Swift v. Experian Credit Bureau
Plaintiff: Shari Monroe Swift
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Experian Credit Bureau
Case Number: 3:2018cv00401
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/30/18. (aws, ) Modified on 10/30/2018 Mailed to Shari Swift. (aws, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137, it is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Travis R. McDonough, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States Magistrate H. Bruce Guyton is REASSIGNED to handle any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/25/18. (ABF) Modified on 10/25/2018 to indicate c/m to Shari Monroe Swift, 7460 Twin Brooks Blvd., Knoxville, TN 37918(ABF).
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reynolds, Rebecca)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's (s') counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/01/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Shari Monroe Swift) (CAT)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 (Case at Issue) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge (c/m to Shari Monroe Swift, 7460 Twin Brooks Blvd., Knoxville, TN 37918) (ABF)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Credit Bureau.(Reynolds, Rebecca)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Experian Credit Bureau. (Reynolds, Rebecca)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Experian Credit Bureau. (Reynolds, Rebecca)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Rebecca Reynolds. Cover sheet not included. Please file a Civil Cover Sheet using the "Supplement" event. Requirements due by 10/1/2018. (JBR)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/24/18. (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (JBR)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/24/18. (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (JBR)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/24/18. (JBR) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Plaintiff on 9/24/2018 (JBR).
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (JBR)
September 24, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Reynolds, Rebecca)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from General Sessions Knox County, case number 116137 H. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3774952), filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift v. Experian Credit Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Crawford Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Credit Bureau
Represented By: Rebecca Crawford Reynolds
Represented By: Toby R Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Monroe Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?