Long v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Long
Defendant: Unknown Knox County Deputies, James "JJ" Jones, Knox County, Tennessee, Unknown Deputy Sheriffs of Knox County and Defendants and Knox County Sheriff James "J.J." Jones
Case Number: 3:2018cv00295
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Anderson
0 Judge: J Ronnie Greer
1 Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application)(Bailey, Ursula)
July 20, 2018 5 Administrative Notice to Ursula Bailey re #3 Notice (Other): Wrong event used. The Application to Proceed in Form Pauperis must be filed as a motion on the record. Please re-file the Application using the "In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)" event under Motions in CM/ECF. Requirements due by 7/25/2018. (JBR)
July 20, 2018 4 NOTICE by Barbara Long of Filing Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Other Amended Complaint)(Bailey, Ursula)
July 20, 2018 3 NOTICE by Barbara Long (Attachments: #1 Other Application)(Bailey, Ursula)
July 17, 2018 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : requirements due by 7/18/2018. (KFB, )
July 16, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (KFB, )
July 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Barbara Long. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Knox County, #3 Summons Jones, #4 Summons Unknown Officers, #5 Other Application)(Bailey, Ursula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Long
Represented By: Ursula Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Knox County Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James "JJ" Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Deputy Sheriffs of Knox County and Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County Sheriff James "J.J." Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?