Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: City of Oak Ridge, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2018cv00374
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 9/27/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Mark Martin on 9/27/2018 (JBR).
September 25, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3775829.) filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (JBR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3775829.) by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to City of Oak Ridge, Tennessee. (JBR)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Summons by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 9/12/2018. Please properly complete the summons form and file it as a non-fillable form.(BJL, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/11/2018. (BJL, ) Modified on 9/11/2018 (BJL, ). Mailed to Attorney Mark E Martin
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/11/2018. (BJL, ) Mailed to Attorney Mark E Martin.
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/11/2018. (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney Mark E Martin.
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (BJL, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: requirements due by 9/12/2018. Please file a civil cover sheet that is complete and save it as a permanent PDFdocument so that it no longer a fillable form ("flatten" the document).(BJL, )
September 10, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BJL, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. against City of Oak Ridge, Tennessee ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3765468.), filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Alexander, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oak Ridge, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A Alexander
Represented By: Mark E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?