January 15, 2021 |
Filing
734
ORDER denying (683) Motion to Compel in case 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG; denying (638) Motion to Compel in case 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG; denying (618) Motion to Compel in case 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG; denying (551) Motion to Compel in ca se 3:15-cv-00017-TAV-HBG; denying (559) Motion to Compel in case 3:15-cv-00274-TAV-HBG; denying (540) Motion to Compel in case 3:15-cv-00420-TAV-HBG; denying (539) Motion to Compel in case 3:15-cv-00460-TAV-HBG; denying (543) Motion to Compel in case 3:15-cv-00462-TAV-HBG; denying (427) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-cv-00635-TAV-HBG; denying (423) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-cv-00636-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 1/15/21. (ABF)
|
December 22, 2020 |
Filing
728
ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Bar Late Expert Reports [Doc. 715 ], addressing additional expert reports on the damages claimed by Plaintiffs Kaleb William Rose, Clint Mannis, Dan Cody, Harvey Bass, Jimmy Kilby, Kevin Thompson, Mike McCarthy, and Roy Enoch Edmonds, will be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 12/22/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (JBR)
|
December 11, 2020 |
Filing
718
ORDER. Now before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Bar Late Expert Reports and Request for Expedited Briefing 715 , filed on December 10, 2020. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their response to the Motion on or before December 15, 2020. Any reply brief shall be filed on or before December 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 12/11/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al.(ADA)
|
November 6, 2020 |
Filing
682
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated above, the Motion to Quash Subpoena for Non-Party Bergan Clark [Doc. 656 ], as well as Motion to Quash Subpoena for Non-Party Logan Birdsong [Doc. 657 ], are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/6/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (JBR)
|
November 5, 2020 |
Filing
680
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw the Subpoena [Doc. 678 ] is GRANTED, and the Subpoena of Tom D. Kilgore is WITHDRAWN. Therefore, Kilgore's Motion to Quash [Doc. 645 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/5/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (JBR)
|
November 3, 2020 |
Filing
670
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Motion to Quash [Doc. 629 ] is GRANTED, and the subpoena for the deposition of Jeffrey J. Lyash, President and CEO of TVA [Doc. 591 ] is QUASHED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/3/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (JBR)
|
October 19, 2020 |
Filing
639
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw the Subpoena [Doc. 635 ] is GRANTED, and the Subpoena of Mr. Rios [Doc. 618 ] is WITHDRAWN. The Clerk of Court is also DIRECTED to mail this Order to the address listed by Mr. Rios in his letter to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/19/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (copy mailed to Al Rios, 2630 N. Vuelta Vista Antigua, Tucson, AZ 85715)(JBR)
|
July 7, 2020 |
Filing
561
ORDER denying (512) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG; denying (495) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG; denying (475) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG; denying (407) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:15-cv-00017-TAV-HBG; denying (415) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:15-cv-00274-TAV-HBG; denying (396) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:15-cv-00420-TAV-HBG; denying (395) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:15-cv-00460-TAV-HBG; denying (399) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:15-cv-00462-TAV-HBG; denying (283) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:16-cv-00635-TAV-HBG; denying (279) Motion for Sanctions in case 3:16-cv-00636-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/7/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (JBR)
|
May 12, 2020 |
Filing
527
ORDER: the parties shall complete all fact discovery in each of these cases by November 13, 2020. This deadline will not be extended absent extraordinary circumstances. In light of this firm deadline, the Court will amend its standard procedure for the resolution of discovery disputes: If a discovery dispute arises, the parties are DIRECTED to confer with United States Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton. The Court will set a deadline for expert discovery in a future order. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on May 12, 2020. (AYB)
|
April 28, 2020 |
Filing
519
ORDER LIFTING STAY. Upon review of the record in this case, the Court finds that the stay currently in effect is no longer required. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to LIFT the stay in this matter. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on April 28, 2020. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (AYB)
|
April 15, 2020 |
Filing
503
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court hereby RELIEVES the mediator, Daniel J. Balhoff, of his appointment as mediator in this case, and the Court does hereby express its gratitude for his efforts in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/15/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al.(JBR)
|
February 14, 2020 |
Filing
488
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Following communication with the parties and the mediator, the Court finds that the deadline for mediation will be extended until March 31, 2020. The Court directs the parties that if they are unable to compl etely resolve this litigation pursuant to mediation, they SHALL report to the Court within ten (10) days following the conclusion of the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 02/14/20. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al.(JBR)
|
August 16, 2019 |
Filing
479
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: As the mediator has not filed a report with the Court stating the outcome of the mediation, the Court finds that the deadline for mediation will be extended an additional sixty (60) days, until October 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/16/19. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al.(JBR)
|
March 22, 2019 |
Filing
466
ORDER, for good cause shown, the Joint Proposal Regarding Selection of Mediator 465 is GRANTED. In light of the parties' agreement, the Court approves the appointment of Mr. Balhoff (Daniel J. Balhoff) to serve as a mediato r in the present case. The parties are DIRECTED to mediate this litigation in good faith in accordance with the Court's original order referring the case to mediation on January 18, 2019. 459 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 3/22/19. (ADA)
|
February 28, 2019 |
Filing
462
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (437) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (439) Motion for New Trial in case 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG; denying (420) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (422) Motion for New Trial in case 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG; denying (400) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (402) Motion for New Trial in case 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG; denying (332) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (334) Motion for New Tr ial in case 3:15-cv-00017-TAV-HBG; denying (340) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (342) Motion for New Trial in case 3:15-cv-00274-TAV-HBG; denying (323) Motion for New Trial; denying (321) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law in case 3:15-cv-00420-TAV-HBG; denying (320) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (322) Motion for New Trial in case 3:15-cv-00460-TAV-HBG; denying (324) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (326) Motion for New Trial in case 3:15-cv-00462-TAV-HBG; denying (207) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (209) Motion for New Trial in case 3:16-cv-00635-TAV-HBG; denying (203) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying (205) Motion for New Trial in case 3:16-cv-00636-TAV-HBG. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/28/19. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG et al. (JBR, )
|
October 15, 2018 |
Filing
366
ORDER. The Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the R&R [Doc. 326]. Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/15/18. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (JBR).
|
September 19, 2018 |
Filing
302
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - defendants motion for summary judgment on the issue of general causation [Doc. 237], is hereby DENIED, and defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings with respect to plaintiffs strict liability claims [ Doc. 251] is GRANTED. These cases will therefore proceed to trial on phase one, in accordance with the bifurcated trial plan previously entered by the Court [Doc. 136].Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG(KMK, )
|
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
291
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's objections are hereby OVERRULED, and Magistrate Judge Guyton's memorandum opinion order is AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/22/18. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR)
|
July 18, 2018 |
Filing
279
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (240) Motion in Limine in case 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG; denying (235) Motion in Limine in case 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG; denying (216) Motion in Limine in case 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/18/18. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
235
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Filing
230
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 1/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
160
ORDER denying (156) Motion to Strike in case 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG; denying (151) Motion to Strike in case 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG; denying (131) Motion to Strike in case 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/5/17. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing
158
ORDER granting (151) Motion to Intervene in case 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG; granting (146) Motion to Intervene in case 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG; granting (126) Motion to Intervene in case 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/25/17. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR)
|
February 23, 2017 |
Filing
138
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 1/29/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 2/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG(JBR)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
86
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying (66 in 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 46 in 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG, 71 in 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG) MOTION for Entry of a Lone Pine Case Management Order filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. Jury Trial reset for 5/1/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/29/16. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG(JBR)
|
April 14, 2016 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The captioned cases, with the exception of McCarthy v. G.UM.MK Constructors, 3:14-CV-472, are CONSOLIDATED for discovery and motion practice, but not for trial at this time. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/14/16. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG(JBR)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/3/14. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00505-TAV-HBG, 3:13-cv-00666-TAV-HBG, 3:14-cv-00020-TAV-HBG (JBR)
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing
35
ORDER of CONSOLIDATION granting the Motion to Consolidate. The cases captioned herein are CONSOLIDATED pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Adkisson v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., 3:13-CV-505, is t he first-filed of the three cases, and it SHALL SERVE as the lead case for purposes of this consolidation. All future filings shall only be made in Adkisson v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., 3:13-CV-505. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on July 10, 2014. (AYB)
|