Hance et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Plaintiff: Ernest Hance and Vicki Hance
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00257
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
0 Judge: Travis R McDonough
1 Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Court REMANDS this action to the Circuit Court for Knox County. Signed by Clerk of Court and District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/20/2018. (SAC, )Judgment mailed to Knox County.
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Case is hereby Remanded to the Circuit Court of Knox County, Tennessee. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/20/2018. (SAC, )Order mailed to the Circuit Court of Knox County along with current docket sheet.
July 17, 2018 Filing 8 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF AND CONSENT TO REMAND by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Roberts, Lauren) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (AYB).
July 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal State Court Order by Ernest Hance, Vicki Hance. (Moore, James)
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ernest Hance, Vicki Hance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Moore, James)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/27/2018. (JCK)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/27/2018. (JCK)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/27/2018. (JCK)
June 27, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (JCK)
June 27, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Knox County, TN, case number 2-421-17. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3704816), filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court filings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hance et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Lauren P Roberts
Represented By: Jean Anne Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Hance
Represented By: James R Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Hance
Represented By: James R Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?