Colson v. City of Alcoa, Tennessee et al (RLJ2)
Plaintiff: Annissa Colson
Defendant: City of Alcoa, Tennessee, Philip K Potter, Keith Fletcher, Dustin Cook, Arik Wilson, Blount County, Tennessee, James L Berrong, Jennifer Russell, Mandy England, Jane Does 1-10 and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2016cv00377
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Blount
Presiding Judge: R Leon Jordan
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 9/17/20. (JBR)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 9/14/20. (JBR)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: the City Defendants' motion for summary judgment [doc. 128] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, summary judgment is: GRANTED on Count 1 as to Officer Wilson. Count 1 will be DISMISSED. GRANTED on Coun t 2 as to Officer Cook. Count 2 will be DISMISSED. GRANTED on Count 4 as to Officer Cook, Officer Wilson, Chief Potter, Lieutenant Fletcher, and the Doe defendants. Count 4 will be DISMISSED. GRANTED on Count 5 as to the City of Alcoa. Count 5 will be DISMISSED as to the City of Alcoa. GRANTED on Count 6 as to Chief Potter and Lieutenant Fletcher. Count 6 will be DISMISSED. GRANTED on Count 7 as to the City of Alcoa. Count 7 will be DISMISSED as to the City of Alcoa. GRANTED on Count 9 as t o Chief Potter, Lieutenant Fletcher, and the City of Alcoa. Count 9 will be DISMISSED as to Chief Potter, Lieutenant Fletcher, and the City of Alcoa. GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART on Count 9 as to Officer Cook, and Officer Wilson. Summary judgm ent will be GRANTED on Plaintiffs claim regarding her alleged panic attack, and DENIED on Plaintiff's claim regarding her knee injury. GRANTED on Count 10 as to the City Defendants. Count 10 will be DISMISSED as to the City Defendants. GRANTED on Count 11 as to the City Defendants. Count 11 will be DISMISSED as to the City Defendants. GRANTED on Count 12 as to Officer Cook and Officer Wilson. Count 12 will be DISMISSED as to Officer Cook and Officer Wilson. GRANTED on Count 13 as to Chi ef Potter and the City of Alcoa. Count 13 will be DISMISSED as to Chief Potter and the City of Alcoa. GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as to Lieutenant Fletcher, Officer Cook, and Officer Wilson in their individual capacities. Summary judgment wi ll be GRANTED to the extent that the claim is based on the provision of medical care, but will be DENIED to the extent that it is based on uses-of-force. To the extent that the Court has permitted a renewed motion for summary judgment on the limited issue discussed in the memorandum opinion, such renewed motion SHALL be filed no later than June 1, 2020. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on April 30, 2020. (AYB)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying as moot 103 the Motion to Lift Stay, Clarify the Status of the Current Stay in Place and/or Enter a Revised Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on May 2, 2018. (AYB)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Officer England's Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth more fully herein. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on March 26, 2018. (AYB)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 57 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and granting in part and denying in part 70 Defendant Mandy England's Motion to Stay as set forth more fully herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on September 15, 2017. (AYB)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on September 11, 2017. (AYB)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Defendant Jennifer Russell's Motion to Dismiss. Nurse Russell's motion is GRANTED as to Count Four, Count Ten, Count Twelve, and Count Thirteen, which are DISMISSED but only to the extent that they apply to Nurse Russell in her individual capacity. These counts remain pending in all other respects. Nurse Russell's motion is DENIED as to Count Nine. Nurse Russell SHALL serve a responsive pleading within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on August 10, 2017. (AYB)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Count Four, Count Six, Count Nine, Count Ten, Count Twelve, and Count Thirteen are DISMISSED but only to the extent that they apply to Sheriff Berrong in his individual capacity. These counts remain pending in all other respects. Officer England SHALL serve a responsive pleading within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on May 2, 2017. (AYB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colson v. City of Alcoa, Tennessee et al (RLJ2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annissa Colson
Represented By: Lance Kristopher Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alcoa, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip K Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arik Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blount County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Berrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?