Lewis v. Hawkins et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Paul William Lewis
Defendant: Keith Hawkins and Scott County Sheriffs Department
Case Number: 3:2016cv00315
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/6/18. (copy mailed to Paul William Lewis) (JBR)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 67 Motion to Strike; granting in part 69 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/28/17. (copy mailed to Paul William Lewis) (JBR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 57 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 6/29/17. (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (JBR)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 41 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/4/17. (JBR) Modified to reflect c/m on 4/4/2017 (JBR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Hawkins et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul William Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?