Wilkerson et al v. Brakebill et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: James J. Wilkerson, Jr., J. Michell Wilkerson and Beth McCarter
Defendant: Jack F. Brakebill, Donna Brakebill, Brian Young, Dale J Montpelier and Jack F. Brakebill and Donna Brakebill Irrevocable Trust
Thirdparty_defendant: Brakebill Nursing Home, Inc., W. Lynn Brakebill and J. Michell Wilkerson
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Dale J Montpelier and Jack F. Brakebill and Donna Brakebill Irrevocable Trust
Case Number: 3:2015cv00435
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/30/17. (JBR)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 92 Motion and denying 95 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 5/6/16. (JBR)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying as moot 70 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 2/25/16. (JBR)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 28 Motion to Adopt and denying 32 Motion to Adopt. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 12/21/15. (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson et al v. Brakebill et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack F. Brakebill
Represented By: Joseph F Della-Rodolfa
Represented By: Dale J Montpelier
Represented By: Stephen K Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Brakebill
Represented By: Joseph F Della-Rodolfa
Represented By: Dale J Montpelier
Represented By: Stephen K Perry
Represented By: Joseph F Della-Rodolfa
Represented By: Stephen K Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Young
Represented By: Lynn C Peterson
Represented By: Mikel Alan Towe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale J Montpelier
Represented By: Dale J Montpelier(Designation Waived or Self (Pro Se))
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack F. Brakebill and Donna Brakebill Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Joseph F Della-Rodolfa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Wilkerson, Jr.
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Michell Wilkerson
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth McCarter
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Brakebill Nursing Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: W. Lynn Brakebill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: J. Michell Wilkerson
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Dale J Montpelier
Represented By: Dale J Montpelier(Designation Waived or Self (Pro Se))
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Jack F. Brakebill and Donna Brakebill Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Joseph F Della-Rodolfa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?