Parton v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Karla L Parton
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv00419
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari L Sutherland on behalf of All Defendants (Sutherland, Kari)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/7/2018. (MRE, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Modak-Truran, Anita)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/5/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 10/9/2018 to note c/m, with ECF info to Thomas O Plouff Costello, McMahon, Burke & Murphy, Ltd 150 N. Wacker Drive Suite 3050 Chicago, IL 60606 (ADA).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 09/27/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Thomas Plouff) (AMP)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 09/27/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Thomas Plouff) (AMP)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 09/27/2018. (AMP) Modified on 9/27/2018 to reflect copy of Order mailed to Thomas Plouff (AMP).
September 27, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas O. Plouff ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3779122.) filed by Karla L Parton . (AMP)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Karla L Parton. (Baker, Lance)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ethicon) (AMP)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet & Summons' by Karla L Parton. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ethicon, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson)(Baker, Lance)
September 27, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas O. Plouff ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3779122.) by Karla L Parton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Baker, Lance)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3779118.), filed by Karla L Parton. (Attachments: #1 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #2 Summons Ethicon, Inc., #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parton v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla L Parton
Represented By: Lance Kristopher Baker
Represented By: Thomas O Plouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?