United States of America v. McCormick
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Willard S McCormick
Case Number: 3:2011cv00114
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The government's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Contempt and Sanctions [Doc. 28 ] is GRANTED, and the government's Motion for Contempt and for Sanctions [Doc. 14 ] is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to defendant. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/2/15. (copy mailed to Willard McCormick) (JBR)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum and Order. A hearing has been tentatively set for 10/9/14 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 9/12/14. (copy sent via certified mail to W. McCormick at 7144 Pisa Circle, Corryton, TN 37721, Tracking No. 7013-2630-0002-1534-1921)(JBR)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court finds that the Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery 9 is well-taken, and it is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant Willard S. McCormick SHALL RESPOND to the post-judgment discovery that has been served upon him on or before June 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 5/27/14. (c/m to Mr. McCormick at 7144 Pisa Circle, Corryton, TN 37721) (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William J Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard S McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?