Rangel v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635

Plaintiff: Shang Rangel
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635
Case Number: 3:2018cv00335
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/02/2018. (AMP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635 (Kern, Elle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kern, Elle)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Receipt of State Court File from Anderson County Circuit Court. (JBR)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's (s') counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/20/2018. (JCK)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635.(Kern, Elle)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/17/2018. (BJL, )
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/17/2018. (BJL, )
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/17/2018. (BJL, )
August 16, 2018 Corporate Affiliates added to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc #4635: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,; WSE Investment, LLC; WSE Managment, LLC; Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, pursuant to #2 Certificate of Corporate Interest. (BJL, )
August 16, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BJL, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635. (Kern, Elle)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Circuit Court, case number B8LA0107. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3746321), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Kern, Elle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangel v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. #4635
Represented By: Elle G Kern
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shang Rangel
Represented By: Alexander W Gothard
Represented By: Philip R Strang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?