Pierce et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Pierce, Michael Pierce, Benjamin Blount, Nicholas Chappell, Billy L. Clark, David Hart, James H. Hicks, Nick Lucas, Robert Bryant West, Kisa Abbott, Steven Brooks, Lisa Brown, Stacy Caldwell, Jasyntha Cornwell, Bradley D. Dalton, Dennis Gray, Matthew Greene, Daniel Hurst, Mitzi Lindsey, Heather Myrick, Cowan Rodgers, IV, Tiffany Sweeley, Brett Williamson, Jaxon Wirgau, Krysty Burroughs, William H. Repass, Amber Whaley, Heather D. Williams, Amber Leigh Albertini, Tracy Capehart, Marc Cohen, Amanda Farmer, David Goodall, Deborah A. Jones, Robert Kimbrough and Jeanne Swafford
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. and Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00641
Filed: October 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment and Approve Supersedeas Bond 446 . Defendants may refile their Motion and post an adequate bond pursuant to the guidance above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 8/22/18. (ABF)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION : This matter came before the Court on October 10, 2017, for a bench trial, which continued through October 27, 2017. After the bench trial, Defendants filed a Motion for Partial Findings and Conclusions Re garding Representative Evidence [Doc. 403 ]. Plaintiffs filed a Response [Doc. 407 ] in opposition to the Motion, and Defendants filed a Reply [Doc. 412 ]. Further, both parties filed their Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law [Do cs. 417 , 418 ], and Responses thereto [Docs. 420 , 422 , 424 , 425 ], which the Court has considered. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion [Doc. 403 ] and will enter a decision in favor of Plaintiffs. Finally, the Court observes that following the trial in this matter, the parties agreed that if the Court were to find violations of the FLSA, they would be able to calculate and agree on the appropriate dollar amount of damages in prompt fashion as this task was purely a ma thematical function. At this point, the Court will not enter a monetary Judgment until the parties have reported to the Court on the amount of damages, given the Courts Memorandum Opinion. The Court will thereafter enter a final Judgment reflecting the above findings and the parties reports on the damage calculation. The parties shall file a joint status report on the calculation of damages on or before noon on February 2, 2018. If the parties cannot agree, they shall file separate reports on the same explaining their respective proposed calculation by noon on February 2, 2018. The Court will award Plaintiffs reasonable attorneys fees pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). Plaintiffs shall file their motion requesting attorneys fees within thirty days of entry of the final Judgment in this case.Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on January 29, 2018. (RLK)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER; Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 287 is hereby WITHDRAWN; Defendants' Motion to Strike 316 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Dwight Steward 322 is DENIED AS MOOT; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Testimony of Lisa Brown, Robert Bryant West, Ed Langston, and Jeremy Saine 324 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Accordingly, per the Plaintiffs r epresentation to the Court, the consent forms of Lisa Brown, Robert West, and Ed Langston are hereby STRICKEN; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence Relating to Time-Barred Claims 327 is GRANTED; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Testimony of Michael Pierce, Sr., Thomas Garrett, James Shannon Abbott, Twila Higgins, Bryan Tesh, Jeff Cross, Richard Rang, and Brett Williamson 330 is DENIED; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 Precluding Plaintiffs from Proceeding with the Collective Action and From Offering Representative Testimony 332 is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants Supplementation of Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents 352 is GRANTED; and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Supplemental Witness Lists 359 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr. on 10/13/17. (ADA)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 236 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Certain Highly Compensated Employees. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 10/6/17. (ABF)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER for the reasons herein, the Defendants Motion to Decertify the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Doc. 279 is DENIED. This action shall proceed on October 10, 2017, as a collective action. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on October 3, 2017. (JAN, )
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; at a hearing on September 15, 2015, the Court found that this case has been pending for almost two years and found that further delays in discovery are both undesirable and inappropriate, accordingly, the Moti on to Stay Discovery 133 is DENIED. After announcing its ruling, the Court conducted a conference to address the status of discovery in this case and to identify targeted discovery that could aid this case in moving toward disposition. The parties reached agreements as to discovery/depositions that are ORDERED as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 9/25/15. (ADA)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Wyndhams Motion to Adopt Defendants Version of theNotice to the Class and to Include Opt-In Survey with the Court-Supervised Notice to Opt-In Plaintiffs 90 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and the parti es competing proposals for the notice of suit and opt-in form [Doc. 85-1; Doc. 89-1] are ACCEPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART to the extent stated above.Plaintiffs counsel SHALL MODIFY its proposed notice and opt-in form in a mannerconsistent with t he rulings herein and file a copy of the same in the record, simply for the Court and opposing counsels edification, within seven (7) days of the entry of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiffs counsel SHALL MAIL the notice and opt-in forms to potential plaintiffs as soon as practicable but no later than thirty (30) days following entry of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 2/11/15. (ABF)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Motion to Ascertain Status on the Court's Ruling Related to Court-Supervised Notice and Opt-In Plaintiff Consent Form 109 is GRANTED. The Motion for Leave to File Surreply 99 is GRANTED and the Motion to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Brief 102 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 12/4/14. (JBR)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court finds that the relief requested in the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel [Doc. 27 ] is not well-taken, and it is DENIED. The Court further finds that the Defendants' Motion for Protective Order [Doc. 34 ] is not supported by good cause at this time, and accordingly, it is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 9/23/14. (JBR)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. To date, Mr. Anthony has failed to register as a CM/ECF user. Attorney William J. Anthony is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before September 5, 2014, as to why he should not be immediately removed as an attorney o f record in this case and why other appropriate sanctions should not issue. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Show Cause to Mr. Anthony at the address he previously provided to the Court. Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 8/25/14. (copy mailed to William J. Anthony) (JBR)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is Ordered, for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, which the Court adopts and incorporates into this ruling, that the Plaintiff's motion, [Doc. 33], is Granted. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/21/14. (JBR) (c/m) Modified text on 8/21/2014 (JBR).
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 27 and 34 . Counsel for the Defendants is ORDERED to contact Ms. Kathy Keeton, Chief Deputy Clerk to the Clerk of Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, to make arrangements to either physically or e lectronically deliver the sound recordings to the Clerk of Courts office under seal. The recordings SHALL be delivered to the Clerk of Court on or before August 1, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 7/11/14. (JBR) Modified to reflect copy mailed to William J Anthony on 7/11/2014 (JBR).
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 40 Motion to Modify and Supplement the Court's January 31, 2014 Order with Tolling Language. The Courts previous Memorandum and Order 38 is MODIFIED, to incorporate verbatim the following: Base d upon the agreement of the parties, the statute of limitations for FLSA claims asserted by any putative class member, who has not filed a Plaintiff Consent Form with the Court, is tolled from January 31, 2014, to March 17, 2014.Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 02/28/2014. (KAW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Pierce
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pierce
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Blount
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Chappell
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy L. Clark
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hart
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Hicks
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Lucas
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bryant West
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kisa Abbott
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Brooks
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Brown
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Caldwell
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasyntha Cornwell
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley D. Dalton
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Gray
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Greene
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hurst
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitzi Lindsey
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Myrick
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cowan Rodgers, IV
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Sweeley
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Williamson
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaxon Wirgau
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysty Burroughs
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Repass
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Whaley
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather D. Williams
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Leigh Albertini
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Capehart
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Cohen
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Farmer
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goodall
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Jones
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kimbrough
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Swafford
Represented By: Martin D Holmes
Represented By: Sherry D. O'Neal Taylor
Represented By: Darrell L West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Paul DeCamp
Represented By: James R Mulroy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Paul DeCamp
Represented By: James R Mulroy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?