State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Fire Protection, Inc. et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Fireman Fire Protection, Inc., James G. Stone, III, Robin Aletras and Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00229
Filed: May 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of the following Order dismissing case. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 4/26/17. (ADA)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; the Amended Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Memorandum in Support Thereof 60 is now in compliance with Local Rule 83.4, and for good cause shown, the Motion will be GRANTED. The Court expects Gilbert Russ ell McWherter Scott Bobbitt, PLC, to provide copies of any relevant documents to any future counsel for the Defendants or directly to the Defendants upon request. Gilbert Russell McWherter Scott Bobbitt, PLC, is RELIEVED of its duties as counsel i n this case. Defendants James Stone, III, James G. Stone, Jr., Betty Stone, and Fireman Fire Protection, Inc., are hereby ADMONISHED that they are DEEMED to be proceeding pro se. Until they obtain substitute counsel, it is their obligation to stay up to date on the status of this case and comply with the deadlines set by the Court. Accordingly, the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw 55 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/29/16. (c/m James G. Stone, III / Fireman Fire Protection, Inc.: Sevier County Jail, 896 Old Knoxville Highway, Sevierville, TN 37876 and James G. Stone, Jr. and Betty Stone: 2916 Old Newport Hwy, Sevierville, TN 37876) (ADA)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 29 Motion to Intervene. Movants SHALL FILE their proposed Intervening Complaint [29-1] in the record as their operative pleading on or before April 27, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/20/15. (ADA)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/15. (ADA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Fire Protection, Inc. et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael P Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman Fire Protection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Stone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Aletras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?