Holt v. Menu Foods Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lizajean Holt, Donna Lefebvre, Debra LeRoy and Kim Leonard
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00094
Filed: March 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2007 Filing 11
Letter from USDC re MDL Transfer (ADA)
June 22, 2007 Filing 10
TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel re docket #1850. Forwarded to USDC Camden New Jersey. (ADA)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER granting 6, 7 and 8 Motion(s) by Michael P. Turiello, Priya K. Jesani and Edward B. Ruff, III, for admission to practice in this case pro hac vice on behalf of defendant. Signed by Judge Thomas W Phillips on 5/16/07. (ADA)
May 10, 2007 Filing 8
MOTION for Leave for Edward B. Ruff III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 60.00 paid receipt #K3005128) by Menu Foods Inc., with certificate of good standing from USDC Northern Illinois. (ADA)
April 6, 2007 Filing 2
AMENDED COMPLAINT adding plaintiffs against all defendants, filed by Lizajean Holt et al.(Andrews, A) Modified text on 4/9/2007 (ADA).
March 19, 2007 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Menu Foods Inc. (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Lizajean Holt. (Phillips/Shirley)(RLK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Menu Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizajean Holt
Represented By: Perry A Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lefebvre
Represented By: Perry A Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra LeRoy
Represented By: Perry A Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Leonard
Represented By: Perry A Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Turiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?