Erie Insurance Company v. Fluidmaster, Inc. (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Company
Defendant: FLUIDMASTER, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00337
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION Suspend Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Pending Jurisdictional Discovery re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Martin, Sean)
September 25, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Martin, Sean)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/21/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge J Ronnie Greer. The expected length of trial is five (5) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 9:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due by 9/24/2019. Utilization of Mediation due by 5/28/2019. Status Report due by 3/26/2019. See Order for additional dates and details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 09/24/2018. (AMP)
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION Suspend Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Pending Jurisdictional Discovery re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Reis, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION Suspend Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Pending Jurisdictional Discovery re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Erie Insurance Company. (Reis, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reis, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Tennessee Secretary of State Website Data, #2 Exhibit B: May-July 2018 email exchange, #3 Exhibit C: Sept. 17, 2018 email, #4 Exhibit D: Report of Expert John Holiday, #5 Exhibit E: Fluidmaster interactive website, #6 Exhibit F: Search results on Fluidmaster website, #7 Exhibit G: Fluidmaster promotion, #8 Exhibit H: Fluidmaster press release)(Reis, John)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's (s') counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 09/17/2018. (AMP)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on September 17, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Martin, Sean)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Martin, Sean)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Reis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reis, John)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Petherick, Michael)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/20/2018. (CAT)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/20/2018. (CAT)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/20/2018. (CAT)
August 20, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by FLUIDMASTER, INC.. (Martin, Sean)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Knox County, case number 2-255-18. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3747647), filed by FLUIDMASTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Criminal Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Company v. Fluidmaster, Inc. (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUIDMASTER, INC.
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Michael James Petherick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: John W Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?