ACT, Inc. v. Worldwide Interactive Network
Plaintiff: ACT, Inc.
Defendant: Worldwide Interactive Network
Case Number: 3:2018cv00186
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 375 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/21/2020. (CNC)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Due to the Spoliation of Evidence 362 and Plaintiff's request 374 for sanctions against defense counsel are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 7/16/20. (ADA)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 366 Motion for Sanctions. The Court finds that Plaintiff SHALL be awarded its reasonable attorney's fees incurred for filing the instant Motion. If the parties canno t agree on the reasonable amount of attorney's fees, Plaintiff SHALL bring this matter to the Court's attention within fourteen (14) days of entry of the instant Order. Defendant may respond within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 6/2/20. (JBR)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting 239 Motion to Take Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 1/30/20. (JBR)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 113 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant ACT, Inc.'s Documents for Consideration at July 8, 2019 Discovery Hearing Pursuant to Court's May 17, 2019 Order; granting i n part 135 MOTION to Compel Discovery; granting 157 MOTION to Compel De-Designation of Plaintiff's Improperly Designated Expert Report of David Nolte and Amended Expert Report of David Nolte. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/8/2019. (JDH)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PARTWINs motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 80). Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/14/2019. (BDG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACT, Inc. v. Worldwide Interactive Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACT, Inc.
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Represented By: Laura Lindsey Chapman
Represented By: Yasamin Parsafar
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Interactive Network
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?