Barnes et al v. Malinak et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Phyllis G Barnes and Walter R Barnes
Defendant: Greg Malinak, Debbie Malinak and Olde Gatlinburg Place Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00556
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/25/17. (JBR)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 62 Motion; denying 63 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/11/17. (JBR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 77 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/25/17. (JBR)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 67 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/5/17. (JBR)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER, the Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 54 is hereby GRANTED. The Court modifies the Scheduling Order as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 5/4/17. (ADA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. Malinak et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis G Barnes
Represented By: Darren V Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter R Barnes
Represented By: Darren V Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Malinak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Malinak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olde Gatlinburg Place Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?