United States of America v. Phillips 66 Company et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company, Conoco, Inc., American Agricultural Chemical Company, ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00421
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/13/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 11/14/2018 to indicate c/m to Dalton Mott and James F. Thompson (ABF).
November 6, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Phillips 66 Company, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Phillips 66 Company. (aws, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dalton Mott. (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt# C1016126) by Phillips 66 Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(aws, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James F. Thompson (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt# C1016126)by Phillips 66 Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(aws, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. ConocoPhillips Company waiver sent on 10/16/2018. (MacAyeal, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Phillips 66 Company waiver sent on 10/16/2018. (MacAyeal, James)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/28/18. (JBR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/28/18. (JBR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/28/18. (JBR)
September 28, 2018 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Defendants. (JBR)
September 28, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of United States against all defendants, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(MacAyeal, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Phillips 66 Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Dalton Mott
Represented By: James F Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Agricultural Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: James R MacAyeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James R MacAyeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?