Newland et al v. Morgan Stanley Private Bank, N.A. et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Steve Newland and Cathy Newland
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Private Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., PHH Mortgage Corp., FV-I, Inc., Shapiro & Ingle, LLP, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Shapiro & Kirsch, LLP, Specialized Asset Management, LLC, Skye Realty, LLC and Shapiro and Ingle, LLP
Case Number: 3:2015cv00309
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/23/19. (copy mailed to Cathy Newland)(JBR) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (JBR).
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of Judgment on Decision by the Court.Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 4/18/18. (c/m to Cathy Newland 714 Alpine Drive Sevierville, TN 37876 ) (ADA)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; Defendants' motions to dismiss 70 , 81 are GRANTED; all claims against Morgan Stanley Private Bank, N.A.; FV-I, Inc.; Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC; Specialized Asset Management, LLC; Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC; and Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Defendants' motion for a scheduling order and trial date 85 is GRANTED. By separate order the court will set a trial date in this matter as to the remaining defendants. Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 2/13/18. (ADA)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Newlands' motion to amend their complaint 59 is GRANTED. TheNewlands are DIRECTED to file the amended complaint within ten (10) days of entry of this Memorandum and Order. The Shapiro Defendants& #039; motion for judgment on the pleadings 24 is GRANTED; all claims against Shapiro & Ingle LLP (North Carolina) and Shapiro & Ingle, LLP (Tennessee) are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 5/24/17. (ADA)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER the Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs' Motion for Joinder of Party 46 , GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART the Motion to Strike Amended Complaint 49 and DENIES AS MOOT the Motions Seeking a More Definite St atement 50 , 51 . The Court further FINDS the Amended Complaint 47 to be STRICKEN and ORDERS the Plaintiffs to file their Amended Complaint consistent with the above and the District Judge's Order 45 within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 4/11/17. (ADA)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, finding the instant motion 21 is well-taken, and therefore is GRANTED. Plaintiff Steve Newland shall be allowed to access the CM/ECF system, subject to the same terms and conditions that apply to other u sers. If he has not done so already, Mr. Newland shall complete the online registration form.However, Mr. Newland is reminded that he is not licensed to practice law. Therefore, he may only litigate on his own behalf. He may not sign documents or present arguments on Ms. Newlands behalf. Ms. Newland must litigate her own claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 12/14/15. (c/m) (ADA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newland et al v. Morgan Stanley Private Bank, N.A. et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Private Bank, N.A.
Represented By: J Matthew Kroplin
Represented By: Zachary D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lauren P Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Lauren P Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FV-I, Inc.
Represented By: J Matthew Kroplin
Represented By: Zachary D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Ingle, LLP
Represented By: Bonnie Baggott Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: J Matthew Kroplin
Represented By: Zachary D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Kirsch, LLP
Represented By: Bonnie Baggott Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: J Matthew Kroplin
Represented By: Zachary D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skye Realty, LLC
Represented By: Ross B Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro and Ingle, LLP
Represented By: Bonnie Baggott Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?