Rose v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: |
Bill Rose |
Defendant: |
Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. and Titan Excavating & Grading, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00017 |
Filed: |
January 14, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Knoxville Office |
County: |
Roane |
Presiding Judge: |
H Bruce Guyton |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas A Varlan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 15, 2018 |
Filing
272
ORDER. The Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the R&R [Doc. 326]. Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/15/18. (JBR)
|
September 19, 2018 |
Filing
219
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Defendants motion for summary judgment on the issue of general causation [Doc. 237], is hereby DENIED, and defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings with respect to plaintiffs strict liability c laims [Doc. 251] is GRANTED. These cases will therefore proceed to trial on phase one, in accordance with the bifurcated trial plan previously entered by the Court [Doc. 136]. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/19/2018. (KMK, )
|
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
208
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's objections are hereby OVERRULED, and Magistrate Judge Guyton's memorandum opinion order is AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/22/18. (JBR)
|
July 18, 2018 |
Filing
196
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (162) Motion in Limine in case 3:15-cv-00017-TAV-HBG; denying (170) Motion in Limine in case 3:15-cv-00274-TAV-HBG; denying (151) Motion in Limine in case 3:15-cv-00420-TAV-HBG; denying (153) Motion in Limine in case 3:15-cv-00460-TAV-HBG; denying (155) Motion in Limine in case 3:15-cv-00462-TAV-HBG; denying (81) Motion in Limine in case 3:16-cv-00635-TAV-HBG; denying (77) Motion in Limine in case 3:16-cv-00636-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/18/18. (JBR)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
158
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/9/18. (JBR)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Filing
154
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 1/8/18. (JBR)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
109
ORDER denying (106) Motion to Strike ; denying (106) Motion for More Definite Statement in case 3:15-cv-00017-TAV-HBG; denying (105) Motion to Strike in case 3:15-cv-00274-TAV-HBG; denying (93) Motion to Strike in case 3:15-cv-0 0420-TAV-HBG; denying (95) Motion to Strike in case 3:15-cv-00460-TAV-HBG; denying (98) Motion to Strike in case 3:15-cv-00462-TAV-HBG; denying (26) Motion to Strike in case 3:16-cv-00635-TAV-HBG; denying (24) Motion to Strike in case 3:16-cv-00636-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/5/17. (JBR)
|
February 23, 2017 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/22/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Jury Trial reset for 1/29/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 2/23/17. (JBR)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
58
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 MOTION for Entry of a Lone Pine Case Management Order filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. Jury Trial reset for 5/22/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/29/16. (JBR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?