Hinchey et al v. PepsiCo Sales, Inc.

Plaintiff: Yvonne Hinchey and Sam Hinchey
Defendant: PepsiCo Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00329
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference reset for 11/1/2018 at 2:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference reset for 10/11/2018 at 2:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L. Collier on 9/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (ADA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by PepsiCo Sales, Inc..(Wright, James)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 2:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal (Amended) by PepsiCo Sales, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wright, James) Modified text on 8/15/2018 (ADA).
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by PepsiCo Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pepsico, Inc. for PepsiCo Sales, Inc.. (Wright, James)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/13/2018. (CAT)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/13/2018. (CAT)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/13/2018. (CAT)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by PepsiCo Sales, Inc. (CAT)
August 13, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson, case number 25604-III. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3741304), filed by PepsiCo Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wright, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinchey et al v. PepsiCo Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo Sales, Inc.
Represented By: James C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Hinchey
Represented By: Nathaniel Craig Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Hinchey
Represented By: Nathaniel Craig Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?