (ADA)
April 25, 2007 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/26/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate C Clifford Shirley. The parties shall initiate the call. (AYB)
April 25, 2007 Filing 48 MOTION to Shorten Response Time and For Expedited Consideration by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 Alcoa' Written Discovery)(Lucas, John)
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #23 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to the extent that the defendant shall have until May 25, 2007, to respond to the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge C Clifford Shirley on April 23, 2007. (AYB)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 MOTION for Leave by Mona Lisa Wallace, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/20/07. (ADA)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John William Woods Jr.Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
April 18, 2007 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave by Mona Lisa Wallace, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 728257) by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, John) Modified text and description on 4/18/2007 (ADA).
April 18, 2007 Filing 43 (Corrected) AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Complaint against all defendants.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Badin#2 Supplement Client List - Louisville-Warwick#3 Supplement Client List - TN.AR.IA.WA.TX.OR#4 Supplement Massena (as of 4-16-2007))(Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 4/18/2007 (ADA).
April 17, 2007 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Badin - Client Listing#2 Supplement #3 Supplement #4 Supplement)(Coleman, Gregory)
April 16, 2007 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Ex. A Stringham case#2 Ex. B Noble case#3 Ex. C Outcomes Phar. case#4 Ex. D Flexsys case#5 Ex. E Murphy case#6 Ex. F. Commissariat case#7 Ex. G. Vittoria N.A. case#8 Ex. H Miller case#9 Ex. I PTC case#10 Ex. J Wood case#11 Ex. K Bailey case#12 Ex. L Babn Tech. case#13 Ex. M Moravek case#14 Ex. N Pergo case#15 Ex. O Wood's docket report#16 Ex. P Bailey's docket report#17 Ex. Q Declaration of Mike Williams)(Lucas, John)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AGREED ORDER allowing plaintiffs' to file a fourth amended complaint.Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #29 MOTION for Leave for James Phillip Naughton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Shirley: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Alcoa Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/10/07. (ADA)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 MOTION to Withdraw (Wood Lay and Eric Zion) as attorneys of record. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/10/07. (ADA)
April 9, 2007 NOTICE OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference reset from 5/14/2007 to 6/5/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Honorable Thomas W Phillips. (Courtreporter requested.)(JMJ)
April 6, 2007 Filing 36 Letter from attorney Gregory Coleman regarding copies of signed declarations provided to opposing counsel. (ADA)
April 6, 2007 Filing 35 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion (Doc. 25) to Strike unsigned declarations filed in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), and Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II) (Lucas, John) Modified text on 4/9/2007 (ADA).
April 6, 2007 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw (Wood Lay and Eric Zion) as attorneys of record by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Winemiller, John) Modified text and description on 4/9/2007 (ADA).
April 6, 2007 Filing 33 doc, NOTICE by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II) of Withdrawal of Motion (Doc. 25) (Lucas, John); submitted with incorrect pdf attached, removed from the record for refling. Modified on 4/9/2007 (ADA).
April 6, 2007 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John William Woods Jr., ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 721698.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Winemiller, John) USDC certificate attachment added on 4/17/2007 (ADA).
April 4, 2007 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for preliminary injunction and to #25 MOTION to Strike unsigned declarations filed in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5)(Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 4/5/2007 (ADA).
April 4, 2007 Filing 30 doc, RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for preliminary injunction, #25 MOTION to Strike unsigned declarations filed in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5)(Coleman, Gregory); submitted with incorrectly formatted signature on attached declaration, removed from the record and refiled as #31 . Modified on 4/4/2007 (ADA).
April 4, 2007 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave for James Phillip Naughton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 60.00 paid, receipt number 720432.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order)(Winemiller, John) Modified text and description on 4/4/2007 (ADA).
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Leave for John Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
March 30, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave for John Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 718108.) ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 718108.) by Charles Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, John) Modified text and description on 3/30/2007 (ADA).
March 28, 2007 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Strike filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John)
March 28, 2007 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike unsigned declarations filed in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text and description on 3/28/2007 (ADA ).
March 28, 2007 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 Unpublished case, Bowling v. Scott#2 Unpublished case, U.S. v. Hughes#3 Unpublished case, Holmes v. City of Knoxville#4 Unpublished case, Cargle v. City of Chattanooga)(Lucas, John)
March 28, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for preliminary injunction by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Lucas, John) Modified text and description on 3/28/2007 (ADA).
March 20, 2007 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13 #14 #15 #16 #17 #18 #19 #20 #21 #22 #23 #24 #25 #26 #27 #28 #29 #30 #31 #32 #33 #34)(Coleman, Gregory)
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File brief with Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips. (ADA)
March 19, 2007 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(Coleman, Gregory)
March 16, 2007 Filing 19 doc, MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16 # 17 # 18 # 19 # 20 # 21 # 22 # 23 # 24 # 25 # 26 # 27 # 28 # 29 # 30 # 31 # 32 # 33)(Coleman, Gregory); extended brief filed without leave of court, removed from the record. Modified on 3/19/2007 (ADA).
March 16, 2007 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Coleman, Gregory)
March 16, 2007 Filing 17 doc, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Attachments: # 1), submitted without proposed filing attached. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified on 3/19/2007 (ADA).
February 23, 2007 NOTICE OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Honorable Thomas W Phillips. (JMJ)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave for Eric Zion and Wood W. Lay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 2/2/07. (ADA)
January 25, 2007 Filing fee received for pro hac vice: $ 60.00, receipt number K3004352. (see #15 ) (ADA)
January 24, 2007 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave for Eric Zion and Wood W. Lay to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 60.00 receipt number 679099.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(Winemiller, John) Modified text and description on 1/24/2007 (ADA).
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting defendants' #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patricia K. Epps and Ryan A. Glasgow. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 1/18/07. (ADA)
January 18, 2007 Filing 13 (Case at Issue) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge Shirley. (ADA)
January 18, 2007 RECEIPT #K3004289 in the amount of $60.00 for pro hac vice fee, see #10 . (ADA)
January 18, 2007 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest byAlcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II). (Winemiller, John)
January 18, 2007 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II).(Winemiller, John)
January 17, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patricia K. Epps and Ryan A. Glasgow ( Filing fee $ 60 receipt number 674808.) by Alcoa Inc.(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing/Epps#2 Certificate of Good Standing/Glasgow#3 Proposed Order)(Winemiller, John)
January 16, 2007 Filing 9 Third Amended Complaint against all defendants.(Catapano-Friedman, Robert) Modified text on 1/17/2007 (ADA).
January 12, 2007 Filing 8 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants.(Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 1/16/2007 (ADA).
January 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Robert S. Catapano-Friedman and Sarah Catapano-Friedman requests for admission to practice in this case pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #4 and #5 .Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 1/4/07. (ADA)
December 28, 2006 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiffs upon Alcoa, Inc on 12/27/06. (Coleman, Gregory) Modified text on 12/28/2006 (ADA).
December 22, 2006 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants., filed by Donald J. Baker, Tony A Carpenter, Bonnie Carr, Richard E Carroll, Gary Carter, Kenneth L Carver, Walter Carver, Jimmy W Cash, Margaret Cash, Buddy Cathcart, Theodore Chandler, Ralph Adams, Sr, Ralph E Clark, Jeff Clendenen, Kenneth Clure, Marvie J Clure, Charles L Collins, Gary Cook, Larry P Cooke, James N Cooper, James W Cooper, Kenneth E Cooper, Steve Albright, Lorene W Cooper, Janet Corkland, Edwin R Coulter, Reagan Coulter, Bill Cromwell, Kenneth M Cunningham, John Curtis, Don Cutshaw, Bonnie M Davis, Talley S Davis, Johnny Allison, Vernon L Davis, Austin DeFord, Conley Dockery, Creed Dockery, Dean Dockery, Donald C Dockery, Isaac M Dockery, Kathryn Dodd, George Downey, Jackie Duff, James Andies, Donald E Dunlap, Leroy Dunlap, William A Dunlap, Billy E Dunn, Bobby G Dyke, Jimmy L. Dykes, R. W. Edgeman, David C Elliot, Sharon R Evan, Patricia A Evans, Harold Arp, Walter R Evans, Billy R Atkins, John Paul Axley, Donald J Baker, Ross Bailey, Samuel L Baines, Charles Curtis, Doyle W Barbra, James Berry, Joe A Berry, Ben C Best, Earl Best, Jr, Robert K Bible, Walter D Birchfield, Charles E Black, Earl Blevins, William S Blevins, Alcoa Inc.(Individually), Charles R Boling, Richard Boling, Doral C Boring, Jimmy Lee Bowers, Charles Bradam, Alcoa Inc.(as Fiduciary of the Employees' Group Benefits Plan of Alcoa Inc., Plan II), Joe M Bradley, Manuel Branch, Jr, Willie B Branning, Elmer L Breeden, William J Brewer, Melvin Bridges, Dennis Brown, Fred H Brown, Larry Brown, Lloyd E Brown, Richard L Brown, William - Bryant, Melvin C Burchell, Ralph L Burdine, Darrell G Cable, Daniel H Caldwell, Douglas Campbell, Ted C Campbell, Gary Cannon, Frank Carpenter, Thomas Abbott. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8 #9)(Coleman, Gregory) Modified on 12/26/2006 to remove defendant as filer (ADA).
December 21, 2006 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave for Sarah Catapano-Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 60.00 paid receipt #K3004099) by plaintiffs with certificate of good standing included. (ADA)
December 21, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave for Robert S. Catapano-Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 60.00 paid receipt #K3004098) by plaintiffs with certificate of good standing included. (ADA)
December 21, 2006 Filing 2 doc, AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by Tony A Carpenter, Bonnie Carr, Richard E Carroll, Gary Carter, Kenneth L Carver, Walter Carver, Jimmy W Cash, Margaret Cash, Buddy Cathcart, Theodore Chandler, Ralph Adams, Sr, Ralph E Clark, Jeff Clendenen, Kenneth Clure, Marvie J Clure, Charles L Collins, Gary Cook, Larry P Cooke, James N Cooper, James W Cooper, Kenneth E Cooper, Steve Albright, Lorene W Cooper, Janet Corkland, Edwin R Coulter, Reagan Coulter, Bill Cromwell, Kenneth M Cunningham, John Curtis, Don Cutshaw, Bonnie M Davis, Talley S Davis, Johnny Allison, Vernon L Davis, Austin DeFord, Conley Dockery, Creed Dockery, Dean Dockery, Donald C Dockery, Isaac M Dockery, Kathryn Dodd, George Downey, Jackie Duff, James Andies, Donald E Dunlap, Leroy Dunlap, William A Dunlap, Billy E Dunn, Bobby G Dyke, Jimmy L. Dykes, R. W. Edgeman, David C Elliot, Sharon R Evan, Patricia A Evans, Harold Arp, Walter R Evans, Billy R Atkins, John Paul Axley, Donald J Baker, Ross Bailey, Samuel L Baines, Charles Curtis, Doyle W Barbra, James Berry, Joe A Berry, Ben C Best, Earl Best, Jr, Robert K Bible, Walter D Birchfield, Charles E Black, Earl Blevins, William S Blevins, Charles R Boling, Richard Boling, Doral C Boring, Jimmy Lee Bowers, Charles Bradam, Joe M Bradley, Manuel Branch, Jr, Willie B Branning, Elmer L Breeden, William J Brewer, Melvin Bridges, Dennis Brown, Fred H Brown, Larry Brown, Lloyd E Brown, Richard L Brown, William - Bryant, Melvin C Burchell, Ralph L Burdine, Darrell G Cable, Daniel H Caldwell, Douglas Campbell, Ted C Campbell, Gary Cannon, Frank Carpenter, Thomas Abbott. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8) (Coleman, Gregory), removed from the record because no main document was attached. Modified on 12/21/2006 to remove defendants as filers (AYB) Removed on 12/26/2006 (ADA).
November 17, 2006 Summons Issued as to Alcoa Inc. (RLK)
November 17, 2006 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number K3003837 (RLK)
November 17, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alcoa Inc., (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Phillips/Shirley)(RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Alcoa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia D Beck
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernie F Beals
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold G Woods
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Van, Hook
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda G Collatt
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie D Whitmire
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin D Peterson
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy W Birchfield
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry A Payne
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy R Potter
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn T Myers
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Boyea
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald D Schneden
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Plowman Stoupe
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell R Everley
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph L Vickery
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oval Monroe Ledbetter, Jr
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Kuehn
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Branch, Jr.
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Joe Grimes
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B Swick
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde R Devine
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Willingham
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Dubritsky
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry LaBarge
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Neal Pelton
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C Wear
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn McKenzie
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Holmes
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles McGinnis
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Leonard
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geter P Jenkins, Jr
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles F Sheets
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee A Gardner
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Lee Collins
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip N Titzer
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Rottier Sr
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles G Gardner
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Roes
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Martin
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest L Jennings
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel C McCord
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Parks
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R Rakes
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley W Daywalt
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie W Weaver
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edsel F Marsh, Jr
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Clauson
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren R Kaetzel
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Ross Bensing
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny K Ahrens
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Kaczinski
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Jerome Zeller
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda C Strunk
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest E Buckley
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Brown
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tillman J Culp
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R Greaser
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J Luttenegger
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia S Angermeier
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B Coder
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce A Bolton
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob G Huskey
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McIntosh
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert W Jones
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A Niehaus
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman E Fields
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne E Wilming
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P Fisher
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Davis
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Bridges
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosella A Houchins
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Reinart
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M Berrong
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Beck
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald W Garrett
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy L Reagan
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy J Holloway
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond W Radford
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambrose Allen Watts
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall E Hurst
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby G Dyke
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Robert S Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Represented By: Sarah Catapano-Friedman
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]