Johnson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV3)
Plaintiff: Johnson and Richard Bradley Johnson
Defendant: Colvin, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV3) and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2016cv00316
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney fees in the amount of $4,329.20 be paid to Plaintiff under the Equal Access to Justice Act ("EAJA"), 28 U.S.C. 2412(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 12/21/17. (JBR)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION Reflecting Parties' Settlement of Plaintiff's Claim for Attorney's Fees Under the EAJA by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Attachments: #1 Other text of proposed order)(Harber, Loretta) Modified event on 12/20/2017 (JBR).
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Olinsky, Howard)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #25 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A CPI Table, #2 Exhibit B All Professional Time, #3 Exhibit C Attorney Time, #4 Exhibit D Paralegal Time, #5 Exhibit E Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees, #6 Certificate of Service)(Olinsky, Howard)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Olinsky, Howard)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part #19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying #21 Motion for Summary Judgment. The decision of the Commissioner is REMANDED for the ALJ to reassess the Plaintiff's RFC and reweigh each medical opinion of record, assigning each opinion a specific weight, and citing to the record withsupporting evidence the reason for that weight. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/11/2017. (KMK, )
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/11/2017. (KMK, )
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Harber, Loretta)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Harber, Loretta)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Olinsky, Howard)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Olinsky, Howard)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/7/16. (JBR)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Richard Bradley Johnson (Olinsky, Howard)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting SSA Briefing Schedule. Social Security Briefing Schedule DDL set for 1/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/3/16. (JBR)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/3/16. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Courtesy Copy of Transcript Received in the Clerk's Office. (JBR)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT (Complete Certified Administrative Record) by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Harber, Loretta)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Notice of Manual Filing - Transcript of the Administrative Record) (Harber, Loretta)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of.(Harber, Loretta)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint on or before October 3, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 8/19/16. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Harber, Loretta)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. SSA served on 7/6/16. (JBR)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 7/6/2016. (JBR)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney served on 7/11/2016. (JBR)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 6/16/16. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - USA, #2 Summons Issued - US Attorney General) (JBR)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 6/15/16. (JBR)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3131513.) filed by Richard Bradley Johnson . (LMC)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (LMC)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3131513.) by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Olinsky, Howard)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Olinsky, Howard)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, filed by Richard Bradley Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Letter to Clerk, #4 Other Proposed Summons, #5 Other Proposed Summons, #6 Other Proposed Summons, #7 Other USM-285 Forms, #8 Other USM-285 Forms, #9 Other USM-285 Forms)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Loretta S Harber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bradley Johnson
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?