Pluta et al v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter Pluta and Patricia Pluta
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv00328
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) Certificate of Good Standing for Ken Conour by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Tharp, Andrew)
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766319.) and #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) **Note to Attorney: #12 and #13 are duplicate documents and both have state certificates attached, not required district court certificate as required. A copy of this deficiency notice has been sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Conour. (MDG)
September 19, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. as to Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (MDG)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tharp, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766319.) by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tharp, Andrew)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Motions due by 7/23/2019.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/6/18. (KFB, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tharp, Andrew)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/13/2018. (MRE, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson. (AMP)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP)
August 10, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Tharp, Andrew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc..(Tharp, Andrew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 3-236-18. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3740172), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Complaint from State Court, #3 Other Summons for Johnson & Johnson)(Tharp, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pluta et al v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Pluta
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Thomas C Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Pluta
Represented By: Gary E Brewer
Represented By: Thomas C Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: Kenneth P Conour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: Kenneth P Conour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?