Allen et al v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Stormy Dunn, Kathy McCollum, Corey Buchannon, Melissa Kilby, Tommy Swicegood, Rusty Laymance, Greg Schwartz, Jawanna Forrester, Cindy Baker, Bryan Todd, Diana Haney, Jannie Swicegood, David Copeland, Ashley Freels, John Jennings, Brian Burchfield, Karen Beason, Betty Johnson, Jones Risner, Ernie Turpin, Kevin Seeber, John Suter, Douglas Bledsoe, Jennifer Brown, Sarah Monroe, James Price, Michael Colyer, Sharron West, Brian Carroll, Brenda Huckaby, Elmer Lowe, David Whitsel, Donna McGill, William Lee, Robbie Weiford, Kenneth Wright, Edwinna Whitsel, Brittanie West, Vincent Chesser, Clata Thompson, Melvin Kidd, Brandy Henderson, Pam Foust, Daniel Forrester, Charles Huckaby, Jr, Sherri Botts, Valerie Dugger, Brian Weiford, Stevie Kilby, Abby Suter, Doretta Sexton, Carol Rogers, James Freels, Wesley Roman Lawson, William Stephens, Paul Bennett, Jr, Michael Laymance, Bradford Green, Martha Wright, Amy Jones, James Monroe, John Sexton, Pamela Pettyjohn, Amy Burchfield, Johnnie Bledsoe, Christopher Burbage, Shannon Steele, Kimberly Keel, Cindy Coxey, Celena Haire, Patrick Wood, Linda Stephens, John Dishman, David Ray, Glen Haney, Jr, David Dugger, Alex Wright, Wilbert Davis, Michael Justice, Stefanie Tilley, Laura Burbage, Ruby Price, Paula Lee, Ryan Mulloy, Gary Cole, Larry Cordell, Steve Pettyjohn, Mary Stefanie Smith, Jamie Chesser, Katie Botts, Julia Kile, Donald Dixon, Linda Moore, Anthony Spradlin, Kevin Kile, Russell Stansberry, Toni Lynnette Dixon, Billie Jo Hall, Kimberleigh Dishman, Timothy Steele, Harold Davis, Jr, Tammy Johnson, Tamra Duncan, Karen Gilliam, Horace B Stair, Johnny Hall, Daniel Pressley, Sylvia May, Sean May, Jackie Bunch, Timothy Ricker, Jerry Coxey, Terrance Brashears, Juanota Cole, David West, Benjamin West, Crystal Styles, Charles Keel, Jr, Michael Robinette, Lena Copeland, Danny Gouge, Karen Fink, Roger Griffith, Ginger Green, S.T. McCollum, Mark Henderson, Amanda Crumby, Daryl Fink, Sr, Conley Mark Mack, Mark Johnson, Jackie Cordell, Diane Lee, Bobby Haire, Denise Laymance, Donna Romasco, Kristy Seeber, Vernon D Allen, James Gilliam, Loretta Millsaps, Roger Moore, James Styles, Jr, James Rogers, Dennis Smith, George McAllister, Lisa Spradlin, Ricky Gardner, Regina Kidd, Kevin Duncan, Frank Lee, Garry Beason, Jack Fozzard, Clayton Foust, Bradley Brown, Michael Bowlin, Steven Bunkley, Brandon Turpin, Vickie Davis, Bobby Gann, Suzie McAllister, Richard Crane, Linda Thompson, George Baldwin, Michael Burum, Sandra Allen, Ernestine Sargent, Angela Gann, Lewis Thompson, Robert Shubert, III, David Thompson, Kathleen Bunkley, Julice Griffith, Trieu Schwartz, Randall Tilley, William Yates, Vincent Romasco, Jacky Yates, Sara Gardner and Tommy Johnson
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., EnSafe Engineering Services, Rogers Group Investments, Inc. and EnSafe Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00153
Filed: April 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Roane
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Rogers and Ensafe by Vernon D Allen (Dupree, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Joshua K Chesser and S Joseph Welborn terminated. (Welborn, S)
December 13, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Continue Stay filed by Vernon D Allen. (Dupree, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Continue Stay filed by Rogers Group Investments, Inc.. (Strittmatter, Ashley)
December 6, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Continue Stay filed by EnSafe Engineering Services, EnSafe Inc.. (Witcher, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Continue Stay filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Sanders, James)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE: upon defendants' request for an extension of time and approval of the Court, defendant EnSafe Engineering Services and EnSafe Inc., shall have up to and including Thursday, December 6, 2018 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Stay [Doc. 22]. (JAN, )
November 27, 2018 NOTICE: upon the request of counsel for an extension of time, and approval of the Court, defendants Jacobs Engineering Group and Rogers Group Investments, shall also have up to and including Thursday, December 6, 2018 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Stay [Doc. 22]. (JAN, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley M Strittmatter on behalf of Rogers Group Investments, Inc. (Strittmatter, Ashley)
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by P Edward Pratt on behalf of Rogers Group Investments, Inc. (Pratt, P)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Continue Stay by Donna Romasco, Vincent Romasco, Ernestine Sargent, Greg Schwartz, Trieu Schwartz, Kevin Seeber, Kristy Seeber, Doretta Sexton, John Sexton, Robert Shubert, III, Dennis Smith, Mary Stefanie Smith, Anthony Spradlin, Lisa Spradlin, Horace B Stair, Russell Stansberry, Shannon Steele, Timothy Steele, Linda Stephens, William Stephens, Crystal Styles, James Styles, Jr, Abby Suter, John Suter, Jannie Swicegood, Tommy Swicegood, Clata Thompson, David Thompson, Lewis Thompson, Linda Thompson, Randall Tilley, Stefanie Tilley, Bryan Todd, Brandon Turpin, Ernie Turpin, Brian Weiford, Robbie Weiford, Benjamin West, Brittanie West, David West, Sharron West, David Whitsel, Edwinna Whitsel, Patrick Wood, Alex Wright, Kenneth Wright, Martha Wright, Jacky Yates, William Yates. (Davis, Gary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary A Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davis, Gary)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STAYING CASE: This case is STAYED pending resolution of phase one of thegroup of cases led by Adkisson. Plaintiffs are directed to file a motion to lift this stay within seven (7) days of the conclusion of phase one of the Adkisson group of cases.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/18. (ABF)
June 20, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EnSafe Engineering Services, EnSafe Inc.. (Rollins, John)
June 7, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION AND RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for More Definite Statement Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Dismiss filed by Vernon D Allen. (Dupree, John) Modified text on 6/8/2018 (ADA).
May 30, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Sanders, James)
May 30, 2018 Filing 16 Administrative Notice to Counsel James Sanders re: #15 Response in Opposition to Motion : Requirements due by 6/4/2018. Please refile the Response in Opposition to the Motion to Remand. The document filed consists of only one page. The document is incomplete.(ABF)
May 30, 2018 Filing 15 [REFILED CORRECTLY AS #17 ] RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Sanders, James) Modified on 5/31/2018 (ABF).
May 25, 2018 NOTICE from James S. Witcher III: upon the agreement of plaintiffs' counsel and approval of the Court, defendants EnSafe Engineering Services and EnSafe Inc., shall have up to and including June 20, 2018 to respond to plaintiffs' Motion to Remand [Doc. 14]. (JAN, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Vernon D Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Action Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 9Affidavits, #3 Exhibit 4Affidavits, #4 Exhibit StrikeTeamLetter, #5 Exhibit Parker Depo Pages, #6 Exhibit AOC, #7 Exhibit Jacobs/TVA Letters, #8 Exhibit Jacobs Rog Response, #9 Exhibit Jacobs RFP Response)(Dupree, John)
May 15, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for More Definite Statement Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Dismiss by EnSafe Engineering Services, EnSafe Inc.. (Witcher, James)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 04/26/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (DPG)
April 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by EnSafe Engineering Services, EnSafe Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Witcher, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extension of time to file Answer by Vernon D Allen. (Dupree, John)
April 25, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Joseph Welborn ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3657488.) filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (ADA)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 04/25/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (DPG) Modified on 4/25/2018 to note c/m to James S. Witcher Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC 1801 Fifth Avenue North Suite 400 Birmingham, AL 35203 (ADA).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 04/25/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (DPG) Modified on 4/25/2018 to c/m to John E. Rollins Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC 1801 Fifth Avenue North Suite 400 Birmingham, AL 35203 (ADA).
April 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Joseph Welborn ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3657488.) by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing of S. Joseph Welborn)(Chesser, Joshua)
April 24, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by EnSafe Inc., EnSafe Engineering Services, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by EnSafe Inc., EnSafe Engineering Services (AML, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Witcher (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt no. C1015568) by EnSafe Engineering Services, EnSafe Inc. (AML, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John E. Rollins (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt no. C1015568) by EnSafe Engineering Services, EnSafe Inc. (AML, )
April 23, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) And Affirmative Defenses by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Sanders, James)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Greg Adkisson, et al. v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., No. 3:13-CV-505. Because the first of these cases was assigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton, this case will also be assigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton. However, consolidation is not ordered.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/23/18. (ABF)
April 23, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF)
April 17, 2018 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Guyton for related case determination (ABF)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Sanders, James)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Roane County Circuit Court, case number 2018-CV-30. ( Filing fee $ 400 Paid, Receipt #K3035441 ), filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 3-A, #6 Exhibit 3-B, #7 Exhibit 3-C, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5)(ABF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormy Dunn
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy McCollum
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Buchannon
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Kilby
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Swicegood
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Laymance
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Schwartz
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawanna Forrester
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Baker
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Todd
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Haney
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannie Swicegood
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Copeland
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Freels
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jennings
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Burchfield
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Beason
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Johnson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones Risner
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Turpin
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Seeber
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Suter
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bledsoe
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Brown
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Monroe
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Price
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Colyer
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron West
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Carroll
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Huckaby
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Lowe
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whitsel
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna McGill
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Weiford
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wright
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwinna Whitsel
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittanie West
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Chesser
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clata Thompson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Kidd
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Henderson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Foust
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Forrester
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Huckaby, Jr
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Botts
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Dugger
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Weiford
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie Kilby
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Suter
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretta Sexton
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Rogers
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Freels
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Roman Lawson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stephens
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bennett, Jr
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Laymance
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford Green
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Wright
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Jones
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Monroe
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sexton
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Pettyjohn
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Burchfield
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Bledsoe
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Burbage
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Steele
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Keel
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Coxey
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celena Haire
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wood
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Stephens
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dishman
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ray
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Haney, Jr
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dugger
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Wright
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Davis
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Justice
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Tilley
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Burbage
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Price
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Lee
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Mulloy
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Cole
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Cordell
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Pettyjohn
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Stefanie Smith
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Chesser
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Botts
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Kile
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dixon
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Moore
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Spradlin
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kile
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Stansberry
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Lynnette Dixon
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Jo Hall
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberleigh Dishman
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Steele
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Davis, Jr
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Johnson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra Duncan
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gilliam
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace B Stair
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Hall
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pressley
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia May
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean May
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Bunch
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ricker
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Coxey
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Brashears
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanota Cole
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David West
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin West
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Styles
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Keel, Jr
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robinette
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Copeland
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Gouge
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Fink
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Griffith
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Green
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.T. McCollum
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Henderson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Crumby
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Fink, Sr
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conley Mark Mack
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Cordell
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Lee
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Haire
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Laymance
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Romasco
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Seeber
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon D Allen
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gilliam
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Millsaps
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Moore
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Styles, Jr
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rogers
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Smith
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George McAllister
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Spradlin
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Gardner
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Kidd
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Duncan
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lee
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Beason
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Fozzard
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Foust
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Brown
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bowlin
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bunkley
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Turpin
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Davis
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Gann
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzie McAllister
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Crane
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Thompson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Baldwin
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burum
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Allen
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Sargent
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Gann
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Thompson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shubert, III
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thompson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Bunkley
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julice Griffith
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trieu Schwartz
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Tilley
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Yates
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Romasco
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacky Yates
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Gardner
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Johnson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua K Chesser
Represented By: S Joseph Welborn
Represented By: James Issac Sanders
Represented By: Marie T Scott
Represented By: James F Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnSafe Engineering Services
Represented By: John E Rollins
Represented By: James S Witcher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Group Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley M Strittmatter
Represented By: P Edward Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnSafe Inc.
Represented By: John E Rollins
Represented By: James S Witcher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?