Schubert et al v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: William R Schubert, Delisa L. Simpson-Schubert and William R. Schubert
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust and ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust
Case Number: 3:2018cv00359
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFIED COPIES OF REMOVAL DOCUMENTS, received from Anderson County Circuit Court. (ADA)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Depositions - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 9/07/2018. (KMK, )
September 7, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KMK, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to J. Brent Nolan. (c/m J. Brent Nolan The Nolan Law Firm P.O. Box 217 Powell, Tennessee 37849) (ADA) Modified on 9/24/2018 to note extension of the deadline. Mr. Nolan asked to submit additional documents. (ADA).
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Loan Modification, #2 Exhibit Correspondence related to default, #3 Exhibit Notices of Default)(Perry, Benjamin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Perry, Benjamin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Informational Only - Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney J. Brent Nolan is not admitted in our district. (Copy of Notice mailed to J. Brent Nolan) (CAT)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Please sign and date the Civil Cover Sheet and refile it in a non-fillable format using the event Supplement and link it back to the Notice of Removal. Requirements due by 9/4/2018. (CAT)
August 30, 2018 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Poplin for related case determination. (CAT)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc, Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC North American Holdings Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust. (Perry, Benjamin)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Perry, Benjamin)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Circuit Court, case number B8LA0117. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3757443), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings)(Perry, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schubert et al v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust
Represented By: Benjamin William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delisa L. Simpson-Schubert
Represented By: J Brent Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Schubert
Represented By: J Brent Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?