Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC v. Wenn Limited et al

Plaintiff: Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC
Defendant: Wenn Limited and USA Entertainment News, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00306
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Monroe
0 Judge: Harry S Mattice
1 Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 103 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/12/2019. (BDG, )
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The Court finds that Beiny has until March 14, 2018, to produce the above items and provide Plaintiff with written confirmation as to whether Defendants' former employees, Jonny Forsyth and Hayley Chamberlain, will agree to a deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 3/9/18. (JBR) Modified to reflect copy mailed to USA Entertainment News, Inc. and Wenn Limited on 3/9/2018 (JBR).
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Regarding Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 1/26/18. (JBR) (copy mailed to USA Entertainment News, Inc. and Wenn Limited) Modified text on 1/26/2018 (JBR).
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mills is RELIEVED of her duties as counsel in this case. The Defendants are hereby ADMONISHED that they are DEEMED to be proceeding pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 11/30/17. (copy mailed to WENN Ltd. and USA Entertainment News, Inc. at addresses provided in Doc. 60 ) (JBR)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING SEALING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 3/10/17. (JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC v. Wenn Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC
Represented By: Heather G. Anderson
Represented By: John T Polasek
Represented By: C Dale Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenn Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Entertainment News, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?