French v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Kelly Ann French
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Case Number: 3:2014cv00138
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, H. Bruce Guyton 30 . It is ORDERED, for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, which the Court adopt s and incorporates into its ruling, that Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees 30 is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees of $19,184.75. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon receipt of $19,184.75 in attorney's fees, plai ntiffs counsel shall remit to plaintiff the $5,455.65 award previously received from the Commissioner pursuant to the EAJA and the Court's July 20, 2015 Memorandum and Order 29 .Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 12/20/16. (ADA)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ACCEPTING IN WHOLE 27 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED, for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, which the court adopts and incorporates into its ruling, that plaintiffs 25 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA is GRANTED, as modified, and plaintiff is hereby awarded attorney fees in the amount of $5,455.65. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/20/2015. (MGM)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, entered as a judgment by the Clerk, accepting in whole 23 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; granting in part 16 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 21 the Commissioner's Motion for Summary Judgment; and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings as set forth herein. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on May 11, 2015. (AYB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Ann French
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?