Horn-Brichetto v. Smith et al (JRG2)
Plaintiff: |
Lisa Horn-Brichetto |
Defendant: |
Tiffany Smith, Russell Johnson and Becky Ruppe |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00163 |
Filed: |
April 25, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Knoxville Office |
County: |
Anderson |
Presiding Judge: |
J Ronnie Greer |
Presiding Judge: |
C Clifford Shirley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 25, 2019 |
Filing
74
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The following is hereby ORDERED: (1) as to Defendants Tiffany Smith and Russell Johnson's Motion to Dismiss, Doc. 26 , the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and in accordance with abov e findings, these two defendants are DISMISSED; (2) as to John Brichetto's motion to intervene, Doc. 31 , said motion is DENIED; (3) as to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order Quashing Subpoena and Motion t o Reconsider, Doc. 38 , said Objection is OVERRULLED and said Motion is DENIED; (4) as to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, Doc. 43 , said motion is DENIED; (5) as to Plaintiff's Motion to Collect Cost of Service, Doc. 59 , said motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; (6) as to Defendant Becky Ruppe's Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, Doc. 62 , said motion is GRANTED and the Clerk's entry of Default against th is Defendant, Doc. 55 , is SET ASIDE; and (7) as to Defendants Tiffany Smith and Russell Johnson's Motion to Stay Compliance with Order, Doc. 63 , said motion is DENIED AS MOOT. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 02/25/2019. (Copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Lisa Horn-Brichetto and John H Brichetto) (CAT)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments; adopting and approving 7 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff will be permitted to pay the filing fee in installments of $100.00 per month for four (4) months. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to issue a summons upon proper presentation by the plaintiff and payment of the initial $100.00 installment of the filing fee. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/06/2017. (Copy of Order mailed to Lisa Horn-Brichetto) (CAT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?