Angell et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et. al. (TV1)
Plaintiff: William Hendricks, Sherry McKee, Suhn Brown, David Delfyette, Samantha Cooper, Sarah Headrick, Amber Hickman, Patricia Evans, Annette Marshall, Rebecca Loveday-Harper, Joshua Banton, Stephanie Gasche, Jon Jeffries, Lora Cooper, Angel Humphrey, Brandon McLaughlin, Brian Myers, Ashley Batts, Darren Nelson, David Bittlers, Jesse Lands, Glenn Finley, Charles Crowe, Brittany Cooper, Samantha Collins, Amanda Ervin, Navada Moore, Wanda Gregory Anderson, Matthew Farr, Mike Hurst, Shannon Everett, Betty Narveson, Robert Gregory, Robert Cantley, Charles Collins, Christopher Oaks, Charles Lundy, Edward Klemt, Whitney Gilbert, Maria Cutler, Claretta Holt, Chau Dang, Kenneth Fields, Diane Negele, Tammy Hall, Rose Marley, Harold Loveday, Angela Gallagher, Michael Ogle, Cindy Cleppe, Sandra Ingle, Robert Farr, Jr., Harold Hubbard, Mark Huffstetler, James Beaty, Diana Cooper, Kai Brown, Shaina Kirkland, Lesa Cummings, David McNish, Rachel Cole, Vanessa Gibbs, Irene Clements, Mary Hughes, Rhonda Barker, Patricia Crume, George Hall, Phyllis Harrison, Karen Garland, Jessica Loy, Dillard Evans, Kinnie McCauley, Cynthia Freshour, Katya Monleou, Sheila Best, Taheera Dacosta, Donna Jenkins, Jason Murphy, Shannon Minor, Elizabeth Collins, Samuel Green, Teddy Hubbard, Richard Hill, Connie Montgomery, John Dilly, Cynthia Bradshaw, Ted Johnson, Alan Bock, Brenda Duncan, Mikhayla Ballard, Samuel Collins, Michael Nelson, John Cleveland, Jack Freshour, Donald Holder, Tracie Hendricks, Darren Gillespie, Robert Negele, Michael McBee, Pamela McAdams, Adan Alonso, Derrick Burchfield, Angela Goldberg, Joyce Cable, Christina Cody, Angela Newman, Cato Clowney, Jr., Chay Canaday, Patsy Abbott Roy, Jeanette Collins, Joe Cody, Makali Loy, Lisa Carter, Brian Negele, Nicole Meaux, John Mulhauser, Marian Cantley, Terry Jenkins, William Mims, Steven Jones, John Cody, John Macomber, Lynda Flynn, Heath Hanley, Franklin Jones, James Fraley, Donna Jackson, Blake Long, Linda Cates, Connie Cleveland, Brittany Jensen, Jane Kivett, Stacy Carter, Gage Hembree, Anna Miracle, Stacey Minor, Carley Francis, Lawrence Burchfield, April Goodykoontz, Florence Fagg, Briana Goodman, Jeffrey Jones, Edward McAdams, Joshua Maples, Devin Boyd, Lamar Hannum, Linda Key, Peggy Beal, Steven McBee, David Edgar, Michael Bradshaw, Diane Cote, Rebecca Cooper, Catherin Melchert, Sharon Holder, Rhonda Dickerson, Elise Lindsay, Amanda Dotson, John Ford, Tim Jennings, Geraldine Jones, Brenda Lindsey, Robert Higgins, Jose Felix, Elizabeth Goodman, Lisa Decker, Sierra Douglas, Melody Fuller, Rosa McKelvey, Mitchell Light, Kathi Kazer, Lisa McBee, William Montgomery, Lavrin Brown, Carl Fagg, Rebecca Maples, Steven Banton, Nicholas Jordan, Wanda Humphrey, Wendy Frank, William Harguth, Cory Johnson, Donna Debuty, Michael Puckett, Jonathan Hatcher, Ginger Hubbard, Bailey Johnson, George Jackson, Michael Fagg, Robert Bryant, Wanda Holland, Natasha Hall, Luther Denton, Charles Miller, Lillian Daniels, Joella Collins, Ginna Bock, Maryann Bock, Steven Goodykoontz, Glenda Bryant, Georgia Carr, Dick Eckhoff, Tammy Ogle, Cheryl Lundy, Amanda McCormick, Billy Kirby, Brian Lane, Isai Gomez and Kayla Howard
Defendant: Union Tank Car Company, CSX Transportation, Inc. and Ralph Brackett
Case Number: 3:2018cv00313
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Blount
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Baker, John)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/21/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
September 20, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) filed by Union Tank Car Company, #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) filed by Union Tank Car Company (ABF)
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) by Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael)
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) by Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Joshua Fleming re: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming. A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. If the required certificates or filing fee are not submitted within 15 days of this Notice, your motion may be summarily denied.(ABF)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Jacob Bradley re: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley. A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. If the required certificates or filing fee are not submitted within 15 days of this Notice, your motion may be summarily denied.(ABF)
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) by Union Tank Car Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Michael)
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) by Union Tank Car Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant may respond to plaintiffs motion to remand on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/13/18. (ABF)
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant may respond to plaintiffs motion to remand on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/18. (ABF)
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Order)(Baker, John)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Adan Alonso, Amanda Alonso, Wanda Gregory Anderson, Candy Angell, Mikhayla Ballard, Donna Banton, Joshua Banton, Steven Banton, Rhonda Barker, Austin Bass, Ashley Batts, Peggy Beal, Zachary Beal, James Beaty, Roger Best, Sheila Best, David Bittlers, Patricia Bittlers, Jacob Bittles, Alan Bock, Ginna Bock, Maryann Bock, Tara Bock, Devin Boyd, Cynthia Bradshaw, Michael Bradshaw, Susan Briggs, Kai Brown, Kimberly Brown, Lavrin Brown, Suhn Brown, Glenda Bryant, Mary Bryant, Robert Bryant, Derrick Burchfield, Lawrence Burchfield, Joyce Cable, Chay Canaday, Marian Cantley, Robert Cantley, Georgia Carr, Lisa Carter, Stacy Carter, Linda Cates, Irene Clements, Cindy Cleppe, Connie Cleveland, John Cleveland, Shirley Clowney, Cato Clowney, Jr., Kathy Cochran, Christina Cody, Joe Cody, John Cody, Rachel Cole, Alexander Collins, Charles Collins, Elizabeth Collins, Jeanette Collins, Joella Collins, Samantha Collins, Samuel Collins, Brittany Cooper, Diana Cooper, Lora Cooper, Rebecca Cooper, Samantha Cooper, Diane Cote, Kyrstal Crawford, Charles Crowe, Patricia Crume, Lesa Cummings, Maria Cutler, Taheera Dacosta, Chau Dang, Lillian Daniels, Donna Debuty, Jake Debuty, Lisa Decker, David Delfyette, Iva Dellinger, Stephen Dellinger, Luther Denton, Major Dickerson, Rhonda Dickerson, John Dilly, Michael Donaldson, Amanda Dotson, Sierra Douglas, Brenda Duncan, Marvin Duncan, Nga Duong, Dick Eckhoff, David Edgar, Amanda Ervin, Dillard Evans, Kipper Evans, Patricia Evans, Sarah Evans, Shannon Everett, William Everett, Carl Fagg, Florence Fagg, Michael Fagg, Matthew Farr, Robert Farr, Jr., Jose Felix, Kenneth Fields, Thomas Fife, Charles Finley, Glenn Finley, Lynda Flynn, John Ford, James Fraley, Carley Francis, Gary Frank, Wendy Frank, Cynthia Freshour, Jack Freshour, Curtis Fuller, Derek Fuller, Melody Fuller, Angela Gallagher, Mark Gallagher, Joe Gamble, Noel Garcia, Karen Garland, Cameron Gasche, Lisa Gasche, Stephanie Gasche, Vanessa Gibbs, Whitney Gilbert, Darren Gillespie, Angela Goldberg, Isai Gomez, Briana Goodman, Elizabeth Goodman, Brad Goodson, April Goodykoontz, Steven Goodykoontz, Samuel Green, Robert Gregory, George Hall, Natasha Hall, Tammy Hall, Heath Hanley, Lamar Hannum, Phyllis Hardin, William Harguth, Phyllis Harrison, Jerry Hatcher, Jonathan Hatcher, Sarah Headrick, Faye Hearon, Gage Hembree, Tracie Hendricks, William Hendricks, Mary Henry, Amber Hickman, Robert Higgins, Richard Hill, Carley Hilton, Donald Holder, Sharon Holder, Wanda Holland, Claretta Holt, Kayla Howard, Ginger Hubbard, Harold Hubbard, Teddy Hubbard, Mark Huffstetler, Mary Hughes, Angel Humphrey, Wanda Humphrey, Howard Hurst, Matthew Hurst, Mike Hurst, Sandra Ingle, Donna Jackson, George Jackson, Jon Jeffries, Donna Jenkins, Terry Jenkins, Tim Jennings, Brittany Jensen, Bailey Johnson, Cory Johnson, Pamela Johnson, Ted Johnson, Dedra Jones, Franklin Jones, Geraldine Jones, Jeffrey Jones, Steven Jones, Nicholas Jordan, Kathi Kazer, Angela Kean, Linda Key, Billy Kirby, Shaina Kirkland, Jane Kivett, Edward Klemt, Jesse Lands, Brian Lane, Crystal Lawson, Bobby Lewis, Mitchell Light, Elise Lindsay, Brenda Lindsey, Jan Loeb, Blake Long, Georgia Loveday, Harold Loveday, Rebecca Loveday-Harper, Jessica Loy, Makali Loy, Charles Lundy, Cheryl Lundy, John Macomber, Joshua Maples, Rebecca Maples, Rose Marley, Migdalia Marrero, Annette Marshall, Bobby Marshall, Edward McAdams, Pamela McAdams, Lisa McBee, Michael McBee, Steven McBee, Kinnie McCauley, Amanda McCormick, Sherry McKee, Rosa McKelvey, Brandon McLaughlin, Edward McLaughlin, David McNish, Nicole Meaux, Catherin Melchert, Charles Miller, William Mims, Shannon Minor, Stacey Minor, Anna Miracle, Katya Monleou, Connie Montgomery, William Montgomery, Navada Moore, Cameron Moreland, John Mulhauser, Steven Mull, Jason Murphy, Brian Myers, Betty Narveson, Clayton Narveson, Elizabeth Navarre, Brian Negele, Diane Negele, Robert Negele, Darren Nelson, Michael Nelson, Angela Newman, Christopher Oaks, Tara Oaks, Michael Ogle, Tammy Ogle, Jody Ohsick, Frederick Ohsick, III, John Oldham, Michael Oldham, Tina Oldham, Mary Louise Oleson, Dennis Olsen, Jamie Olsen, Miranda Ousley, Fred Ownsby, Teresa Ownsby, Ashley Parrott, Darlene Patterson, Barbara Payne, Flora Paynes, Alma Perez, Sabrina Perkins, Megan Pinner, Serena Poland, Dylan Powers, Bradley Pratt, Rebecca Pressenell, Elizabeth Pruett, Travis Pruett, Felicia Pulley, Josh Pulley, Dennis Purkey, Pam Pyron, Ron Pyron, Charles Randles, Luis Reyes, Miriam Reyes, Monica Reyes, Samantha Reyna, Marcella Ricks, Michael Ricks, Lin Ringer, Michael Ringer, Tonya Rivera, Ashley Robbins, Joseph Robbins, Ada Grace Roberts, Ralph Roberts, Gary Rogers, Angela Rolen, Katie Rose, Patsy Abbott Roy, Tyler Rucker, Marco Ruffo, Brenda Rutherford, George Samuel, Gloria Sanders, Ralph Sanders, John Sell, Shirley Shannon, Glenn Sheets, Lucy Sheets, Sharon Shields, Lindsey Shinlever, Misty Shinlever, Carolyn Shoffner, David Shroyer, Henry Shroyer, Charlie Snores, Gary Springstend, Christina Statkus, Michael Stegall, Patricia Stegall, Eric Stempfley, Gregory Storey, Timothy Swartz, Deborah Tallent, Barbara Taylor, Steven Taylor, Cindy Tipton, Janice Tipton, Jon Tipton, Rowena Tipton, Steve Tipton, Brande Tullock, Russell Urban, Heidi Valentine, Robert Valentine, Raymond Vess, Terri Vess, Carolina Vidal, Jason Vilchez, Deborah Waddell, Troy Walker, Crystal Wall, Jeffery Wallace, Joshua Wallace, Trinity Wallace, Catheryn Walton, Charles Walton, Edward Walton, Kyle Walton, Contina Ward, Eugene Ward, Gerrit Ward, Rhonda Ward-Todd, Kimberly Ware, Tonie Ware, Carry Warren, Karen Warren, Bob Watson, Shelby Watts, William Watts, Emory Weaver, Jennine Weiland, Nick Weiland, Nick Weiland, Jr., Austin West, Elizabeth Wheeler, Jeffrey Whitehead, Kelsey Whitehead, Randy Wilburn, Candace Williams, Clarence Williams, Johnathan Williams, Jesseca Wilson, Linda Wilson, Arnequa Wren, Kevin Yanick, Jessica Yoakum, Bonnie Young. (Davis, Gary)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Union Tank Car Company identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc. for Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension. Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc., shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 24, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/21/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/20/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
August 20, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Candy Angell (ABF)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for M. David Karnas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3036209.) by Candy Angell. (ABF)
August 15, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott L. Winkelman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3743100.) filed by CSX Transportation, Inc., #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice April N. Ross ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3743091.) filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (ABF)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott L. Winkelman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3743100.) by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice April N. Ross ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3743091.) by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Tipton, et al. v. CSX Transportation, Inc., et al., No. 3:15-CV-311. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/10/18. (ADA)
August 10, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin assigned. (ADA)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Union Tank Car Company.(King, Michael)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) regarding Attorneys Scott Winkelman, April Ross and David Karnas. (BJL, ) Modified on 8/2/2018 (BJL,).*Mailed to David Karnas.
July 31, 2018 [PLEASE DISREGARD] -Docketing Error.(BJL, ). Modified on 8/2/2018 (BJL,).
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Transportation, Inc. for CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount County Circuit Court, case number L-19942. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3731344), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angell et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et. al. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hendricks
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry McKee
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suhn Brown
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Delfyette
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Cooper
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Headrick
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hickman
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Evans
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Marshall
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Loveday-Harper
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Banton
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Gasche
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Jeffries
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Cooper
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Humphrey
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon McLaughlin
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Myers
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Batts
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Nelson
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bittlers
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Lands
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Finley
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Crowe
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Cooper
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Collins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Ervin
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navada Moore
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Gregory Anderson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Farr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hurst
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Everett
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Narveson
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gregory
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cantley
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Collins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Oaks
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lundy
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Klemt
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Gilbert
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cutler
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claretta Holt
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chau Dang
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fields
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Negele
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hall
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marley
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Loveday
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Gallagher
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ogle
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Cleppe
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ingle
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Farr, Jr.
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hubbard
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Huffstetler
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Beaty
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Cooper
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai Brown
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaina Kirkland
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesa Cummings
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McNish
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Cole
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Gibbs
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Clements
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hughes
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Barker
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Crume
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hall
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Harrison
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Garland
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Loy
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillard Evans
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinnie McCauley
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Freshour
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katya Monleou
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Best
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taheera Dacosta
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jenkins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Murphy
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Minor
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Collins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Green
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Hubbard
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hill
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Montgomery
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dilly
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Bradshaw
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Johnson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Bock
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Duncan
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikhayla Ballard
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Collins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nelson
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cleveland
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Freshour
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Holder
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Hendricks
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Gillespie
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Negele
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McBee
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela McAdams
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Alonso
Represented By: M David Karnas
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Burchfield
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Goldberg
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Cable
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Cody
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Newman
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cato Clowney, Jr.
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chay Canaday
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Abbott Roy
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Collins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Cody
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makali Loy
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Carter
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Negele
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Meaux
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mulhauser
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Cantley
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Jenkins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mims
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jones
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cody
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Macomber
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Flynn
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Hanley
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Jones
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fraley
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jackson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Long
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cates
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Cleveland
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Jensen
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Kivett
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Carter
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gage Hembree
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Miracle
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Minor
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carley Francis
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Burchfield
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Goodykoontz
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Fagg
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Goodman
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jones
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward McAdams
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Maples
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Boyd
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Hannum
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Key
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Beal
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven McBee
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Edgar
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bradshaw
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Cote
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Cooper
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherin Melchert
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Holder
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Dickerson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Lindsay
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Dotson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ford
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Jennings
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Jones
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lindsey
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Higgins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Felix
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Goodman
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Decker
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Douglas
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Fuller
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa McKelvey
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Light
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathi Kazer
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McBee
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Montgomery
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavrin Brown
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Fagg
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Maples
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Banton
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Jordan
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Humphrey
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Frank
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harguth
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Johnson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Debuty
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Puckett
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hatcher
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Hubbard
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailey Johnson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jackson
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fagg
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bryant
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Holland
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Hall
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Denton
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Miller
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Daniels
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joella Collins
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginna Bock
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Bock
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Goodykoontz
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Bryant
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Carr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dick Eckhoff
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Ogle
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Lundy
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda McCormick
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Kirby
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lane
Represented By: Todd J Moody
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isai Gomez
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Represented By: David Karnas
Represented By: H Douglas Nichol
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Craig L Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Howard
Represented By: Gary A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Tank Car Company
Represented By: Michael J King
Represented By: Joshua B Fleming
Represented By: Jacob V Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Scott L Winkelman
Represented By: April N Ross
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?